This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 03/16/2023 at 06:10:52 (UTC).

Harry Jacobs v. Charter Communications, Inc., et al

Case Summary

On 11/21/2022 Harry Jacobs filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Charter Communications, Inc ,. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-13931

  • Filing Date:

    11/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellee

HARRY JACOBS

Defendant / Appellants

CHARTER COMMUNICATIONS, INC.

SPECTRUM SUNSHINE STATE, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Michael Levin

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler, LLP

200 S Orange Ave Ste 2300

Orlando, FL 32801

Cailey Marsh

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler, LLP

200 S Orange Ave Ste 2300

Orlando, FL 32801

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Sarah E. Wade

Attorney at Cruser Mitchell Novitz Sanchez Gaston & Zimet, LLP

121 S Orange Ave Ste 1500

Orlando, FL 32801

Daniel Sidney Liebowitz

Attorney at Cruser Mitchell Novitz Sanchez Gaston & Zimet, LLP

121 S Orange Ave Ste 1500

Orlando, FL 32801

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) MOTION to voluntarily dismiss appeal filed by CHTR and Spectrum Sunshine State, LLC. Opposing Counsel takes no Position. [16] [22-13931] (ECF: Sarah Wade) [Entered: 03/03/2023 04:53 PM]

#15

(#15) No action will be taken on Motion to voluntarily dismiss appeal [ # 14 ]. The referenced filing from Appellants CHTR and Spectrum Sunshine State, LLC is deficient for failure to comply with this Court's rules on Certificates of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statements [Entered: 03/03/2023 09:36 AM]

#14

(#14) MOTION to voluntarily dismiss appeal filed by CHTR and Spectrum Sunshine State, LLC. Opposing Counsel takes no Position. [14] [22-13931] (ECF: Sarah Wade) [Entered: 03/02/2023 03:52 PM]

#13

(#13) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Cailey Marsh for Appellee Harry Jacobs. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [22-13931] (ECF: Cailey Marsh) [Entered: 01/03/2023 06:58 PM]

#11

RESTRICTED

#10

(#10) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Sarah E. Wade for Appellants CHTR and Spectrum Sunshine State, LLC. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [22-13931] (ECF: Sarah Wade) [Entered: 12/12/2022 07:52 AM]

#9

(#9) TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Sarah E. Wade for Appellants CHTR and Spectrum Sunshine State, LLC. No hearings. [22-13931] (ECF: Sarah Wade) [Entered: 12/12/2022 07:49 AM]

#8

(#8) Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Sarah E. Wade for Appellants CHTR and Spectrum Sunshine State, LLC. [22-13931] (ECF: Sarah Wade) [Entered: 12/12/2022 07:46 AM]

#7

(#7) APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Michael Levin for Harry Jacobs. [22-13931] (ECF: Michael Levin) [Entered: 12/09/2022 02:35 PM]

#6

(#6) APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Cailey Marsh for Appellee [22-13931] (ECF: Cailey Marsh) [Entered: 12/09/2022 02:22 PM]

4 #3

Certificate of Interested Persons

4 #2

Transcript Information Form

4 #1

Civil Appeal Statement Filed

#3

(#3) APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Sarah E. Wade for Charter Communications, Inc. and Spectrum Sunshine State, LLC Michael Levin for Harry Jacobs and Daniel Sidney Liebowitz for CHTR and Spectrum Sunshine State, LLC. [22-13931] (ECF: Sarah Wade) [Entered: 12/09/2022 10:51 AM]

Open Document

(#2) According to our records, Daniel Sidney Liebowitz for CHTR and Spectrum Sunshine State, LLC is not a member of the Eleventh Circuit bar. See FRAP 46, and the accompanying circuit rules. [Entered: 11/28/2022 03:52 PM]

Open Document #3

JUDGMENT DE# 46

Open Document #2

Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MOTION to voluntarily dismiss appeal filed by CHTR and Spectrum Sunshine State, LLC. Opposing Counsel takes no Position. [16] [22-13931] (ECF: Sarah Wade) [Entered: 03/03/2023 04:53 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) No action will be taken on Motion to voluntarily dismiss appeal [ # 14 ]. The referenced filing from Appellants CHTR and Spectrum Sunshine State, LLC is deficient for failure to comply with this Court's rules on Certificates of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statements [Entered: 03/03/2023 09:36 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION to voluntarily dismiss appeal filed by CHTR and Spectrum Sunshine State, LLC. Opposing Counsel takes no Position. [14] [22-13931] (ECF: Sarah Wade) [Entered: 03/02/2023 03:52 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Cailey Marsh for Appellee Harry Jacobs. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [22-13931] (ECF: Cailey Marsh) [Entered: 01/03/2023 06:58 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Michael Levin for Harry Jacobs. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Web-Based Stock Ticker Symbol CIP via the court's public web-page and have not filed the CIP via the electronic filing system (CM/ECF). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. If you are an appellant or petitioner, upon expiration of 14 days from the date of this notice, your appeal will be dismissed for want of prosecution if the default has not been remedied, pursuant to 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-5(c) and 42-1(b). If you are an appellee or respondent, no action will be taken on documents submitted until the CIP deficiency is remedied. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-5. [Entered: 01/03/2023 04:33 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Notice to Counsel of Record. Counsel of Record must be logged in to CM/ECF and Pacer to access this document. This is the only notice you will receive regarding this matter. Please print a copy for your file. [Entered: 12/15/2022 04:34 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Sarah E. Wade for Appellants CHTR and Spectrum Sunshine State, LLC. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [22-13931] (ECF: Sarah Wade) [Entered: 12/12/2022 07:52 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Sarah E. Wade for Appellants CHTR and Spectrum Sunshine State, LLC. No hearings. [22-13931] (ECF: Sarah Wade) [Entered: 12/12/2022 07:49 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Sarah E. Wade for Appellants CHTR and Spectrum Sunshine State, LLC. [22-13931] (ECF: Sarah Wade) [Entered: 12/12/2022 07:46 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Michael Levin for Harry Jacobs. [22-13931] (ECF: Michael Levin) [Entered: 12/09/2022 02:35 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Cailey Marsh for Appellee [22-13931] (ECF: Cailey Marsh) [Entered: 12/09/2022 02:22 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • Docket(#5) Deficiency notice sent to Sarah E. Wade for CHTR and Spectrum Sunshine State, LLC. The civil appeal statement, certificate of interested persons, and transcript order form must be separately docketed. [Entered: 12/09/2022 02:17 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ***Docketed in Error***Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Sarah E. Wade for Appellants CHTR and Spectrum Sunshine State, LLC. [22-13931]--[Edited 12/09/2022 by JC] (ECF: Sarah Wade) [Entered: 12/09/2022 11:21 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Sarah E. Wade for Charter Communications, Inc. and Spectrum Sunshine State, LLC Michael Levin for Harry Jacobs and Daniel Sidney Liebowitz for CHTR and Spectrum Sunshine State, LLC. [22-13931] (ECF: Sarah Wade) [Entered: 12/09/2022 10:51 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) According to our records, Daniel Sidney Liebowitz for CHTR and Spectrum Sunshine State, LLC is not a member of the Eleventh Circuit bar. See FRAP 46, and the accompanying circuit rules. [Entered: 11/28/2022 03:52 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellants CHTR and Spectrum Sunshine State, LLC on 11/18/2022. Fee Status: Fee Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. The appellant's brief is due on or before 01/03/2023. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 12/12/2022 as to Appellant Charter Communications, Inc.. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 12/27/2022 as to Appellee Harry Jacobs. [Entered: 11/28/2022 03:46 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less