This case was last updated from PACER on 11/09/2019 at 05:32:44 (UTC).

Hassan Bah v. William Barr

Case Summary

On 11/07/2019 a Immigration - Habeas Corpus Alien Detainee case was filed by Hassan Bah against William Barr in the jurisdiction of U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-7653

  • Filing Date:

    11/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Habeas Corpus Alien Detainee

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit

 

Party Details

Respondent

PAUL PERRY, in his official capacity as Superintendent, Caroline Detention Facility

Not Yet Classified

KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, in his official capacity as Acting Secretary of Homeland Security

KIMBERLY ZANOTTI, in her official capacity as the Washington Field Office Director of Immigration and Customs Enforcement

HASSAN BAH

WILLIAM P. BARR, in his official capacity as the Attorney General

RONALD D. VITIELLO, in his official capacity as Acting Director of Immigration and Customs Enforcement

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

Andrew Sun Han

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEY

2100 Jamieson Avenue

Alexandria, VA 22314-5194

Rodney Fred Page

Attorney at BRYAN, CAVE, LEIGHTON & PAISNER, LLP

1155 F Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20004-1357

Adina Bassin Appelbaum

Attorney at CAPITAL AREA IMMIGRANTS' RIGHTS COALITION

1612 K Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20006-0000

 

Court Documents

#4

RESTRICTED

#10

(#10) BRIEFING ORDER filed.. Opening Brief and Appendix due 01/02/2020. Response Brief due 01/31/2020 [19-7653] MR [Entered: 11/22/2019 07:55 AM]

#3

RESTRICTED

#12

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

#8

RESTRICTED

#11

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

#13

(#13) ORDER filed granting motion to extend filing time [ # 12 ] Number of days granted: 21. Opening brief and appendix due 01/23/2020. Response brief due 02/21/2020. Copies to all parties.. [1000651426] [19-7653] MR [Entered: 12/26/2019 09:32 AM]

#6

RESTRICTED

#9

RESTRICTED

#7

(#7) ORDER filed substituting party Chad Wolf substituted for Kevin K McAleenan Copies to all parties.. [1000629510] [19-7653] MR [Entered: 11/20/2019 08:16 AM]

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER filed granting motion to extend filing time [ # 12 ] Number of days granted: 21. Opening brief and appendix due 01/23/2020. Response brief due 02/21/2020. Copies to all parties.. [1000651426] [19-7653] MR [Entered: 12/26/2019 09:32 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) MOTION by William P. Barr, Ronald D. Vitiello, Chad Wolf and Kimberly Zanotti to extend filing time for opening brief and appendix until February 3, 2020.. Date and method of service: 12/23/2019 ecf. [1000651097] [19-7653] Dhruman Sampat [Entered: 12/23/2019 04:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Dhruman Y. Sampat for William P. Barr, Ronald D. Vitiello, Chad Wolf and Kimberly Zanotti. [1000633902] [19-7653] Dhruman Sampat [Entered: 11/26/2019 09:47 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) BRIEFING ORDER filed.. Opening Brief and Appendix due 01/02/2020. Response Brief due 01/31/2020 [19-7653] MR [Entered: 11/22/2019 07:55 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) DOCKETING STATEMENT by William P. Barr, Ronald D. Vitiello, Chad Wolf and Kimberly Zanotti. [19-7653] Lauren Wetzler [Entered: 11/21/2019 08:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Lauren A. Wetzler for William P. Barr, Ronald D. Vitiello, Chad Wolf and Kimberly Zanotti. [1000631313] [19-7653] Lauren Wetzler [Entered: 11/21/2019 04:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER filed substituting party Chad Wolf substituted for Kevin K McAleenan Copies to all parties.. [1000629510] [19-7653] MR [Entered: 11/20/2019 08:16 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Docket correction requested from Hassan Bah. Re: [ # 5 ] appearance of counsel. Access to appearance of counsel has been restricted to case participants. [19-7653] TW [Entered: 11/15/2019 10:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) (ENTRY RESTRICTED) - APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Claudia R. Cubas for Hassan Bah. [1000626824] [19-7653] --[Edited 11/22/2019 by MR] Claudia Cubas [Entered: 11/15/2019 09:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Hassan Bah. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000624384] [19-7653] Rodney Page [Entered: 11/12/2019 02:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Rodney F. Page for Hassan Bah. [1000624374] [19-7653] Rodney Page [Entered: 11/12/2019 02:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1000622037-2 ] habeas immigration case Originating case number: 1:19-cv-00641-TSE-JFA.. [19-7653] MR [Entered: 11/07/2019 10:32 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • (#1) ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Originating case number: 1:19-cv-00641-TSE-JFA. Record in folder? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR included? N/A. [19-7653] MR [Entered: 11/07/2019 10:31 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Habeas corpus immigration case docketed. Originating case number: 1:19-cv-00641-TSE-JFA. Date notice of appeal filed: 11/04/2019. Case manager: MRadday. [19-7653] MR [Entered: 11/07/2019 10:29 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.