This case was last updated from PACER on 05/11/2021 at 06:22:53 (UTC).

Harris v. Administration for Children Se

Case Summary

On 03/12/2021 Harris filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Administration for Children Se. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-586

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellee

Administration for Children Services

Plaintiff / Appellant

Latoya J. Harris

New York, NY 10022

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

James Edward Johnson Esq.

Attorney at Corporation Counsel of the City of New York

100 Church Street

New York, NY 10007

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Latoya J. Harris

65 Jefferson Strreet, Apt. 6A

New York, NY 10022

 

Court Documents

#25

(#25) DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 04/20/2021, RECEIVED.[3082431] [21-586] [Entered: 04/21/2021 10:51 AM]

24 #1

Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed

#18

(#18) MOTION, to obtain judgment, on behalf of Appellant Latoya J. Harris, FILED. No Service.[3080650] [21-586] [Entered: 04/19/2021 01:43 PM]

#17

(#17) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, MOTION, to obtain judgment, [15], on behalf of Appellant Latoya J. Harris, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[3066216] [21-586] [Entered: 03/30/2021 09:05 AM]

#16

(#16) ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Appellant Latoya J. Harris, FILED. Service date 03/29/2021 by 3rd party. [3066212] [21-586] [Entered: 03/30/2021 09:03 AM]

#14

(#14) PAPERS, Financial Affidavit, RECEIVED.[3066208] [21-586] [Entered: 03/30/2021 09:00 AM]

#13

(#13) FORM D-P, on behalf of Appellant Latoya J. Harris, FILED. Service date 03/29/2021 by 3rd party.[3066206] [21-586] [Entered: 03/30/2021 08:58 AM]

#12

(#12) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FORM, on behalf of Party Latoya J. Harris, FILED. Service date 03/29/2021 by 3rd party.[3066204] [21-586] [Entered: 03/30/2021 08:57 AM]

#10

(#10) LETTER, dated 03/25/2021, on behalf of Appellee Administration for Children Services, informing the court that Defendant's counsel will not entered an appearance on its behalf, RECEIVED. Service date 03/25/2021 by US mail.[3063536] [21-586] [Entered: 03/25/2021 10:51 AM]

6 #2

Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED

6 #1

Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed

#4

(#4) DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 01/27/2021, RECEIVED.[3056091] [21-586] [Entered: 03/15/2021 12:19 PM]

#3

(#3) DISTRICT COURT ORDER OF DISMISSAL, dated 01/26/2021, RECEIVED.[3056090] [21-586] [Entered: 03/15/2021 12:18 PM]

#2

Case FILED

2 #1

Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 04/20/2021, RECEIVED.[3082431] [21-586] [Entered: 04/21/2021 10:51 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) FIRST SUPPLEMENTAL ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3082278] [21-586] [Entered: 04/21/2021 09:34 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) CURED DEFECTIVE MOTION, to obtain judgment [ # 17 ], [ # 18 ], on behalf of Appellant Latoya J. Harris, FILED.[3080656] [21-586] [Entered: 04/19/2021 01:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MOTION, to obtain judgment, on behalf of Appellant Latoya J. Harris, FILED. No Service.[3080650] [21-586] [Entered: 04/19/2021 01:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, MOTION, to obtain judgment, [15], on behalf of Appellant Latoya J. Harris, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[3066216] [21-586] [Entered: 03/30/2021 09:05 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Appellant Latoya J. Harris, FILED. Service date 03/29/2021 by 3rd party. [3066212] [21-586] [Entered: 03/30/2021 09:03 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • Docket(#15) MOTION, to obtain judgment, on behalf of Appellant Latoya J. Harris, FILED. Service date 03/29/2021 by 3rd party.[3066211] [21-586] [Entered: 03/30/2021 09:01 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) PAPERS, Financial Affidavit, RECEIVED.[3066208] [21-586] [Entered: 03/30/2021 09:00 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) FORM D-P, on behalf of Appellant Latoya J. Harris, FILED. Service date 03/29/2021 by 3rd party.[3066206] [21-586] [Entered: 03/30/2021 08:58 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FORM, on behalf of Party Latoya J. Harris, FILED. Service date 03/29/2021 by 3rd party.[3066204] [21-586] [Entered: 03/30/2021 08:57 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • Docket(#11) ATTORNEY, James Edward Johnson, for Appellee Administration for Children Services, TERMINATED.[3063538] [21-586] [Entered: 03/25/2021 10:52 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) LETTER, dated 03/25/2021, on behalf of Appellee Administration for Children Services, informing the court that Defendant's counsel will not entered an appearance on its behalf, RECEIVED. Service date 03/25/2021 by US mail.[3063536] [21-586] [Entered: 03/25/2021 10:51 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[3056102] [21-586] [Entered: 03/15/2021 12:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3056096] [21-586] [Entered: 03/15/2021 12:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 01/27/2021, RECEIVED.[3056091] [21-586] [Entered: 03/15/2021 12:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DISTRICT COURT ORDER OF DISMISSAL, dated 01/26/2021, RECEIVED.[3056090] [21-586] [Entered: 03/15/2021 12:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Latoya J. Harris, FILED. [3056065] [21-586] [Entered: 03/15/2021 12:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Administration For Childrens Services is a litigant