This case was last updated from PACER on 11/15/2019 at 06:00:47 (UTC).

Harold Fitzgerald v. DOJ, et al

Case Summary

On 09/16/2019 Harold Fitzgerald filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against DOJ. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-3115

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

HAROLD FITZGERALD

Defendant / Appellees

UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Cheryl J. Sturm Esq.

387 Ring Road

Chadds Ford, PA 19317

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Emily McKillip Esq.

Attorney at Office of United States Attorney

615 Chestnut Street, Suite 1250

Philadelphia, PA 19106

 

Court Documents

Open Document

ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Emily McKillip on behalf of Appellee(s) Department of Justice, Federal Bureau of Prisons. [19-3115] (EM) [Entered: 10/09/2019 11:42 AM]

Open Document

FOLLOW UP LETTER to Emily McKillip, Esq. for FBI and DOJ requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 10/22/2019. (JK) [Entered: 10/08/2019 04:39 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: Response filed by Appellant Harold Fitzgerald to Legal Division letter advising of possible summary action. Certificate of Service dated 10/08/2019. [19-3115] (CJS) [Entered: 10/08/2019 01:59 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant Harold Fitzgerald advising this court that no transcripts are available. [19-3115] (CJS) [Entered: 09/20/2019 02:33 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Harold Fitzgerald, filed. [19-3115] (CJS) [Entered: 09/20/2019 02:32 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Cheryl J. Sturm on behalf of Appellant(s) Harold Fitzgerald. [19-3115] (CJS) [Entered: 09/20/2019 02:29 PM]

Open Document #2

attachment

Open Document #1

Send screening letter

Open Document

Copy of notice of appeal filed in the district court on 09/05/2019 received from Clerk of District Court. (JK) [Entered: 09/16/2019 12:02 PM]

Open Document #5

Case Opening Letter

Open Document #4

Standing Order Excess Pagination

Open Document #3

Case Caption

Open Document #2

District Court Order

Open Document #1

Civil Case Docketed

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Emily McKillip on behalf of Appellee(s) Department of Justice, Federal Bureau of Prisons. [19-3115] (EM) [Entered: 10/09/2019 11:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • FOLLOW UP LETTER to Emily McKillip, Esq. for FBI and DOJ requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 10/22/2019. (JK) [Entered: 10/08/2019 04:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: Response filed by Appellant Harold Fitzgerald to Legal Division letter advising of possible summary action. Certificate of Service dated 10/08/2019. [19-3115] (CJS) [Entered: 10/08/2019 01:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant Harold Fitzgerald advising this court that no transcripts are available. [19-3115] (CJS) [Entered: 09/20/2019 02:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Harold Fitzgerald, filed. [19-3115] (CJS) [Entered: 09/20/2019 02:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Cheryl J. Sturm on behalf of Appellant(s) Harold Fitzgerald. [19-3115] (CJS) [Entered: 09/20/2019 02:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • LEGAL DIVISION LETTER SENT advising that the case will be submitted to a panel of this Court for possible summary action. (ZM) [Entered: 09/18/2019 12:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Copy of notice of appeal filed in the district court on 09/05/2019 received from Clerk of District Court. (JK) [Entered: 09/16/2019 12:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (JK) [Entered: 09/16/2019 11:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Harold Fitzgerald in District Court No. 2-19-cv-01385. (JK) [Entered: 09/16/2019 11:57 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.