This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2019 at 06:02:26 (UTC).

Gregory Stokes v. Detroit Public Schools

Case Summary

On 07/16/2019 Gregory Stokes filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Detroit Public Schools. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Sixth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1773

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Sixth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellee

DETROIT PUBLIC SCHOOLS

Plaintiff / Appellant

GREGORY STOKES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Phyllis L. Hurks-Hill

Attorney at Detroit Public Schools

3011 W. Grand Boulevard, Suite 1800

Detroit, MI 48202

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Leonard Mungo

Attorney at Mungo Law Firm

333 W. Fort Street, Suite 1500

Detroit, MI 48226

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) The Telephone Mediation conference has been rescheduled for 08/05/2017 at 2:00 PM (ET) with Rod McFaull. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (LMR) [Entered: 07/25/2019 05:17 PM]

#12

RESTRICTED

#14

(#14) MOTION filed by Mr. Leonard Mungo for Gregory Stokes to extend time to file brief. Certificate of Service: 08/29/2019. [19-1773] (LM) [Entered: 08/29/2019 10:10 AM]

#15

(#15) RULING LETTER SENT granting motion to extend time to file brief [ # 14 ] filed by Mr. Leonard Mungo; resetting briefing schedule: appellant brief now due 10/03/2019; appellee brief now due 11/04/2019. (KSF) [Entered: 08/29/2019 11:41 AM]

#6

(#6) CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Leonard Mungo for Appellant Gregory Stokes. Certificate of Service:07/24/2019. [19-1773] (LM) [Entered: 07/24/2019 04:24 PM]

#7

(#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Leonard Mungo for Appellant Gregory Stokes Certificate of Service: 07/24/2019. [19-1773] (LM) [Entered: 07/24/2019 04:38 PM]

#5

(#5) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Gregory Stokes by Leonard Mungo. Certificate of Service: 07/24/2019. [19-1773] (LM) [Entered: 07/24/2019 04:19 PM]

#9

(#9) BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 09/03/2019; appellee brief due 10/03/2019. (KSF) [Entered: 07/25/2019 07:11 AM]

#4

(#4) A Telephone Mediation conference has been scheduled for 08/07/2019 at 10:00 AM (ET) with Rod McFaull. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (LMR) [Entered: 07/17/2019 04:19 PM]

#1

(#1) Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Gregory Stokes. Transcript needed: y. (KSF) [Entered: 07/16/2019 03:51 PM]

#13

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) RULING LETTER SENT granting motion to extend time to file brief [ # 14 ] filed by Mr. Leonard Mungo; resetting briefing schedule: appellant brief now due 10/03/2019; appellee brief now due 11/04/2019. (KSF) [Entered: 08/29/2019 11:41 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) MOTION filed by Mr. Leonard Mungo for Gregory Stokes to extend time to file brief. Certificate of Service: 08/29/2019. [19-1773] (LM) [Entered: 08/29/2019 10:10 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ***ENTRY LOCKED - COUNSEL INSTRUCTED TO REFILE THE MOTION AND CHOOSE THE SECOND RELIEF OF EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF.*** MOTION filed by Mr. Leonard Mungo for Gregory Stokes to extend time APPELLANT GREGORY STOKES UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE APPELLANTS BRIEF Certificate of Service: 08/29/2019. [19-1773]--[Edited 08/29/2019 by KSF] (LM) [Entered: 08/29/2019 09:21 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ***ENTRY LOCKED - COUNSEL IS INSTRUCTED TO REFILE THE MOTION USING THE CORRECT RELIEF OF EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF INSTEAD OF GENERIC RELIEF.*** MOTION filed by Mr. Leonard Mungo for Gregory Stokes to extend timeCertificate of Service: 08/28/2019. [19-1773]--[Edited 08/29/2019 by KSF] (LM) [Entered: 08/28/2019 05:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • (#11) Mediation Office is no longer involved in this appeal. (MLB) [Entered: 08/23/2019 10:06 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) The Telephone Mediation conference has been rescheduled for 08/05/2017 at 2:00 PM (ET) with Rod McFaull. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (LMR) [Entered: 07/25/2019 05:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 09/03/2019; appellee brief due 10/03/2019. (KSF) [Entered: 07/25/2019 07:11 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • (#8) TRANSCRIPT ORDER filed - transcript is already on file in the District Court Clerks Office. Filed by Mr. Leonard Mungo for Gregory Stokes. Certificate of Service: 07/24/2019. [19-1773] (LM) [Entered: 07/24/2019 04:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Leonard Mungo for Appellant Gregory Stokes Certificate of Service: 07/24/2019. [19-1773] (LM) [Entered: 07/24/2019 04:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Leonard Mungo for Appellant Gregory Stokes. Certificate of Service:07/24/2019. [19-1773] (LM) [Entered: 07/24/2019 04:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Gregory Stokes by Leonard Mungo. Certificate of Service: 07/24/2019. [19-1773] (LM) [Entered: 07/24/2019 04:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) A Telephone Mediation conference has been scheduled for 08/07/2019 at 10:00 AM (ET) with Rod McFaull. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (LMR) [Entered: 07/17/2019 04:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • (#3) Mediation Office is involved in this appeal. (LMR) [Entered: 07/17/2019 04:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • (#2) The case manager for this case is: Karen Fultz. (KSF) [Entered: 07/16/2019 03:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Gregory Stokes. Transcript needed: y. (KSF) [Entered: 07/16/2019 03:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.