This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 01/08/2020 at 05:11:53 (UTC).

G.W. Lisk Company, Inc. v. Power-Packer North America

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 G W Lisk Company, Inc filed an Other lawsuit against Power-Packer North America. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1323

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Appellant

G.W. LISK COMPANY, INC.

Appellee

POWER-PACKER NORTH AMERICA, INC., dba GITS Manufacturing Co.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

Michael Berchou Esq.

Appellee Attorney

Jonathan H. Margolies Esq.

 

Court Documents

#1

Notice of Docketing

1 #2

Agency Case Docketed

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2020
  • Docket(#2) Note to file: The following cases are associated: 20-1250 (Lead) with 20-1323 (Cross-Appeal). FURTHER ENTRIES WILL BE ADDED TO THE LEAD APPEAL ONLY. [660842] [20-1250, 20-1323] [MMA] [Entered: 01/06/2020 11:25 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 12/23/2019. [660839] Entry of Appearance due 01/21/2020. Certificate of Interest is due on 01/21/2020. Docketing Statement due 01/21/2020. Certified List due on 02/18/2020. [MMA] [Entered: 01/06/2020 11:15 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less