This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 04/13/2021 at 06:21:47 (UTC).

Hall v. Allstate Fire

Case Summary

On 02/12/2021 Hall filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Allstate Fire. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-1040

  • Filing Date:

    02/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellee

ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Plaintiff / Appellant

NEIL HALL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Kurt Hans Henkel

Attorney at Tucker Holmes

7400 East Caley Avenue, Suite 300

Centennial, CO 80111-6714

Justin Hans Zouski

Attorney at Tucker Holmes

7400 East Caley Avenue, Suite 300

Centennial, CO 80111-6714

Robert S. Hunger

Attorney at Tucker Holmes

7400 East Caley Avenue, Suite 300

Centennial, CO 80111-6714

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Jennifer Torres

Attorney at Franklin D. Azar & Associates

14426 East Evans Avenue

Aurora, CO 80014

DezaRae D. LaCrue

Attorney at Franklin D. Azar & Associates

14426 East Evans Avenue

Aurora, CO 80014

Elisabeth Lynne Owen

Attorney at Franklin D. Azar & Associates

14426 East Evans Avenue

Aurora, CO 80014

 

Court Documents

Open Document #1

Main Document

Open Document #2

General Docket Letter - Counsel - Civil

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document #1

Mediation Conference Notice

Open Document #2

Mediation Contact Form

Open Document

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10820893] On the court's own motion and pursuant to 10th Cir. R. 33.1, order filed by (CLK) extending time to file appellant's brief and appendix until 05/12/2021. Appellant's brief and appendix due on 05/12/2021 for Neil Hall. [21-1040] [Entered: 04/08/2021 09:42 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • Docket[10815127] Attorney Mr. Justin Hans Zouski for Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company admitted to the bar of this court. [21-1040] [Entered: 03/15/2021 11:49 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10813217] Notice of Mediation Conference filed by the Tenth Circuit Mediation Office. Telephone conference scheduled for 03/15/2021 at 2:00 pm (MT). The mediation contact form must be completed and returned to the Mediation Office within four days of the date of this notice. [Please open the Notice for important information.] [21-1040] [Entered: 03/08/2021 11:45 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10812688] Amended and corrected docketing statement filed by Neil Hall. Served on 03/05/2021. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 03/05/2021 by SDS to modify text] [21-1040] ELO [Entered: 03/05/2021 09:00 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10812168] Docketing statement filed by Neil Hall. Served on 03/03/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-1040] ELO [Entered: 03/03/2021 03:46 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketThis entry has been removed from the docket. Attorney notified to refile correct form not a docket sheet [JJH] [10812109] Docketing statement filed by Neil Hall. Served on 03/03/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-1040] DDL [Entered: 03/03/2021 02:18 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10811573] Deficiency notice issued. Docketing statement due 03/05/2021 for Neil Hall. [21-1040] [Entered: 03/02/2021 11:58 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10811276] Admissions letter sent. Response date set to 03/31/2021 for Justin Hans Zouski. [21-1040] [Entered: 03/01/2021 02:53 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • Docket[10811047] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 03/01/2021. Appellant/Petitioner's brief and appendix due on 04/12/2021 for Neil Hall. [21-1040] [Entered: 03/01/2021 09:18 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10811026] Entry of appearance filed by Ms. Elisabeth Lynne Owen for Neil Hall. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 02/26/2021. Manner of Service: email [21-1040] [Entered: 03/01/2021 08:47 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10810974] Notice received from Neil Hall that a transcript is not necessary for this appeal. Notice due that record is complete by 03/08/2021 for Jeffrey P. Colwell, Clerk of Court (oclk) [21-1040] [Entered: 03/01/2021 07:28 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10810973] Entry of appearance filed by Mrs. DezaRae D LaCrue for Neil Hall. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 02/26/2021. Manner of Service: email [21-1040] [Entered: 03/01/2021 07:27 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • Docket[10810949] Entry of appearance submitted by Elizabeth Owen for for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 02/26/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-1040]--[Edited 03/01/2021 by LG to remove PDF from entry, as pleading was filed on 3/1/2021] ELO [Entered: 02/26/2021 08:26 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • Docket[10810948] Entry of appearance submitted by DezaRae D. LaCrue for Appellant Neil Hall for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 02/26/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-1040] [Edited to remove PDF as pleadings have been filed-- Edited 03/01/2021 by NA] DDL [Entered: 02/26/2021 08:23 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10810829] Entry of appearance filed by Robert S. Hunger for Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 02/26/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-1040] [Entered: 02/26/2021 01:35 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10810821] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Kurt Hans Henkel and Mr. Justin Hans Zouski for Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 02/26/2021. Manner of Service: email [21-1040] [Entered: 02/26/2021 01:20 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • Docket[10810819] Entry of appearance submitted by Robert S. Hunger for Appellee Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 02/26/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-1040] --[Edited 02/26/2021 by AT to remove PDF as pleading was filed on 2/26/2021.] RSH [Entered: 02/26/2021 01:19 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • Docket[10810816] Entry of appearance submitted by Kurt H. Henkel and Justin H. Zouski for Appellee Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 02/26/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-1040]--[Edited 02/26/2021 by LG to remove PDF from entry, as pleading was filed on 2/26/2021] KHH [Entered: 02/26/2021 01:15 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10807381] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 02/12/2021. Docketing statement due 02/26/2021 for Neil Hall. Transcript order form due 02/26/2021 for Neil Hall. Notice of appearance due on 02/26/2021 for Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company and Neil Hall [21-1040] [Entered: 02/12/2021 09:32 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less