This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 10/14/2019 at 06:07:33 (UTC).

Grouse River Outfitters, Ltd. v. ORCL, et al

Case Summary

On 08/15/2019 Grouse River Outfitters, Ltd filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against ORCL,. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-16602

  • Filing Date:

    08/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

 

Party Details

Petitioner

EMILY HOLTON

Defendant

NETSUITE, INC.

Plaintiff / Appellant

GROUSE RIVER OUTFITTERS, LTD.

Defendant / Appellee

ORACLE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Loren Kieve

Stephen D. Susman Esquire

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Sarah Meyers Ray

Elyse M. Greenwald

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter

1 #2

Mediation Letter

1 #3

Mediation Questionnaire

1 #4

Case Opening Packet

#2

#4

#5

#6

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant further settlement discussions. [11452139] (CL) [Entered: 10/02/2019 04:34 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Conference, 10/01/2019, 11:00 a.m. Pacific Time. See order for details. [11438212] (CL) [Entered: 09/20/2019 08:18 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 09/18/2019, 2:00 p.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11420481] (CL) [Entered: 09/04/2019 11:53 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • Docket(#3) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 08/19/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11402855][19-16602] (AD) [Entered: 08/19/2019 06:44 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellant Grouse River Outfitters, Ltd. Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 08/19/2019. [11402269] [19-16602] (Kieve, Loren) [Entered: 08/19/2019 02:22 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 08/22/2019. Transcript ordered by 09/13/2019. Transcript due 10/15/2019. Appellant Grouse River Outfitters, Ltd. opening brief due 11/20/2019. Appellee Oracle Corporation answering brief due 12/20/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11398018] (RT) [Entered: 08/15/2019 09:22 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less