This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 04/23/2021 at 06:04:58 (UTC).

Harkey v. NextGen Healthcare

Case Summary

On 02/22/2021 Harkey filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against NextGen Healthcare. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-50132

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

Jennifer J. Harkey

Defendant / Appellee

NextGen Healthcare, Incorporated

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Danny Clark Wash Esq.

Attorney at Wash & Thomas

6613 Sanger Avenue

Waco, TX 76710-0000

Andrea Michelle Mehta

Attorney at Dunnam & Dunnam, L.L.P.

4125 W. Waco Drive

Waco, TX 76710

James Robert Dunnam

Attorney at Dunnam & Dunnam, L.L.P.

4125 W. Waco Drive

Waco, TX 76710

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Michael Joseph DePonte

Attorney at Jackson Lewis, P.C.

500 N. Akard Street

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [21-50132] (Claire Lenore Cook ) [Entered: 04/22/2021 09:26 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [21-50132] (Paul Ellis Hash ) [Entered: 04/22/2021 09:24 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECORD EXCERPTS FILED. # of Copies Provided: 0 [21-50132] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: RECORD EXCERPTS FILED by Appellant Ms. Jennifer J. Harkey. Date of service: 04/12/2021 via email - Attorney for Appellee: DePonte; Attorney for Appellants: Dunnam, Mehta, Wash [21-50132] (Andrea Michelle Mehta ) [Entered: 04/12/2021 05:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED # of Copies Provided: 0 A/Pet's Brief deadline satisfied. Appellee's Brief due on 05/12/2021 for Appellee NextGen Healthcare, Incorporated [21-50132] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: APPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED by Ms. Jennifer J. Harkey. Date of service: 04/12/2021 via email - Attorney for Appellee: DePonte; Attorney for Appellants: Dunnam, Mehta, Wash [21-50132] (Andrea Michelle Mehta ) [Entered: 04/12/2021 05:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) James Robert Dunnam for party(s) Appellant Jennifer J. Harkey, in case 21-50132 [21-50132] (MFY) [Entered: 03/05/2021 02:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Andrea Michelle Mehta for party(s) Appellant Jennifer J. Harkey, in case 21-50132 [21-50132] (MFY) [Entered: 03/05/2021 02:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [21-50132] (Andrea Michelle Mehta ) [Entered: 03/04/2021 03:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [21-50132] (James Robert Dunnam ) [Entered: 03/04/2021 03:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Danny Clark Wash for Appellant Jennifer J. Harkey in 21-50132 [21-50132] (MFY) [Entered: 03/04/2021 11:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 04/12/2021 for Appellant Jennifer J. Harkey. [21-50132] (CMB) [Entered: 03/03/2021 01:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Admitted Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Video/Audio Exhibits on File in District Court? No Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [21-50132] (CMB) [Entered: 03/03/2021 01:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [21-50132] (Danny Clark Wash ) [Entered: 03/03/2021 10:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED from District Court for 6:19-CV-590. Electronic ROA due on 03/16/2021. [21-50132] (MFY) [Entered: 03/01/2021 11:16 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9513873-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [21-50132] (MFY) [Entered: 03/01/2021 10:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL RIGHTS CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Ms. Jennifer J. Harkey [21-50132] (LLL) [Entered: 02/22/2021 11:15 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Nextgen Healthcare, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael J DePonte