Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 05/09/2020 at 06:03:27 (UTC).

Harmony Haus Westlake, L.L.C., et al v. Parkstone Property Owners Assn

Case Summary

On 03/10/2020 Harmony Haus Westlake, L L C filed a Civil Right - Housing/Accommodation Discrimination lawsuit against Parkstone Property Owners Assn. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-50185

  • Filing Date:

    03/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Housing/Accommodation Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit

 

Party Details

Counter Defendant

FENGLIN DU

Plaintiff / Appellees

HARMONY HAUS WESTLAKE, L.L.C.

LING ZHOU

Defendant / Appellant and Not Yet Classified

PARKSTONE PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION, INCORPORATED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Mark S. Whitburn

Attorney at Whitburn & Pevsner, P.L.L.C.

2000 E. Lamar Boulevard

Arlington, TX 76006

Christopher McGreal

Attorney at Disability Rights Texas

1420 W. Mockingbird Lane

Dallas, TX 75247-0000

Defendant / Appellant and Not Yet Classified Attorney

Eric J. Hansum

Attorney at Niemann & Niemann

1122 Colorado Street

Austin, TX 78701-0000

 

Court Documents

Open Document

RECORD EXCERPTS FILED by Appellant Cross-Appellee Parkstone Property Owners Association, Incorporated. Date of service: 05/06/2020 via email - Attorney for Appellant Cross-Appellee: Hansum; Attorney for Appellee Cross-Appellant: McGreal; Attorney for Appellee: Whitburn [20-50185] (Eric J. Hansum ) [Entered: 05/06/2020 12:51 PM]

Open Document

APPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED by Parkstone Property Owners Association, Incorporated. Date of service: 05/06/2020 via email - Attorney for Appellant Cross-Appellee: Hansum; Attorney for Appellee Cross-Appellant: McGreal; Attorney for Appellee: Whitburn [20-50185] (Eric J. Hansum ) [Entered: 05/06/2020 12:50 PM]

Open Document #2

Court Order

Open Document

BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 05/11/2020 for Appellant Cross-Appellee Parkstone Property Owners Association, Incorporated. [20-50185] (CAS) [Entered: 03/30/2020 07:55 AM]

Open Document

RESPONSE/OPPOSITION [9281995-1] to the Motion to expedite appeal filed by Appellant Cross-Appellee Parkstone Property Owners Association, Incorporated in 20-50185 [ # 9273130-2 ] Date of Service: 03/27/2020. [20-50185] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: RESPONSE/OPPOSITION filed by Fenglin Du and Harmony Haus Westlake, L.L.C. and Mr. Ling Zhou [9281995-1] to the Motion to expedite appeal filed by Appellant Cross-Appellee Parkstone Property Owners Association, Incorporated [ # 9273130-2 ], Motion for oral argument filed by Appellant Cross-Appellee Parkstone Property Owners Association, Incorporated [ # 9273130-3 ] Date of Service: 03/27/2020 via email - Attorney for Appellant Cross-Appellee: Hansum; Attorney for Appellee Cross-Appellant: McGreal; Attorney for Appellee: Whitburn. [20-50185] (Mark S. Whitburn ) [Entered: 03/27/2020 11:25 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Mark S. Whitburn for Fenglin Du and Harmony Haus Westlake, L.L.C. and Mr. Ling Zhou for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-50185] (Mark S. Whitburn ) [Entered: 03/27/2020 10:34 PM]

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document

OPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellant Cross-Appellee Parkstone Property Owners Association, Incorporated to expedite the appeal [9273130-2], for oral argument [9273130-3]. Date of service: 03/17/2020 via email - Attorney for Appellant Cross-Appellee: Hansum; Attorney for Appellees Cross-Appellants: McGreal, Whitburn [20-50185] (Eric J. Hansum ) [Entered: 03/17/2020 02:48 PM]

Open Document

INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9272657-2] Fee due on 04/01/2020 for Appellees Cross-Appellants Harmony Haus Westlake, L.L.C. and Ling Zhou. Transcript order due on 04/01/2020 for Appellees Cross-Appellants Harmony Haus Westlake, L.L.C. and Ling Zhou [20-50185] (CBW) [Entered: 03/17/2020 10:51 AM]

Open Document

INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9272649-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [20-50185] (CBW) [Entered: 03/17/2020 10:47 AM]

Open Document

CASE CAPTION updated. Cross appeal filed. [9272400-2] Parties updated: Appellees Harmony Haus Westlake, L.L.C. and Ling Zhou in 20-50185. NOA filed by Appellees Harmony Haus Westlake, L.L.C. and Mr. Ling Zhou. [9272400-1] [20-50185] (CBW) [Entered: 03/17/2020 08:26 AM]

Open Document

COURT REPORTER ACKNOWLEDGMENT received from Arlinda Rodriguez. [20-50185] (Arlinda Lou Rodriguez ) [Entered: 03/16/2020 11:21 AM]

Open Document

ATTORNEY TRANSCRIPT ORDER form filed by Appellant Parkstone Property Owners Association, Incorporatedfor the Court to process. Date of service: 03/13/2020 via email - Attorney for Appellant: Hansum; Attorney for Appellees: McGreal, Whitburn. [20-50185] (Eric J. Hansum ) [Entered: 03/13/2020 04:36 PM]

Open Document

CIVIL RIGHTS CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Parkstone Property Owners Association, Incorporated [20-50185] (RAJ) [Entered: 03/10/2020 01:46 PM]

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECORD EXCERPTS FILED by Appellant Cross-Appellee Parkstone Property Owners Association, Incorporated. Date of service: 05/06/2020 via email - Attorney for Appellant Cross-Appellee: Hansum; Attorney for Appellee Cross-Appellant: McGreal; Attorney for Appellee: Whitburn [20-50185] (Eric J. Hansum ) [Entered: 05/06/2020 12:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED by Parkstone Property Owners Association, Incorporated. Date of service: 05/06/2020 via email - Attorney for Appellant Cross-Appellee: Hansum; Attorney for Appellee Cross-Appellant: McGreal; Attorney for Appellee: Whitburn [20-50185] (Eric J. Hansum ) [Entered: 05/06/2020 12:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that Appellant Cross-Appellee's opposed motion to expedite the appeal is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Appellant Cross-Appellee's opposed motion to set soonest date for oral argument after expedited briefing is DENIED. [ # 9273130-2 ]; [ # 9273130-3 ] [20-50185] (CAS) [Entered: 03/30/2020 09:48 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Mark S. Whitburn for Appellee Fenglin Du in 20-50185, Attorney Mark S. Whitburn for Appellee Cross-Appellant Ling Zhou in 20-50185, Attorney Mark S. Whitburn for Appellee Cross-Appellant Harmony Haus Westlake, L.L.C. in 20-50185 [20-50185] (CAS) [Entered: 03/30/2020 09:03 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 05/11/2020 for Appellant Cross-Appellee Parkstone Property Owners Association, Incorporated. [20-50185] (CAS) [Entered: 03/30/2020 07:55 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE/OPPOSITION [9281995-1] to the Motion to expedite appeal filed by Appellant Cross-Appellee Parkstone Property Owners Association, Incorporated in 20-50185 [ # 9273130-2 ] Date of Service: 03/27/2020. [20-50185] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: RESPONSE/OPPOSITION filed by Fenglin Du and Harmony Haus Westlake, L.L.C. and Mr. Ling Zhou [9281995-1] to the Motion to expedite appeal filed by Appellant Cross-Appellee Parkstone Property Owners Association, Incorporated [ # 9273130-2 ], Motion for oral argument filed by Appellant Cross-Appellee Parkstone Property Owners Association, Incorporated [ # 9273130-3 ] Date of Service: 03/27/2020 via email - Attorney for Appellant Cross-Appellee: Hansum; Attorney for Appellee Cross-Appellant: McGreal; Attorney for Appellee: Whitburn. [20-50185] (Mark S. Whitburn ) [Entered: 03/27/2020 11:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT ORDER received advising transcript unnecessary as it is already filed. [20-50185] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellees Cross-Appellants Harmony Haus Westlake, L.L.C. and Mr. Ling Zhou advising transcript unnecessary as it is already filed. Date of Service: 03/27/2020 via email - Attorney for Appellant Cross-Appellee: Hansum; Attorney for Appellee Cross-Appellant: McGreal; Attorney for Appellee: Whitburn [20-50185] (Mark S. Whitburn ) [Entered: 03/27/2020 10:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Mark S. Whitburn for Fenglin Du and Harmony Haus Westlake, L.L.C. and Mr. Ling Zhou for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-50185] (Mark S. Whitburn ) [Entered: 03/27/2020 10:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • DocketELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [20-50185] (MRW) [Entered: 03/27/2020 04:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED FROM DISTRICT COURT for 1:19-CV-1034. Electronic ROA due on 04/10/2020. [20-50185] (CAS) [Entered: 03/26/2020 03:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellant Cross-Appellee Parkstone Property Owners Association, Incorporated to expedite the appeal [9273130-2], for oral argument [9273130-3]. Date of service: 03/17/2020 via email - Attorney for Appellant Cross-Appellee: Hansum; Attorney for Appellees Cross-Appellants: McGreal, Whitburn [20-50185] (Eric J. Hansum ) [Entered: 03/17/2020 02:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9272657-2] Fee due on 04/01/2020 for Appellees Cross-Appellants Harmony Haus Westlake, L.L.C. and Ling Zhou. Transcript order due on 04/01/2020 for Appellees Cross-Appellants Harmony Haus Westlake, L.L.C. and Ling Zhou [20-50185] (CBW) [Entered: 03/17/2020 10:51 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9272649-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [20-50185] (CBW) [Entered: 03/17/2020 10:47 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketCASE CAPTION updated. Party information modified for Parkstone Property Owners Association, Incorporated, Harmony Haus Westlake, L.L.C. and Ling Zhou in 20-50185. Update: changed party types to reflect the cross appeal filed. [20-50185] (CBW) [Entered: 03/17/2020 10:41 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE CAPTION updated. Cross appeal filed. [9272400-2] Parties updated: Appellees Harmony Haus Westlake, L.L.C. and Ling Zhou in 20-50185. NOA filed by Appellees Harmony Haus Westlake, L.L.C. and Mr. Ling Zhou. [9272400-1] [20-50185] (CBW) [Entered: 03/17/2020 08:26 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Eric J. Hansum for Appellant Parkstone Property Owners Association, Incorporated in 20-50185 [20-50185] (CAS) [Entered: 03/16/2020 03:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT REPORTER ACKNOWLEDGMENT received from Arlinda Rodriguez. [20-50185] (Arlinda Lou Rodriguez ) [Entered: 03/16/2020 11:21 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketATTORNEY TRANSCRIPT ORDER form filed by Appellant Parkstone Property Owners Association, Incorporatedfor the Court to process. Date of service: 03/13/2020 via email - Attorney for Appellant: Hansum; Attorney for Appellees: McGreal, Whitburn. [20-50185] (Eric J. Hansum ) [Entered: 03/13/2020 04:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-50185] (Eric J. Hansum ) [Entered: 03/13/2020 04:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL RIGHTS CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Parkstone Property Owners Association, Incorporated [20-50185] (RAJ) [Entered: 03/10/2020 01:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less