Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 08/03/2020 at 06:03:26 (UTC).

Guangcun Huang v. Tim Huang, et al

Case Summary

On 06/04/2020 Guangcun Huang filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Tim Huang. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-50445

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

GUANGCUN HUANG

San Antonio, TX 78229

Defendant / Appellees

WILLIAM L. HENRICH, President, UTHSCSA

OTHER UTHSCSA'S EMPLOYEES

DEANNA HESTER

CHUN-LIN LIN

KOHZOH MITSUYA

JANE DOES

TIM HUI-MING HUANG

JOHN DOES

JENNIFER S. POTTER

UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS HEALTH SCIENCE CENTER AT SAN ANTONIO

CHUN-LIANG CHEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Guangcun Huang

P.O. Box 40501

San Antonio, TX 78229

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Amy Snow Hilton

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

300 W. 15Th Street, William P. Clements Building

Austin, TX 78701

 

Court Documents

Open Document

CLERK ORDER granting Motion for leave for pro se to file electronically filed by Appellant Mr. Guangcun Huang [ # 9362464-2 ] [20-50445] (CAS) [Entered: 07/24/2020 10:43 AM]

Open Document

MOTION filed by Appellant Mr. Guangcun Huang for leave to file electronically as a pro se party [9362464-2]. Date of service: 07/23/2020 [20-50445] (CAS) [Entered: 07/24/2020 09:11 AM]

Open Document

BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 08/04/2020 for Appellant Guangcun Huang. [20-50445] (MAS) [Entered: 06/25/2020 03:24 PM]

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellant Mr. Guangcun Huang advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. [20-50445] (CAS) [Entered: 06/11/2020 10:52 AM]

Open Document

INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9330345-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [20-50445] (CB) [Entered: 06/09/2020 08:59 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM received from Amy Snow Hilton for Mr. Chun-Liang Chen, Mr. William L. Henrich, Ms. Deanna Hester, Mr. Tim Hui-Ming Huang, Mr. Chun-Lin Lin, Mr. Kohzoh Mitsuya, Ms. Jennifer S. Potter and University of Texas Health Science Center at San Antonio for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-50445] (Amy Snow Hilton ) [Entered: 06/04/2020 11:20 AM]

Open Document

CIVIL RIGHTS CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Guangcun Huang [20-50445] (MBC) [Entered: 06/04/2020 09:41 AM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK ORDER granting Motion for leave for pro se to file electronically filed by Appellant Mr. Guangcun Huang [ # 9362464-2 ] [20-50445] (CAS) [Entered: 07/24/2020 10:43 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION filed by Appellant Mr. Guangcun Huang for leave to file electronically as a pro se party [9362464-2]. Date of service: 07/23/2020 [20-50445] (CAS) [Entered: 07/24/2020 09:11 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 08/04/2020 for Appellant Guangcun Huang. [20-50445] (MAS) [Entered: 06/25/2020 03:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • DocketELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Admitted Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Video/Audio Exhibits on File in District Court? No Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [20-50445] (MAS) [Entered: 06/25/2020 03:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellant Mr. Guangcun Huang advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. [20-50445] (CAS) [Entered: 06/11/2020 10:52 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • DocketELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED FROM DISTRICT COURT for 5:19-CV-763. Electronic ROA due on 06/24/2020. [20-50445] (CB) [Entered: 06/09/2020 09:01 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9330345-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [20-50445] (CB) [Entered: 06/09/2020 08:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Amy Snow Hilton for Appellee William L. Henrich in 20-50445, Attorney Amy Snow Hilton for Appellee Jennifer S. Potter in 20-50445, Attorney Amy Snow Hilton for Appellee University of Texas Health Science Center at San Antonio in 20-50445, Attorney Amy Snow Hilton for Appellee Deanna Hester in 20-50445, Attorney Amy Snow Hilton for Appellee Kohzoh Mitsuya in 20-50445, Attorney Amy Snow Hilton for Appellee Chun-Lin Lin in 20-50445, Attorney Amy Snow Hilton for Appellee Chun-Liang Chen in 20-50445, Attorney Amy Snow Hilton for Appellee Tim Hui-Ming Huang in 20-50445 [20-50445] (CAS) [Entered: 06/05/2020 01:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM received from Amy Snow Hilton for Mr. Chun-Liang Chen, Mr. William L. Henrich, Ms. Deanna Hester, Mr. Tim Hui-Ming Huang, Mr. Chun-Lin Lin, Mr. Kohzoh Mitsuya, Ms. Jennifer S. Potter and University of Texas Health Science Center at San Antonio for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-50445] (Amy Snow Hilton ) [Entered: 06/04/2020 11:20 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL RIGHTS CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Guangcun Huang [20-50445] (MBC) [Entered: 06/04/2020 09:41 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS HEALTH SCIENCE CENTER AT HOUSTON (THE) is a litigant