This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 11/08/2021 at 06:08:22 (UTC).

Haley Daria v. Sapient Corp., et al

Case Summary

On 09/09/2021 Haley Daria filed an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit against Sapient Corp ,. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-16480

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

HALEY DARIA

Arroyo Grande, CA 93421

Defendant / Appellees

SAPIENT CORP., acquirer of intellectual properties of World Wide Web Associates, a CA LLC

ROBERT G KLEIN

RANCHO SAN ROQUE, INC., a California corporation

RACHEL ADAMSKI, Executor of Thomas B. Adamski Estate

DAVID LA FITTE

MACK STATON

ROBIN DESHAYES

CHIEF JUSTICE TANI GORRE CANTIL-SAKAUYE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Haley Daria

P.O. Box 1455

Arroyo Grande, CA 93421

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Meegan Brooks

Attorney at Steptoe & Johnson LLP

One Market Plaza, Spear Tower

San Francisco, CA 94105

Michael Dockterman

Attorney at Steptoe & Johnson, LLP

227 W Monroe Street, Suite 4700

Chicago, IL 60606

Michael Keough

Attorney at Steptoe & Johnson LLP

One Market Plaza, Spear Tower

San Francisco, CA 94105

Timothy J. Trager

Attorney at Reicker, Pfau, Pyle & McRoy LLP

1421 State Street, Suite B

Santa Barbara, CA 93101-2507

Douglas Quinton Hahn Esquire

Attorney at Stradling Yocca Carlson & Rauth, P.C.

660 Newport Center Drive, Suite 1600

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Victoria McLaughlin

Attorney at Law Offices of William E. Crockett

16000 Ventura Boulevard, Suite 1000

Encino, CA 91436

Jared M. Katz

Attorney at Mullen & Henzell, LLP

112 E Victoria Street

Santa Barbara, CA 93101

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Pro Se Case Opening Packet

1 #4

Attorneys Not Registered for E-Filing

#2

(#2) Filed Appellant Miss Haley Daria perfecting the transcript for the appeal record/fraud on Court. Dated 09/16/2021. Paper filing deficiency: None. [12233717] (RL) [Entered: 09/20/2021 03:42 PM]

3 #1

Main Document

3 #2

Additional Document

#10

(#10) Filed order (M. MARGARET MCKEOWN and WILLIAM A. FLETCHER) Appellants motion for appointment of counsel (Docket Entry No. [ # 3 ]) is denied. No motions for reconsideration, clarification, or modification of this denial shall be filed or entertained. The opening brief is due November 29, 2021. The answering brief is due December 29, 2021. The optional reply brief is due within 21 days after service of the answering brief. Because appellant is proceeding without counsel, appellant is not required to file excerpts of record. See 9th Cir. R. 30-1.3. If appellant does not file excerpts of record, appellees must file Supplemental Excerpts of Record that contain all of the documents that are cited in the pro se opening brief or otherwise required by Rule 30-1.4, as well as the documents that are cited in the answering brief. Id. [12254778] (JMR) [Entered: 10/12/2021 05:02 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Filed order (M. MARGARET MCKEOWN and WILLIAM A. FLETCHER) Appellants motion for appointment of counsel (Docket Entry No. [ # 3 ]) is denied. No motions for reconsideration, clarification, or modification of this denial shall be filed or entertained. The opening brief is due November 29, 2021. The answering brief is due December 29, 2021. The optional reply brief is due within 21 days after service of the answering brief. Because appellant is proceeding without counsel, appellant is not required to file excerpts of record. See 9th Cir. R. 30-1.3. If appellant does not file excerpts of record, appellees must file Supplemental Excerpts of Record that contain all of the documents that are cited in the pro se opening brief or otherwise required by Rule 30-1.4, as well as the documents that are cited in the answering brief. Id. [12254778] (JMR) [Entered: 10/12/2021 05:02 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • Docket(#9) Added Attorney(s) Michael Keough for party(s) Appellee Sapient Corp.. [12240250] (RL) [Entered: 09/27/2021 02:42 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • Docket(#8) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Michael A. Keough (Steptoe & Johnson LLP, One Market Street, Spear Tower, Suite 3900, San Francisco, CA 94105) for Appellee Sapient Corp.. Date of service: 09/27/2021. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12240228] [21-16480] (Keough, Michael) [Entered: 09/27/2021 02:38 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • Docket(#7) Added Attorney(s) Michael Dockterman for party(s) Appellee Sapient Corp.. [12240096] (RL) [Entered: 09/27/2021 01:54 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • Docket(#6) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Michael Dockterman (Steptoe & Johnson LLP, 227 West Monroe Street, Suite 4700, Chicago, Illinois 60606) for Appellee Sapient Corp.. Date of service: 09/27/2021. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12239922] [21-16480] (Dockterman, Michael) [Entered: 09/27/2021 12:46 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • Docket(#5) Attorney Amy Christine Quartarolo substituted by Attorney Timothy J. Trager. [12237959] (RL) [Entered: 09/24/2021 09:37 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • Docket(#4) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Timothy J. Trager (Reicker, Pfau, Pyle & McRoy LLP) for Appellees Rachel Adamski, Robin DeShayes, Robert G Klein and Rancho San Roque, Inc.. Substitution for Attorney Amy Christine Quartarolo for Appellees Rachel Adamski, Robin DeShayes, Robert G Klein and Rancho San Roque, Inc.. Date of service: 09/24/2021. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12237940] [21-16480] (Trager, Timothy) [Entered: 09/24/2021 09:30 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Filed (ECF) Appellant Miss Haley Daria Motion for appointment of pro bono counsel. Date of service: 09/23/2021. [12237786] [21-16480] (Daria, Haley) [Entered: 09/23/2021 07:00 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed Appellant Miss Haley Daria perfecting the transcript for the appeal record/fraud on Court. Dated 09/16/2021. Paper filing deficiency: None. [12233717] (RL) [Entered: 09/20/2021 03:42 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Haley Daria opening brief due 11/08/2021. Appellees Rachel Adamski, Tani Gorre Cantil-Sakauye, Robin DeShayes, Robert G Klein, David La Fitte, Rancho San Roque, Inc., Sapient Corp. and Mack Staton answering brief due 12/08/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12224139] (JBS) [Entered: 09/09/2021 10:53 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less