This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 09/20/2021 at 06:02:47 (UTC).

Hancock County Land Acquisitions, LLC v. USA, et al

Case Summary

On 07/22/2021 Hancock County Land Acquisitions, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against USA. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-12508

  • Filing Date:

    07/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

HANCOCK COUNTY LAND ACQUISITIONS, LLC

Defendant / Appellees

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE

CATHERINE C. BROOKS, Internal Reveune Service Manager

PAMELA V. STAFFORD, Internal Revenue Service Revenue Agent

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Matthew T. Journy

Attorney at Law Offices of James Wingfield

210 Park Ave Ste 313

Worcester, MA 01609

Samuel Fenn Little Jr.

Attorney at S. Fenn Little, Jr., PC

1490 Mecaslin St Nw

Atlanta, GA 30309

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Geoffrey Klimas

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

Po Box 502

Washington, DC 20044

U.S. Attorney Service - Northern District of Georgia

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office

75 Ted Turner Dr Sw Ste 600

Atlanta, GA 30303

 

Court Documents

Open Document #1

DKT-7CIV Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document #2

Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

Open Document #3

DE #33 Judgment

Open Document #4

DE #32 Order

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document #1

Appellant Brief

Open Document #2

Exhibit A, statutory addendum

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketReceived paper copies of EBrief filed by Appellant Hancock County Land Acquisitions, LLC. [Entered: 09/16/2021 02:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAppellant's brief filed by Hancock County Land Acquisitions, LLC. [21-12508] (ECF: Samuel Little) [Entered: 09/14/2021 12:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketOver the phone extension granted by clerk as to Attorney Samuel Fenn Little, Jr. for Appellant Hancock County Land Acquisitions, LLC. Appellants brief due on 09/14/2021 as to Appellant Hancock County Land Acquisitions, LLC. Appendix due on 09/21/2021 as to Appellant Hancock County Land Acquisitions, LLC. Any request for a second or subsequent extension of time shall be subject to 11th Cir. R. 31-2(d). [Entered: 08/23/2021 03:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Geoffrey Klimas for Appellees Catherine C. Brooks, Internal Revenue Service, Pamela V. Stafford and USA. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-12508] (ECF: Geoffrey Klimas) [Entered: 08/19/2021 11:45 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT INFORMATION form filed by Attorney Samuel Fenn Little, Jr. for Appellant Hancock County Land Acquisitions, LLC. No hearings. [Entered: 08/17/2021 03:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketORDER: Motion for Leave to File Transcript Order Form Out of Time filed by Appellant Hancock County Land Acquisitions, LLC is GRANTED by clerk. [ # 9461302-2 ] [Entered: 08/17/2021 03:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION for leave to file Transcript Order Form out of time filed by Hancock County Land Acquisitions, LLC. Motion is Unopposed. [9461302-1] [21-12508] (ECF: Samuel Little) [Entered: 08/16/2021 04:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Counsel of Record. Counsel of Record must be logged in to CM/ECF and Pacer to access this document. This is the only notice you will receive regarding this matter. Please print a copy for your file. [Entered: 08/13/2021 03:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Samuel Fenn Little, Jr. for Appellant Hancock County Land Acquisitions, LLC. [21-12508] (ECF: Samuel Little) [Entered: 08/06/2021 03:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Samuel Fenn Little, Jr. for Hancock County Land Acquisitions, LLC. [21-12508] (ECF: Samuel Little) [Entered: 08/06/2021 10:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-12508] (ECF: Samuel Little) [Entered: 08/05/2021 02:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Geoffrey J. Klimas for USA, et al. [21-12508] (ECF: Geoffrey Klimas) [Entered: 08/02/2021 03:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Hancock County Land Acquisitions, LLC on 07/21/2021. Fee Status: Fee Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. The appellant's brief is due on or before 08/31/2021. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 08/05/2021 as to Appellant Hancock County Land Acquisitions, LLC. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 08/19/2021 as to Appellee Catherine C. Brooks [Entered: 07/27/2021 02:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Internal Revenue Service is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Geoffrey John Klimas

Latest cases represented by Lawyer U.S. Attorney Service - Northern District of Georgia