This case was last updated from PACER on 05/07/2019 at 06:06:35 (UTC).

Hamid Adeli v. Silverstar Automotive

Case Summary

On 03/08/2019 Hamid Adeli filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Silverstar Automotive. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1481

  • Filing Date:

    03/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellee

Hamid Adeli

Defendant / Appellants

Silverstar Automotive, Inc, Mercedes-Benz of Northwest Arkansas, doing business as Mercedes Benz of Northwest Arkansas

Silverstar Automotive, doing business as Mercedes Benz of Northwest Arkansas

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Nicholas A. Migliaccio

Attorney at MIGLIACCIO RATHOD, LLP

412 H Street, N.E.

Washington, DC 20002

Jason Rathod

Attorney at MIGLIACCIO RATHOD, LLP

412 H Street, N.E.

Washington, DC 20002

Corey D. McGaha

Attorney at CROWDER & MCGAHA

Suite 202, 5507 Ranch Drive

Little Rock, AR 72223

William Thomas Crowder

Attorney at CROWDER & MCGAHA

Suite 202, 5507 Ranch Drive

Little Rock, AR 72223

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Staci Dumas Carson

Attorney at WATTS & DONOVAN

Suite 200, 200 River Market Avenue

Little Rock, AR 72201-1769

David Michael Donovan

Attorney at WATTS & DONOVAN

Suite 200, 200 River Market Avenue

Little Rock, AR 72201-1769

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Civil case docketed. [4764711] [19-1481] (RLS) [Entered: 03/11/2019 08:16 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Staci Dumas Carson for Appellant Silverstar Automotive w/service 03/11/2019 [4764889] [19-1481] (SDC) [Entered: 03/11/2019 10:53 AM]

Open Document #1

Letter From Clerk's Office

Open Document #2

XAP Briefing Schedule

Open Document

BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Transcript due on or before 04/22/2019. Appendix due 04/30/2019. BRIEF APPELLANT, Silverman Automotive due 04/30/2019 Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. Appellant reply brief is due 21 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellee brief. [4764725] [19-1481] (RLS) [Entered: 03/11/2019 08:39 AM]

Open Document

CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellant Silverstar Automotive. - FOR CAL [4764951] [19-1481] (DMD) [Entered: 03/11/2019 11:41 AM]

Open Document

Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, Judgment dated 09/27/2018, Order dated 10/18/2018, Order dated 12/20/218, Opinion and Order dated 02/07/2019, Amended Judgment dated 02/07/2019, Order dated 02/08/2019, Order dated 02/12/2019 [4764721] [19-1481] (RLS) [Entered: 03/11/2019 08:31 AM]

Open Document

Originating court document filed consisting of notice of cross-appeal, docket entries, order and opinion dated 02/07/2019, amended judgement dated 02/07/2019[4769819] [19-1602, 19-1481] (RLS) [Entered: 03/22/2019 02:48 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by David M. Donovan for Appellant Silverstar Automotive w/service 03/11/2019 [4764885] [19-1481] (DMD) [Entered: 03/11/2019 10:51 AM]

Open Document

METHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellant Silverstar Automotive in 19-1481 - Separate Appendix - w/service 04/10/2019 [4776463] [19-1481, 19-1602] (DMD) [Entered: 04/10/2019 04:19 PM]

Open Document

Civil case docketed. [4769811] [19-1602, 19-1481] (RLS) [Entered: 03/22/2019 02:39 PM]

Open Document

DESIGNATION of record filed by Appellant Silverstar Automotive in 19-1481. w/service 04/10/2019 [4776467] [19-1481, 19-1602] (DMD) [Entered: 04/10/2019 04:20 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DESIGNATION of record filed by Appellant Silverstar Automotive in 19-1481. w/service 04/10/2019 [4776467] [19-1481, 19-1602] (DMD) [Entered: 04/10/2019 04:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • METHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellant Silverstar Automotive in 19-1481 - Separate Appendix - w/service 04/10/2019 [4776463] [19-1481, 19-1602] (DMD) [Entered: 04/10/2019 04:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • RECORD FILED - TRIAL TRANSCRIPT, 1 volumes, Location STL, Comments: Copy do not return to the District Court at end of case, Source Location: USDC / WAF, Dt. of Proceeding/Hearing: 09/25/2018 - 09/26/2018, No. of Pgs.: 381, Court Reporter: Sawyer, Theresa [4774632] [19-1481, 19-1602] (STL) [Entered: 04/05/2019 02:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CORRECTED CROSS APPEAL BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Transcript due on or before 05/01/2019. BRIEF APPELLANT, Silverstar Automotive due 05/13/2019. Appendix due 05/13/2019. Appellee/cross Appellant brief due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellant's brief. [4771382] [19-1481, 19-1602] (RLS) [Entered: 03/27/2019 02:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • ** LOCKED - SEE CORRECTED SCHEDULE ISSUED 3/27/19 ** CROSS APPEAL BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Transcript due on or before 05/01/2019. Appendix due 05/13/2019. BRIEF APPELLANT, Silverstar Automotive and Hamid Adeli due 05/13/2019. Appellee/cross Appellant brief due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellant's brief. [4769826] [19-1481, 19-1602] (RLS) [Entered: 03/22/2019 03:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Originating court document filed consisting of notice of cross-appeal, docket entries, order and opinion dated 02/07/2019, amended judgement dated 02/07/2019[4769819] [19-1602, 19-1481] (RLS) [Entered: 03/22/2019 02:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil case docketed. [4769811] [19-1602, 19-1481] (RLS) [Entered: 03/22/2019 02:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellant Silverstar Automotive. - FOR CAL [4764951] [19-1481] (DMD) [Entered: 03/11/2019 11:41 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE filed by Staci Dumas Carson for Appellant Silverstar Automotive w/service 03/11/2019 [4764889] [19-1481] (SDC) [Entered: 03/11/2019 10:53 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE filed by David M. Donovan for Appellant Silverstar Automotive w/service 03/11/2019 [4764885] [19-1481] (DMD) [Entered: 03/11/2019 10:51 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Transcript due on or before 04/22/2019. Appendix due 04/30/2019. BRIEF APPELLANT, Silverman Automotive due 04/30/2019 Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. Appellant reply brief is due 21 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellee brief. [4764725] [19-1481] (RLS) [Entered: 03/11/2019 08:39 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, Judgment dated 09/27/2018, Order dated 10/18/2018, Order dated 12/20/218, Opinion and Order dated 02/07/2019, Amended Judgment dated 02/07/2019, Order dated 02/08/2019, Order dated 02/12/2019 [4764721] [19-1481] (RLS) [Entered: 03/11/2019 08:31 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil case docketed. [4764711] [19-1481] (RLS) [Entered: 03/11/2019 08:16 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.