This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 11/07/2022 at 06:20:35 (UTC).

Green Tree Servicing, LLC v. Marc Weinberger

Case Summary

On 09/08/2022 Green Tree Servicing, LLC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Marc Weinberger. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-13040

  • Filing Date:

    09/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellee

GREEN TREE SERVICING, LLC

Defendant / Appellant

MARC WEINBERGER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorney

Scott Alan Brown

Defendant / Appellant Attorney

Marc Weinberger

 

Court Documents

Open Document #1

DKT-7CIV Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document #2

Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

Open Document #3

USDC ORDER DE# 7

Open Document

NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Marc Weinberger. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. If you are an appellant or petitioner, upon expiration of 14 days from the date of this notice, your appeal will be dismissed for want of prosecution if the default has not been remedied, pursuant to 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-5(c) and 42-1(b). If you are an appellee or respondent, no action will be taken on documents submitted until the CIP deficiency is remedied. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-5. [Entered: 10/04/2022 11:14 AM]

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Party Marc Weinberger. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [22-13040] (ECF: Marc Weinberger) [Entered: 10/12/2022 05:06 PM]

Open Document #1

DIS-4 Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document #2

Court Order Filed

 

Docket Entries

10/19/2022
View Court Documents

DocketORDER: On its own motion, the court DISMISSES the appeal for lack of jurisdiction. KCN, ELB and RJL (See attached order for complete text) [Entered: 10/19/2022 12:14 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/12/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCertificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Party Marc Weinberger. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [22-13040] (ECF: Marc Weinberger) [Entered: 10/12/2022 05:06 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/04/2022
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Marc Weinberger. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. If you are an appellant or petitioner, upon expiration of 14 days from the date of this notice, your appeal will be dismissed for want of prosecution if the default has not been remedied, pursuant to 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-5(c) and 42-1(b). If you are an appellee or respondent, no action will be taken on documents submitted until the CIP deficiency is remedied. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-5. [Entered: 10/04/2022 11:14 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/08/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Marc Weinberger on 09/07/2022. Fee Status: Fee Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. The appellant's brief is due on or before 10/18/2022. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 09/28/2022 as to Appellant Marc Weinberger. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 10/12/2022 as to Appellee Green Tree Servicing, LLC [Entered: 09/14/2022 01:55 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less