This case was last updated from PACER on 04/27/2021 at 06:17:22 (UTC).

Hassan Pejouhesh v. USPS

Case Summary

On 02/26/2021 Hassan Pejouhesh filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against USPS. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, D.C. Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-5051

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

Hassan Ali Pejouhesh

Pecos, TX 79772

Defendant / Appellee

United States Postal Service

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Hassan Ali Pejouhesh

Attorney at Correctional Institution Giles W. Dalby

Po Box 1560

Pecos, TX 79772

Warden (Pecos)

Attorney at Reeves I & II Correctional Institution

Po Box 1560

Pecos, TX 79772

Warden (Post)

Attorney at Correctional Institution Giles W. Dalby

805 North Avenue F

Post, TX 79356

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

R. Craig Lawrence

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office

555 4Th Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

 

Court Documents

Open Document

FIRST CLASS MAIL RETURNED [1893540] marked "Return to Sender. Refused. Unable to forward. " The red Return to Sender stamp marked "Cannot Identify. Inmate w/o Reg. No." Mail [1890258] had been sent to Party Hassan Ali Pejouhesh. [21-5051] [Entered: 04/07/2021 01:46 PM]

Open Document

CLERK'S ORDER [1891715] filed dismissing as moot motion to withdraw case [ # 1891678-2 ]. Appellants previous motion to withdraw the appeal, filed March 3, 2021, was granted, this case was dismissed and the mandate issued on March 17, 2021. [21-5051] [Entered: 03/25/2021 01:27 PM]

Open Document

MOTION [1891678] to withdraw case (Response to Motion served by mail due on 04/05/2021) filed by Hassan Ali Pejouhesh (Service Date: 03/25/2021 by Clerk, CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 2 pages. [21-5051] [Entered: 03/25/2021 12:06 PM]

Open Document

MANDATE ISSUED to Clerk, U.S. District Court. [21-5051] [Entered: 03/17/2021 12:06 PM]

Open Document

CLERK'S ORDER [1890258] filed granting motion to withdraw case [ # 1888589-2 ]. The Clerk is directed to issue the mandate forthwith to the district court. [21-5051] [Entered: 03/17/2021 12:02 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE [1889602] received from the Clerk of the U.S. District Court to supplement record: motion to withdraw notice of appeal [21-5051] [Entered: 03/12/2021 10:44 AM]

Open Document

RECEIPT [1889315] received from for documents [ # 1887635-2 ] sent to Appellant Hassan Ali Pejouhesh [Per Warden:Correspondence from your court was forwarded to Giles Dalby Facility by Warden Gamto on 3/9/21] [21-5051] [Entered: 03/11/2021 07:43 AM]

Open Document

MOTION [1888589] to withdraw appeal (Response to Motion served by mail due on 03/15/2021) filed by Hassan Ali Pejouhesh (Service Date: 03/05/2021 by CM/ECF NDA, Clerk). [21-5051] [Entered: 03/05/2021 03:12 PM]

Open Document

LETTER [1887635] sent to warden sending Clerk order to dismiss case for lack of jurisdiction [ # 1887633-2 ], sending Clerk order ifp motion or docket fee [ # 1887628-2 ]. Prisoner acknowledgment of receipt from Warden due 03/31/2021. [21-5051] [Entered: 03/01/2021 10:22 AM]

Open Document

CLERK'S ORDER [1887633] filed to show cause regarding dismissing case for lack of jurisdiction. Response to Order due 04/30/2021. The response may not exceed the length limitations established in the order., Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution; The Clerk is directed to send this order to appellant by whatever means necessary to ensure receipt. [21-5051] [Entered: 03/01/2021 10:20 AM]

Open Document #5

Document Sent

Open Document #4

Form Sent

Open Document #3

Notice Sent

Open Document #2

Form Sent

Open Document #1

Order Sent

Open Document

NOTICE OF APPEAL [1887612] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:17-cv-01684-RDM filed by Hassan Ali Pejouhesh. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 21-5051. [21-5051] [Entered: 03/01/2021 09:39 AM]

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST CLASS MAIL RETURNED [1893540] marked "Return to Sender. Refused. Unable to forward. " The red Return to Sender stamp marked "Cannot Identify. Inmate w/o Reg. No." Mail [1890258] had been sent to Party Hassan Ali Pejouhesh. [21-5051] [Entered: 04/07/2021 01:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S ORDER [1891715] filed dismissing as moot motion to withdraw case [ # 1891678-2 ]. Appellants previous motion to withdraw the appeal, filed March 3, 2021, was granted, this case was dismissed and the mandate issued on March 17, 2021. [21-5051] [Entered: 03/25/2021 01:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION [1891678] to withdraw case (Response to Motion served by mail due on 04/05/2021) filed by Hassan Ali Pejouhesh (Service Date: 03/25/2021 by Clerk, CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 2 pages. [21-5051] [Entered: 03/25/2021 12:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMANDATE ISSUED to Clerk, U.S. District Court. [21-5051] [Entered: 03/17/2021 12:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S ORDER [1890258] filed granting motion to withdraw case [ # 1888589-2 ]. The Clerk is directed to issue the mandate forthwith to the district court. [21-5051] [Entered: 03/17/2021 12:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE [1889602] received from the Clerk of the U.S. District Court to supplement record: motion to withdraw notice of appeal [21-5051] [Entered: 03/12/2021 10:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECEIPT [1889315] received from for documents [ # 1887635-2 ] sent to Appellant Hassan Ali Pejouhesh [Per Warden:Correspondence from your court was forwarded to Giles Dalby Facility by Warden Gamto on 3/9/21] [21-5051] [Entered: 03/11/2021 07:43 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION [1888589] to withdraw appeal (Response to Motion served by mail due on 03/15/2021) filed by Hassan Ali Pejouhesh (Service Date: 03/05/2021 by CM/ECF NDA, Clerk). [21-5051] [Entered: 03/05/2021 03:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER [1887635] sent to warden sending Clerk order to dismiss case for lack of jurisdiction [ # 1887633-2 ], sending Clerk order ifp motion or docket fee [ # 1887628-2 ]. Prisoner acknowledgment of receipt from Warden due 03/31/2021. [21-5051] [Entered: 03/01/2021 10:22 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S ORDER [1887633] filed to show cause regarding dismissing case for lack of jurisdiction. Response to Order due 04/30/2021. The response may not exceed the length limitations established in the order., Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution; The Clerk is directed to send this order to appellant by whatever means necessary to ensure receipt. [21-5051] [Entered: 03/01/2021 10:20 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S ORDER [1887628] filed directing party to file motion to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis or payment of docketing fee. APPELLANT payment of docketing fee or motion to proceed in forma pauperis in district court due 03/31/2021; directing party to file ifp prisoner submissions: APPELLANT prisoner trust account report due 03/31/2021. APPELLANT consent to collection form due 03/31/2021, Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution; The Clerk is directed to send this order to appellant by whatever means necessary to ensure receipt. [21-5051] [Entered: 03/01/2021 10:06 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEAL [1887612] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:17-cv-01684-RDM filed by Hassan Ali Pejouhesh. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 21-5051. [21-5051] [Entered: 03/01/2021 09:39 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketUS PRISONER CASE docketed. [21-5051] [Entered: 03/01/2021 09:37 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer R. Craig Lawrence