This case was last updated from PACER on 05/03/2019 at 06:04:40 (UTC).

Gregory Greer v. General Dynamics

Case Summary

On 03/04/2019 Gregory Greer filed an Other lawsuit against General Dynamics. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1235

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellee

GENERAL DYNAMICS INFORMATION TECHNOLOGY, INCORPORATED, a Delaware Corporation doing business in the state of Maryland

Plaintiff / Appellant

GREGORY GREER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Christopher Eric Humber

Attorney at OGLETREE DEAKINS NASH SMOAK & STEWART, PC

1909 K Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Ralph Stephen Greer

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF RALPH GREER

10401 Grosvenor Place

Rockville, MD 20852

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) BRIEFING ORDER filed. Opening Brief and Appendix due 04/15/2019. Response Brief due 05/13/2019. [19-1235] JSN [Entered: 03/04/2019 10:34 AM]

#8

(#8) DOCKETING FORMS FOLLOW-UP NOTICE ISSUED to Raplh Greer re: filing of appearance form, filing of disclosure form. Forms due on 03/29/2019. [19-1235] JSN [Entered: 03/26/2019 11:23 AM]

#10

(#10) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Gregory Greer. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000482907] [19-1235] Ralph Greer [Entered: 03/27/2019 12:06 PM]

#13

(#13) BRIEF by Gregory Greer in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: OPENING. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 04/30/2019. [1000502545] [19-1235] Ralph Greer [Entered: 04/29/2019 02:10 PM]

#6

(#6) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by General Dynamics Information Technology, Incorporated. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000477589] [19-1235] Christopher Humber [Entered: 03/18/2019 06:37 PM]

#7

(#7) DOCKETING STATEMENT by Gregory Greer. [19-1235] Ralph Greer [Entered: 03/25/2019 11:06 AM]

#12

(#12) ORDER filed [1000484541] extending filing time for opening brief and appendix until 4/30/2019. Number of days granted: 15. Opening brief and appendix due 04/30/2019. Response brief due 05/30/2019. Copies to all parties. [19-1235] JSN [Entered: 03/29/2019 10:19 AM]

#1

(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 8:18-cv-01193-PWG. Case manager: JeffNeal. [19-1235] JSN [Entered: 03/04/2019 10:30 AM]

#9

(#9) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Ralph S. Greer for Gregory Greer. [1000482903] [19-1235] Ralph Greer [Entered: 03/27/2019 12:02 PM]

#14

(#14) FULL ELECTRONIC APPENDIX and full paper appendix by Gregory Greer. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date paper copies mailed dispatched or delivered to court: 04/30/2019. [1000502556] [19-1235] Ralph Greer [Entered: 04/29/2019 02:13 PM]

#2

(#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case. Originating case number: 8:18-cv-01193-PWG. [19-1235] JSN [Entered: 03/04/2019 10:33 AM]

#5

(#5) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Christopher E. Humber for General Dynamics Information Technology, Incorporated. [1000477588] [19-1235] Christopher Humber [Entered: 03/18/2019 06:35 PM]

#4

(#4) NOTICE ISSUED to Ralph Greer re: change of address. [19-1235] JSN [Entered: 03/04/2019 10:55 AM]

#11

(#11) Initial mediation conference scheduled. LOGIN TO CMECF TO VIEW ATTACHED DOCS BEFORE CLICKING LINK. [19-1235] MRB [Entered: 03/29/2019 09:54 AM]

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Receipt of paper copy of APPENDIX filed at [ # 14 ] by Gregory Greer. Total number of volumes (including any sealed): [1]. Total number of pages in all volumes: [152]. Total number of sealed volumes: 0. Sufficient? Yes. CD/DVD/Other exhibit? No. Number of copies: [1]. Received by clerk date: 04/30/2019. [1000504405] [19-1235] JSN [Entered: 05/01/2019 10:22 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Receipt of paper copy of OPENING BRIEF filed at [ # 13 ] by Gregory Greer. Number of pages: [21]. Sufficient: Yes. Number of copies: [1]. Received by clerk date: 04/30/2019. [1000504403] [19-1235] JSN [Entered: 05/01/2019 10:21 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) FULL ELECTRONIC APPENDIX and full paper appendix by Gregory Greer. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date paper copies mailed dispatched or delivered to court: 04/30/2019. [1000502556] [19-1235] Ralph Greer [Entered: 04/29/2019 02:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) BRIEF by Gregory Greer in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: OPENING. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 04/30/2019. [1000502545] [19-1235] Ralph Greer [Entered: 04/29/2019 02:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER filed [1000484541] extending filing time for opening brief and appendix until 4/30/2019. Number of days granted: 15. Opening brief and appendix due 04/30/2019. Response brief due 05/30/2019. Copies to all parties. [19-1235] JSN [Entered: 03/29/2019 10:19 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Initial mediation conference scheduled. LOGIN TO CMECF TO VIEW ATTACHED DOCS BEFORE CLICKING LINK. [19-1235] MRB [Entered: 03/29/2019 09:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Gregory Greer. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000482907] [19-1235] Ralph Greer [Entered: 03/27/2019 12:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Ralph S. Greer for Gregory Greer. [1000482903] [19-1235] Ralph Greer [Entered: 03/27/2019 12:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) DOCKETING FORMS FOLLOW-UP NOTICE ISSUED to Raplh Greer re: filing of appearance form, filing of disclosure form. Forms due on 03/29/2019. [19-1235] JSN [Entered: 03/26/2019 11:23 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) DOCKETING STATEMENT by Gregory Greer. [19-1235] Ralph Greer [Entered: 03/25/2019 11:06 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by General Dynamics Information Technology, Incorporated. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000477589] [19-1235] Christopher Humber [Entered: 03/18/2019 06:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Christopher E. Humber for General Dynamics Information Technology, Incorporated. [1000477588] [19-1235] Christopher Humber [Entered: 03/18/2019 06:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE ISSUED to Ralph Greer re: change of address. [19-1235] JSN [Entered: 03/04/2019 10:55 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) BRIEFING ORDER filed. Opening Brief and Appendix due 04/15/2019. Response Brief due 05/13/2019. [19-1235] JSN [Entered: 03/04/2019 10:34 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case. Originating case number: 8:18-cv-01193-PWG. [19-1235] JSN [Entered: 03/04/2019 10:33 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 8:18-cv-01193-PWG. Case manager: JeffNeal. [19-1235] JSN [Entered: 03/04/2019 10:30 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.