This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 10/23/2021 at 06:17:36 (UTC).

Hawshon Riley, et al v. Caliber Home Loans, Inc., et al

Case Summary

On 08/24/2021 Hawshon Riley filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Caliber Home Loans, Inc . This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-55909

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

 

Party Details

Defendants

MILLENNIUM MORTGAGE CORP.

BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.

BAC HOME LOANS SERVICING, LP

MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEM, INC.

OWEN LOAN SERVICING, LLC

DOES

Plaintiff / Appellants

HAWSHON RILEY

DAGNY RILEY

Defendant / Appellees

CALIBER HOME LOANS, INC.

U.S. BANK TRUST, N.A., as trustee for LSF9 Master Participation TrustU.S. Bank Trust, N.A. as trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust

QUALITY LOANS SERVICE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Patricia Renee Rodriguez

Attorney at Rodriguez Law Group, Inc.

7220 N. Rosemead Boulevardsuite 133

San Gabriel, CA 91775

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

David Taro Biderman Esquire

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP

505 Howard Streetsuite 1000

San Francisco, CA 94105

Aaron Robert Goldstein

Attorney at Perkins Coie, LLP

1888 Century Park, Esuite 1700

Los Angeles, CA 90067-1721

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #4

Mediation Questionnaire

1 #5

Case Opening Packet

#2

#3

#5

#6

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2021
  • Docket(#8) Streamlined request [7] by Appellants Dagny Riley and Hawshon Riley to extend time to file the brief is approved. Amended briefing schedule: Appellants Dagny Riley and Hawshon Riley opening brief due 11/24/2021. Appellees Caliber Home Loans, Inc., Quality Loans Service Corporation and U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. answering brief due 12/27/2021. The optional reply brief is due 21 days from the date of service of the answering brief. [12260476] (DLM) [Entered: 10/18/2021 04:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • Docket(#7) Filed (ECF) Streamlined request for extension of time to file Opening Brief by Appellants Dagny Riley and Hawshon Riley. New requested due date is 11/24/2021. [12259422] [21-55909] (Rodriguez, Patricia) [Entered: 10/18/2021 08:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. [12248922] (VS) [Entered: 10/06/2021 09:36 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: By 09/27/2021, counsel to email Circuit Mediator regarding settlement potential. Include Ninth Circuit case name and number in subject line. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested, and should not be filed with the court. The existing briefing schedule remains in effect. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. [12227066] (VS) [Entered: 09/13/2021 03:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • Docket(#4) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 09/03/2021. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[12220654]. [21-55909] (AD) [Entered: 09/03/2021 06:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Filed (ECF) Appellants Hawshon Riley and Dagny Riley Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 09/03/2021. [12220510] [21-55909] (Rodriguez, Patricia) [Entered: 09/03/2021 04:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The court of appeals' records do not indicate that appellant has filed a mediation questionnaire in accordance with Cir. R. 3-4. Within seven (7) days of the filing date of this order, appellant shall file a Mediation Questionnaire or dismiss the appeal voluntarily. [12219167] (LW) [Entered: 09/02/2021 02:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants Dagny Riley and Hawshon Riley Mediation Questionnaire due on 08/31/2021. Appellants Dagny Riley and Hawshon Riley opening brief due 10/25/2021. Appellees Caliber Home Loans, Inc., Quality Loans Service Corporation and U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. answering brief due 11/26/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12210482] (RT) [Entered: 08/24/2021 04:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BAC Home Loan Servicing, LP is a litigant

Latest cases where Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. is a litigant