Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 02/07/2020 at 06:05:45 (UTC).

Greg Knowles, et al v. ARRIS International Plc

Case Summary

On 12/09/2019 Greg Knowles filed a Contract - Product Liability lawsuit against ARRIS International Plc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-17468

  • Filing Date:

    12/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

WILLIAM HAWORTH

DAVID S. EISEN

KELLY SMITH

PAUL DUBEY

JOSEPH PALMA

MATTHEW PENNER

MIKE ALEXANDER

WES TILLEY

MARCO FERNANDEZ

KACI ROAR

DAMIEN PROBE

WILLIAM ROSENBERG

MICHAEL PERSON

JON WALTON

ANDREW PROWANT

CHRISTOPHER STEVENS

MICHAEL BRESLINE

Plaintiff / Appellant

BRIAN ALEXANDER, Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated

Defendant / Appellee

ARRIS INTERNATIONAL PLC

Not Classified By Court

INTEL CORPORATION

13 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Willem Jonckheer Esquire

Attorney at Schubert Jonckheer & Kolbe LLP

Three Embarcadero Center

San Francisco, CA 94111

Robert C. Schubert

Attorney at Schubert Jonckheer & Kolbe LLP

Three Embarcadero Center

San Francisco, CA 94111

Noah Schubert

Attorney at Schubert Jonckheer & Kolbe

3 Embarcadero Center

San Francisco, CA 94111

Dustin Schubert

Attorney at Schubert Jonckheer & Kolbe LLP

Three Embarcadero Center

San Francisco, CA 94111

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Nancy Louise Stagg Esquire

Attorney at Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton LLP

11225 El Camino Real, Suite 250

San Diego, CA 92130

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) Filed order MEDIATION (BS): The courts order filed December 24, 2019, was issued in error and is vacated. [11543385] (OC) [Entered: 12/24/2019 11:19 AM]

#5

(#5) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The Mediation Program of the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals facilitates settlement while appeals are pending. By 01/07/2020, counsel for all parties intending to file briefs in this matter are requested to inform the Circuit Mediator by email of their clients' views on whether the issues on appeal or the underlying dispute might be amenable to settlement presently or in the foreseeable future. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested... This communication should not be filed with the court... The existing briefing schedule remains in effect... [11543121] (BLS) [Entered: 12/24/2019 08:46 AM]

#4

(#4) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is NOT SELECTED for inclusion in the Mediation Program. Counsel may contact circuit mediator to discuss services available through the court's mediation program, to request a settlement assessment conf, or to request a stay of the appeal for settlement purposes. Also, upon agreement of the parties, the brfing sch can be modified or vacated to facilitate settlement discussions. Csl are requested to send copies of this order to their clients. Info regarding the mediation program may be found at www.ca9.uscourts.gov/mediation. [11542961] (BLS) [Entered: 12/23/2019 05:23 PM]

#2

(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellants Greg Knowles and Brian Alexander Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 12/16/2019. [11534388] [19-17468] (Schubert, Noah) [Entered: 12/16/2019 07:21 PM]

1 #5

Case Opening Packet

1 #4

Mediation Questionnaire

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Filed order MEDIATION (BS): The courts order filed December 24, 2019, was issued in error and is vacated. [11543385] (OC) [Entered: 12/24/2019 11:19 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The Mediation Program of the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals facilitates settlement while appeals are pending. By 01/07/2020, counsel for all parties intending to file briefs in this matter are requested to inform the Circuit Mediator by email of their clients' views on whether the issues on appeal or the underlying dispute might be amenable to settlement presently or in the foreseeable future. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested... This communication should not be filed with the court... The existing briefing schedule remains in effect... [11543121] (BLS) [Entered: 12/24/2019 08:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is NOT SELECTED for inclusion in the Mediation Program. Counsel may contact circuit mediator to discuss services available through the court's mediation program, to request a settlement assessment conf, or to request a stay of the appeal for settlement purposes. Also, upon agreement of the parties, the brfing sch can be modified or vacated to facilitate settlement discussions. Csl are requested to send copies of this order to their clients. Info regarding the mediation program may be found at www.ca9.uscourts.gov/mediation. [11542961] (BLS) [Entered: 12/23/2019 05:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • Docket(#3) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 12/16/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11534431]. [19-17468] (AD) [Entered: 12/17/2019 06:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellants Greg Knowles and Brian Alexander Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 12/16/2019. [11534388] [19-17468] (Schubert, Noah) [Entered: 12/16/2019 07:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants Brian Alexander and Greg Knowles Mediation Questionnaire due on 12/16/2019. Transcript ordered by 01/06/2020. Transcript due 02/04/2020. Appellants Brian Alexander and Greg Knowles opening brief due 03/16/2020. Appellee ARRIS International Plc answering brief due 04/16/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11525441] (RT) [Entered: 12/09/2019 11:55 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Intel Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Arris International Public Limited Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nancy L Stagg