This case was last updated from PACER on 11/14/2019 at 05:02:14 (UTC).

Guzman-Mira v. Barr

Case Summary

On 11/12/2019 a Immigration - Other Immigration case was filed by Guzman-Mira against Barr in the jurisdiction of U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-3743

  • Filing Date:

    11/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Other Immigration

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Raul Alejandro Guzman-Mira

Respondent

William P. Barr, United States Attorney General

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Anne Pilsbury

Attorney at Central American Legal Assistance

240 Hooper Street

Brooklyn, NY 11211

Respondent Attorneys

OIL

Attorney at United States Department of Justice

P.O. Box 878, Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044

Laura Halliday Hickein

Attorney at United States Department of Justice

P.O. Box 878, Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044

 

Court Documents

#8

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

5 #2

Agency Enforcement/Review SERVED

5 #1

Petition_for_Review_Served_Notice

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

1 #2

Agency Review FILED

#1

Dkt_Ntc_Pet_for_Rvw

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Petitioner Raul Alejandro Guzman-Mira, USCA receipt # CA02002500, FILED.[2705621] [19-3743] [Entered: 11/13/2019 04:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ATTORNEY, Laura Halliday Hickein, [ # 6 ], in place of attorney Lisa Arnold, SUBSTITUTED.[2704839] [19-3743] [Entered: 11/13/2019 12:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Respondent William P. Barr, FILED. Service date 11/13/2019 by CM/ECF. [2704715] [19-3743] [Entered: 11/13/2019 11:39 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) PETITION FOR REVIEW OF AGENCY ORDER, SERVED. [2704020] [19-3743] [Entered: 11/12/2019 03:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) AGENCY DECISION AND ORDER, dated 10/30/2019, RECEIVED.[2704000] [19-3743] [Entered: 11/12/2019 03:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) AGENCY DECISION AND ORDER, dated 02/15/2018, RECEIVED.[2703994] [19-3743] [Entered: 11/12/2019 03:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION FOR REVIEW OF AGENCY ORDER, on behalf of Petitioner Raul Alejandro Guzman-Mira, FILED. [2703972] [19-3743] [Entered: 11/12/2019 03:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.