Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 06/13/2021 at 06:04:08 (UTC).

Guardian Tax SC, LLC v. Ralph Day

Case Summary

On 04/14/2021 Guardian Tax SC, LLC filed a Tax - Tax Claim lawsuit against Ralph Day. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-1411

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Tax Claim

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

DANIEL M. GREGORY, in his official capacity as the Charleston County Delinquent Tax Collector

RALPH DAY, a/k/a Ralph M. Day, Sr.

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, by and through its agency, The Internal Revenue Service

BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON, f/k/a Bank of New York, as Trustee for CWHEQ Revolving Home Equity Loan Trust, Series 2007-A

CHARLESTON COUNTY, SOUTH CAROLINA

VIRGINIA DAY, a/k/a Virginia D. Day

Plaintiff / Appellant

GUARDIAN TAX SC LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Bernard E. Ferrara Jr.

Attorney at CHARLESTON COUNTY ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

Lonnie Hamilton Iii Public Service Building, 4045 Bridge View Drive

North Charleston, SC 29405-0000

Kevin Michael DeAntonio Esq.

Attorney at CHARLESTON COUNTY ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

Lonnie Hamilton Iii Public Service Building, 4045 Bridge View Drive

North Charleston, SC 29405-0000

Natalie Armstrong Ham

Attorney at CHARLESTON COUNTY ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

Lonnie Hamilton Iii Public Service Building, 4045 Bridge View Drive

North Charleston, SC 29405-0000

Edward LaFrage Knisley Jr.

Attorney at SOUTH CAROLINA JUDICIAL DEPARTMENT

P. O. Box 276

Pageland, SC 29728-0000

George John Conits

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEY

55 Beattie Place

Greenville, SC 29601

Julie Ciamporcero Avetta

Attorney at U. S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

P. O. Box 502

Washington, DC 20044

Sean Matthew Foerster

Attorney at ROGERS TOWNSEND, PC

1221 Main Street

Columbia, SC 29201

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Matthew Adams Abee

Attorney at NELSON MULLINS RILEY & SCARBOROUGH, LLP

P. O. Box 11070

Columbia, SC 29211

D. Martin Warf

Attorney at NELSON MULLINS RILEY & SCARBOROUGH, LLP

Glenlake One, 4140 Parklane Avenue, P. O. Box 30519

Raleigh, NC 27612

Reed J. Hollander

Attorney at NELSON MULLINS RILEY & SCARBOROUGH, LLP

Glenlake One, 4140 Parklane Avenue, P. O. Box 30519

Raleigh, NC 27612

 

Court Documents

18 #2

JOINT APPENDIX (Volume II of II)

18 #1

JOINT APPENDIX (Volume I of II)

#17

(#17) BRIEF by Guardian Tax SC LLC in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: OPENING. [1000956770] [21-1411] Matthew Abee [Entered: 05/24/2021 05:08 PM]

#16

(#16) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Natalie A. Ham for Daniel M. Gregory and Charleston County, South Carolina. [1000943313] [21-1411] Natalie Ham [Entered: 04/29/2021 05:02 PM]

#15

(#15) DOCKETING STATEMENT by Guardian Tax SC LLC. [21-1411] Matthew Abee [Entered: 04/28/2021 08:34 PM]

#14

(#14) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Kevin M. DeAntonio for Charleston County, South Carolina and Ralph Day. [1000939657] [21-1411] Kevin DeAntonio [Entered: 04/23/2021 02:35 PM]

#13

(#13) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Daniel M. Gregory. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000939649] [21-1411] Bernard Ferrara [Entered: 04/23/2021 02:26 PM]

#12

(#12) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Charleston County, South Carolina. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000939648] [21-1411] Bernard Ferrara [Entered: 04/23/2021 02:23 PM]

#11

(#11) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Bernard E. Ferrara, Jr. for Charleston County, South Carolina and Daniel M. Gregory. [1000939642] [21-1411] Bernard Ferrara [Entered: 04/23/2021 02:19 PM]

#10

(#10) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Reed J. Hollander for Guardian Tax SC LLC. [1000938193] [21-1411] Reed Hollander [Entered: 04/21/2021 05:13 PM]

#9

(#9) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by D. Martin Warf for Guardian Tax SC LLC. [1000938050] [21-1411] D. Warf [Entered: 04/21/2021 02:46 PM]

#8

(#8) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Guardian Tax SC LLC. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000938029] [21-1411] Matthew Abee [Entered: 04/21/2021 02:28 PM]

#7

(#7) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Matthew A. Abee for Guardian Tax SC LLC. [1000938024] [21-1411] Matthew Abee [Entered: 04/21/2021 02:26 PM]

#6

(#6) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Julie Ciamporcero Avetta for US. [1000936033] [21-1411] Julie Avetta [Entered: 04/19/2021 10:57 AM]

#5

(#5) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bank of New York Mellon. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000934279] [21-1411] Sean Foerster [Entered: 04/14/2021 05:39 PM]

#4

(#4) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Sean Matthew Foerster for Bank of New York Mellon. [1000934277] [21-1411] Sean Foerster [Entered: 04/14/2021 05:38 PM]

#3

(#3) BRIEFING ORDER filed. Paper copy requirements are temporarily suspended unless the case is under pre-argument review or being scheduled for argument, in which case a total of four paper copies of formal briefs and appendices are required. Opening Brief and Appendix due 05/24/2021. Response Brief due 06/23/2021. [21-1411] AB [Entered: 04/14/2021 12:57 PM]

#1

(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 2:18-cv-01686-BHH. Case manager: ABrownlee. [21-1411] AB [Entered: 04/14/2021 12:51 PM]

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) JOINT APPENDIX (electronic and paper form) by Guardian Tax SC LLC. Digital media exhibit volume? No. [1000956779] [21-1411] Matthew Abee [Entered: 05/24/2021 05:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) BRIEF by Guardian Tax SC LLC in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: OPENING. [1000956770] [21-1411] Matthew Abee [Entered: 05/24/2021 05:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Natalie A. Ham for Daniel M. Gregory and Charleston County, South Carolina. [1000943313] [21-1411] Natalie Ham [Entered: 04/29/2021 05:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) DOCKETING STATEMENT by Guardian Tax SC LLC. [21-1411] Matthew Abee [Entered: 04/28/2021 08:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Kevin M. DeAntonio for Charleston County, South Carolina and Ralph Day. [1000939657] [21-1411] Kevin DeAntonio [Entered: 04/23/2021 02:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Daniel M. Gregory. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000939649] [21-1411] Bernard Ferrara [Entered: 04/23/2021 02:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Charleston County, South Carolina. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000939648] [21-1411] Bernard Ferrara [Entered: 04/23/2021 02:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Bernard E. Ferrara, Jr. for Charleston County, South Carolina and Daniel M. Gregory. [1000939642] [21-1411] Bernard Ferrara [Entered: 04/23/2021 02:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Reed J. Hollander for Guardian Tax SC LLC. [1000938193] [21-1411] Reed Hollander [Entered: 04/21/2021 05:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by D. Martin Warf for Guardian Tax SC LLC. [1000938050] [21-1411] D. Warf [Entered: 04/21/2021 02:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Guardian Tax SC LLC. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000938029] [21-1411] Matthew Abee [Entered: 04/21/2021 02:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Matthew A. Abee for Guardian Tax SC LLC. [1000938024] [21-1411] Matthew Abee [Entered: 04/21/2021 02:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Julie Ciamporcero Avetta for US. [1000936033] [21-1411] Julie Avetta [Entered: 04/19/2021 10:57 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bank of New York Mellon. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000934279] [21-1411] Sean Foerster [Entered: 04/14/2021 05:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Sean Matthew Foerster for Bank of New York Mellon. [1000934277] [21-1411] Sean Foerster [Entered: 04/14/2021 05:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) BRIEFING ORDER filed. Paper copy requirements are temporarily suspended unless the case is under pre-argument review or being scheduled for argument, in which case a total of four paper copies of formal briefs and appendices are required. Opening Brief and Appendix due 05/24/2021. Response Brief due 06/23/2021. [21-1411] AB [Entered: 04/14/2021 12:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case. Originating case number: 2:18-cv-01686-BHH. Mailed to: Edward LaFrage Knisley Jr. [21-1411] AB [Entered: 04/14/2021 12:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 2:18-cv-01686-BHH. Case manager: ABrownlee. [21-1411] AB [Entered: 04/14/2021 12:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Charleston County, South Carolina is a litigant

Latest cases where The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew Adams Abee(Designation Retained)