This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2021 at 05:07:40 (UTC).

Gregory Myers v. Offit Kurman, P.A.

Case Summary

On 10/20/2021 Gregory Myers filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Offit Kurman, P A. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-2179

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BARBARA ANN KELLY

Appellant

GREGORY B. MYERS

Naples, FL 34102

Defendant / Appellee

OFFIT KURMAN, P.A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

Gregory B. Myers

700 Gulf Shore Boulevard North

Naples, FL 34102

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) RECORD requested from Clerk of Court. Due: 11/03/2021. [21-2179] RE [Entered: 10/20/2021 10:06 AM]

#3

(#3) INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Gregory Myers. Informal Opening Brief due 11/15/2021 Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. [21-2179] RE [Entered: 10/20/2021 10:01 AM]

#2

IFP Application

2 #1

Fee notice

#1

(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:17-cv-03668-CCB. Case manager: REdwards. [21-2179] RE [Entered: 10/20/2021 09:30 AM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RECORD requested from Clerk of Court. Due: 11/03/2021. [21-2179] RE [Entered: 10/20/2021 10:06 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Gregory Myers. Informal Opening Brief due 11/15/2021 Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. [21-2179] RE [Entered: 10/20/2021 10:01 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) FEE NOTICE issued to Gregory B. Myers - initial notice. Fee or application to proceed as indigent due 11/19/2021 Originating case number: 1:17-cv-03668-CCB. Mailed to: Gregory Myers. [21-2179] RE [Entered: 10/20/2021 10:00 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:17-cv-03668-CCB. Case manager: REdwards. [21-2179] RE [Entered: 10/20/2021 09:30 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less