Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 09/12/2020 at 06:05:49 (UTC).

Harnois v. UMass Dartmouth, et al

Case Summary

On 07/14/2020 Harnois filed a Civil Right - Education Discrimination lawsuit against UMass Dartmouth. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1680

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Education Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant

UNNAMED PROFESSOR, in individual and official capacity Defendant

Defendant / Appellees

JOHN BUCK, in individual and official capacity

CYNTHIA CUMMINGS, in individual and official capacity

PEYTON R. HELM, in individual and official capacity

SCOTT A. WEBSTER, in individual and official capacity

UNIVERSITY OF MASSACHUSETTS AT DARTMOUTH

EMIL FIORAVANTI, in his individual and official capacity

DEBORAH MAJEWSKI, in individual and official capacity

DAVID GOMES, in individual and official capacity

EMIL FIORAVANTI, in individual and official capacity

Plaintiff / Appellant

JOHN HARNOIS

Warren, RI 02885

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Denise Barton

Attorney at University of Massachusetts

333 South St, 4Th Flr

Shrewsbury, MA 01545

Mark Alden Johnson

Attorney at University of Massachusetts

333 South St, 4Th Flr

Shrewsbury, MA 01545

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

John Harnois

510 Child St

Warren, RI 02885

 

Court Documents

Open Document #2

Form 4

Open Document #1

Order

Open Document #2

Notice Regarding Native PDF

Open Document #1

Appellant's Briefing Notice

Open Document

SUPPLEMENTAL record filed. Docket entries: 92, 101, 105. [20-1680] (GRC) [Entered: 08/12/2020 01:15 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees John Buck, Cynthia Cummings, Emil Fioravanti, David Gomes, Peyton R. Helm, Deborah Majewski, University of Massachusetts at Dartmouth and Scott A. Webster filed by Attorney Mark A. Johnson. Certificate of service dated 07/29/2020. [20-1680] (MAJ) [Entered: 07/29/2020 02:28 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees University of Massachusetts at Dartmouth, Peyton R. Helm, Cynthia Cummings, Deborah Majewski, Scott A. Webster, David Gomes, John Buck and Emil Fioravanti filed by Attorney Denise Barton. Certificate of service dated 07/29/2020. [20-1680] (DB) [Entered: 07/29/2020 02:25 PM]

Open Document

Mail returned as undeliverable to Party John Harnois. Copy of Notice issued July 15, 2020. Forwarded to #669 510 Child St Warren, RI 02885. [20-1680] (ATC) [Entered: 08/03/2020 09:39 AM]

Open Document

SUPPLEMENTAL record filed. Docket entry: 101 (Final Judgment). [20-1680] (GRC) [Entered: 07/24/2020 12:44 PM]

Open Document #3

Notice Regarding Native PDF

Open Document #2

Case Opening Notice

Open Document #1

Abbreviated Record

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketFiling fee was paid in the district court by Appellant John Harnois on 08/20/2020. [20-1680] (GAK) [Entered: 08/27/2020 01:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of default and intent to dismiss for failure to pay the filing fee. Fee due 08/28/2020. [20-1680] (GAK) [Entered: 08/14/2020 03:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEFING schedule set. Brief and Appendix due 09/23/2020 for appellant John Harnois. Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 31(a), appellee's brief will be due 30 days following service of appellant's brief and appellant's reply brief will be due 21 days following service of appellee's brief. Please see the court's general order issued April 20, 2020, requiring the electronic filing of appendices. [20-1680] (GRC) [Entered: 08/14/2020 09:21 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUPPLEMENTAL record filed. Docket entries: 92, 101, 105. [20-1680] (GRC) [Entered: 08/12/2020 01:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • DocketAMENDED notice of appeal (doc. #105) filed by Appellant John Harnois on 07/29/2020. [20-1680] (GRC) [Entered: 08/12/2020 01:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees John Buck, Cynthia Cummings, Emil Fioravanti, David Gomes, Peyton R. Helm, Deborah Majewski, University of Massachusetts at Dartmouth and Scott A. Webster filed by Attorney Mark A. Johnson. Certificate of service dated 07/29/2020. [20-1680] (MAJ) [Entered: 07/29/2020 02:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees University of Massachusetts at Dartmouth, Peyton R. Helm, Cynthia Cummings, Deborah Majewski, Scott A. Webster, David Gomes, John Buck and Emil Fioravanti filed by Attorney Denise Barton. Certificate of service dated 07/29/2020. [20-1680] (DB) [Entered: 07/29/2020 02:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMail returned as undeliverable to Party John Harnois. Copy of Notice issued July 15, 2020. Forwarded to #669 510 Child St Warren, RI 02885. [20-1680] (ATC) [Entered: 08/03/2020 09:39 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • DocketNOTICE of filing the following transcript in district court by Court Reporter Alice Moran: 07/02/2020, Conference. In accordance with Judicial Conference Policy, the transcript will not be available to the public by remote electronic access for ninety days after the filing date. During that ninety day period, the transcript may be purchased through the court reporter or viewed at the public terminal at the district court. [20-1680] (MNH) [Entered: 07/28/2020 11:26 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUPPLEMENTAL record filed. Docket entry: 101 (Final Judgment). [20-1680] (GRC) [Entered: 07/24/2020 12:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #94) filed by Appellant John Harnois. Fee due 07/29/2020. [20-1680] (GRC) [Entered: 07/15/2020 10:04 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less