This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 12/31/2019 at 06:00:17 (UTC).

Haddad v. Bryant University

Case Summary

On 11/01/2019 Haddad filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Bryant University. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-2035

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

ALEXANDRA HADDAD

Defendant / Appellee

BRYANT COLLEGE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Bridget A. Zerner

Attorney at Markham & Read

One Commercial Wharf West

Boston, MA 02110-0000

Edward C. Roy Jr.

1130 Ten Rod Road

North Kingstown, RI 02852-0000

John J.E. Markham II

Attorney at Markham & Read

One Commercial Wharf West

Boston, MA 02110-0000

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Rajaram Suryanarayan

Attorney at Gunning & LaFazia Inc

33 College Hill Rd, Ste 25B

Warwick, RI 02886-2783

 

Court Documents

Open Document #1

Abbreviated District Court Record

Open Document #2

Case Opening Notice

Open Document #3

Notice Regarding Native PDF

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MANDATE issued. [19-2035] (CMP) [Entered: 11/07/2019 09:39 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT dismissing case pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 42(b). [19-2035] (CMP) [Entered: 11/07/2019 09:38 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION of DismissaL of Appeal filed by Appellant Alexandra Haddad and Appellee Bryant College. Certificate of service dated 10/25/2019. [19-2035] (CMP) [Entered: 11/05/2019 11:13 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ELECTRONIC SUPPLEMENTAL record filed consisting of stipulation withdrawing appeal and text order transferring the stipulation to the First Circuit Court of Appeals. [19-2035] (CMP) [Entered: 11/05/2019 11:08 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #26) filed by Appellant Alexandra Haddad. Docketing Statement due 11/15/2019. Transcript Report/Order form due 11/15/2019. Appearance form due 11/15/2019. [19-2035] (CMP) [Entered: 11/01/2019 09:58 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BRYANT COLLEGE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rajaram Suryanarayan