This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 02/15/2021 at 06:16:27 (UTC).

Gregory Ohlinger, et al v. USA, et al

Case Summary

On 12/17/2020 Gregory Ohlinger filed a Tax - Tax Claim lawsuit against USA. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-17443

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Tax Claim

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants

GREGORY K. OHLINGER

DEBRA L. OHLINGER, husband and wife

Defendant / Appellees

MARICOPOLY LLC, an Arizona limited liability company

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Brandon Anthony Keim

Attorney at Frazer Ryan Goldberg & Arnold LLP

1850 N. Central Avenue, Suite 1800

Phoenix, AZ 85004

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Lawrence Keith Lynde Esquire

Attorney at Law Office of Lawrence K Lynde

3101 N Central Avenue, Suite 1470

Phoenix, AZ 85012

Lawrence K. Lynde

Attorney at Law Office of Lawrence K Lynde

3101 N Central Avenue, Suite 1470

Phoenix, AZ 85012

Edith Carmen Ramirez

Attorney at DOJ - U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

P.O. Box 683, Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044-0683

E. Carmen Ramirez

Attorney at DOJ - U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

P.O. Box 683, Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044-0683

Pooja Boisture

Attorney at DOJ - U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

P.O. Box 502

Washington, DC 20044

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant settlement discussions while the appeal is pending. [11999840] (BLS) [Entered: 02/10/2021 03:54 PM]

#5

(#5) Filed order MEDIATION (BLS): The Mediation Program of the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals facilitates settlement while appeals are pending. See Fed. R. App. P. 33 and Ninth Cir. R. 33-1. The court has scheduled a telephone assessment conference with counsel and Circuit Mediator Sasha M. Cummings at the date and time indicated above to explore settlement potential. Circuit Mediator Sasha M. Cummings will initiate the conference by contacting each attorney on the attached list of participants at the telephone number listed. Please be available for the call at least five minutes before the scheduled time. Counsel should review the attached list and inform the Mediation Case Manager by email (Sasha_M_Cummings@ca9.uscourts.gov) of any revisions to the list, including the direct dial telephone number of any participant if it is not listed and the names of any attorneys who will not be participating in the conference. Also, if counsel has an unavoidable scheduling conflict, please notify Circuit Mediator Sasha M. Cummings immediately by email (Sasha_M_Cummings@ca9.uscourts.gov) and copy all counsel on any such communications. All emails should include the Ninth Circuit case name and number in the subject line. All discussions that take place in the context of the assessment conference are confidential. See Circuit Rule 33-1. [11948575] (OC) [Entered: 12/30/2020 11:29 AM]

#2

(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellants Debra L. Ohlinger and Gregory K. Ohlinger Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 12/22/2020. [11936197] [20-17443] (Keim, Brandon) [Entered: 12/22/2020 08:23 AM]

1 #6

Case Opening Packet

1 #5

Mediation Questionnaire

1 #4

Mediation Letter

1 #3

Attorneys Not Registered for E-Filing

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant settlement discussions while the appeal is pending. [11999840] (BLS) [Entered: 02/10/2021 03:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • Docket(#7) Added Attorney(s) Pooja Boisture for party(s) Appellee USA, in case 20-17443. [11951357] (JFF) [Entered: 01/04/2021 02:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • Docket(#6) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Pooja A. Boisture (U.S. Department of Justice, Tax Division, Appellate Section, Post Office Box 502, Washington, D.C. 20044) for Appellee USA. Date of service: 01/04/2021. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11951081] [20-17443] (Boisture, Pooja) [Entered: 01/04/2021 12:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Filed order MEDIATION (BLS): The Mediation Program of the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals facilitates settlement while appeals are pending. See Fed. R. App. P. 33 and Ninth Cir. R. 33-1. The court has scheduled a telephone assessment conference with counsel and Circuit Mediator Sasha M. Cummings at the date and time indicated above to explore settlement potential. Circuit Mediator Sasha M. Cummings will initiate the conference by contacting each attorney on the attached list of participants at the telephone number listed. Please be available for the call at least five minutes before the scheduled time. Counsel should review the attached list and inform the Mediation Case Manager by email (Sasha_M_Cummings@ca9.uscourts.gov) of any revisions to the list, including the direct dial telephone number of any participant if it is not listed and the names of any attorneys who will not be participating in the conference. Also, if counsel has an unavoidable scheduling conflict, please notify Circuit Mediator Sasha M. Cummings immediately by email (Sasha_M_Cummings@ca9.uscourts.gov) and copy all counsel on any such communications. All emails should include the Ninth Circuit case name and number in the subject line. All discussions that take place in the context of the assessment conference are confidential. See Circuit Rule 33-1. [11948575] (OC) [Entered: 12/30/2020 11:29 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • Docket(#4) Deleted Incorrect Entry. Entered in error. [11948215] (BLS) [Entered: 12/30/2020 08:17 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • Docket(#3) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 12/22/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11936860]. [20-17443] (AD) [Entered: 12/22/2020 12:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellants Debra L. Ohlinger and Gregory K. Ohlinger Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 12/22/2020. [11936197] [20-17443] (Keim, Brandon) [Entered: 12/22/2020 08:23 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants Debra L. Ohlinger and Gregory K. Ohlinger Mediation Questionnaire due on 12/24/2020. Transcript ordered by 01/14/2021. Transcript due 02/16/2021. Appellants Debra L. Ohlinger and Gregory K. Ohlinger opening brief due 03/25/2021. Appellees Maricopoly LLC and United States of America answering brief due 04/26/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11931847] (RT) [Entered: 12/17/2020 03:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Edith Carmen Ramirez

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lawrence Keith Lynde