This case was last updated from PACER on 03/15/2021 at 06:10:44 (UTC).

Harper v. Arrow Electronics

Case Summary

On 01/14/2021 Harper filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Arrow Electronics. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-1011

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellee

ARROW ELECTRONICS

Plaintiff / Appellant

DENISE MICHELLE HARPER

Belleville, IL 62221

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Heather Fox Vickles

Attorney at Sherman & Howard

633 17Th Street, Suite 3000

Denver, CO 80202

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Denise Michelle Harper

2011 East Belle Avenue

Belleville, IL 62221

 

Court Documents

Open Restricted Document #2

Volume II- Restricted Pleadings

Open Restricted Document #1

Volume I- Pleadings

Open Document

[10801909] Entry of appearance filed by Ms. Heather Fox Vickles for Arrow Electronics. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 01/21/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-1011] [Entered: 01/21/2021 03:27 PM]

Open Document

[10801463] Jurisdictional review complete. Appellant's brief and fee or ifp forms due by 03/01/2021 for Denise Michelle Harper. Record on appeal 10th circuit due 02/10/2021. [21-1011] [Entered: 01/20/2021 03:16 PM]

Open Document

[10801462] District court order denying leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. [21-1011] [Entered: 01/20/2021 03:15 PM]

Open Document #2

General Docketing Letter - Pro Se

Open Document #1

Main Document

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10802788] Record on appeal filed. No. of Volumes: 2, Comments: Volume I- Pleadings Volume II- Restricted Pleadings. [21-1011] [Entered: 01/26/2021 10:15 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10801909] Entry of appearance filed by Ms. Heather Fox Vickles for Arrow Electronics. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 01/21/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-1011] [Entered: 01/21/2021 03:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • Docket[10801905] Entry of appearance submitted by Heather Fox Vickles for Appellee Arrow Electronics for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 01/21/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-1011] --[Edited 01/21/2021 by AT to remove PDF as pleading was filed on 1/21/2021.] HFV [Entered: 01/21/2021 03:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10801463] Jurisdictional review complete. Appellant's brief and fee or ifp forms due by 03/01/2021 for Denise Michelle Harper. Record on appeal 10th circuit due 02/10/2021. [21-1011] [Entered: 01/20/2021 03:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10801462] District court order denying leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. [21-1011] [Entered: 01/20/2021 03:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10800218] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 01/14/2021 Notice of appearance due on 01/28/2021 for Arrow Electronics. Notice of appearance and fee or ifp forms due on 02/16/2021 for Denise Michelle Harper. [21-1011] [Entered: 01/14/2021 04:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Arrow Electronics, Inc. is a litigant