This case was last updated from PACER on 04/30/2019 at 06:03:58 (UTC).

Green Tree Servicing LLC v. David Cargille, et al

Case Summary

On 03/01/2019 Green Tree Servicing LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against David Cargille. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1437

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees and Defendants

CHRISTOPHER JONES

RONALD SIMPSON

SAFEGUARD REAL ESTATE PROPERTIES LLC

SAFEGUARD REALTY MANAGEMENT OF NEW YORK CO

ERIKA LANCE

SAFEGUARD PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT LLC

NATIONWIDE TITLE CLEARING, DBA NTC

NEW YORK FIELD SERVICING

KML LAW GROUP PC

Plaintiff / Appellee

GREEN TREE SERVICING LLC, NKA Ditech Financial LLC

Defendant / Appellants

JULIE L. CARGILLE

DAVID L. CARGILLE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Gina Calabria Esq.

Attorney at Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker

200 Campus Drive, 4Th Floor

Florham Park, NJ 07932

Janeen M. Thomas Esq.

Attorney at Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker

1133 Westchester Avenue

White Plains, NY 10604

Anne M. Dalena Esq.

Attorney at Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker

200 Campus Drive, 4Th Floor

Florham Park, NJ 07932

Betsy Ann Rosenbloom Esq.

Attorney at Williams Caliri Miller & Otley

1680 Route 23, Suite 425

Wayne, NJ 07470

Andrew C. Sayles Esq.

Attorney at Connell Foley

56 Livingston Avenue

Roseland, NJ 07068

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Aaron M. Bender Esq.

Attorney at Reed Smith

136 Main Street, Princeton Forrestal Village, Suite 250

Princeton, NJ 08540

Henry F. Reichner Esq.

Attorney at Reed Smith

1717 Arch Street, Three Logan Square, Suite 3100

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Defendant / Appellant Attorney

Joshua W. Denbeaux Esq.

Attorney at Denbeaux & Denbeaux

366 Kinderkamack Road

Westwood, NJ 07675

 

Court Documents

Open Document

CLERK ORDER dismissing case, pursuant to F.R.A.P. 10(b) and 3rd Cir. LAR 11.1 and LAR Misc. 107.1(b), for failure to order a transcript of the lower court proceedings or to notify the Court that a transcript was not necessary for the prosecution of this appeal and for failure to file an entry of apperance, civil case information statement and concise summary of case. Case Terminated on 04/18/2019. (SLC) [Entered: 04/18/2019 02:36 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Andrew Christopher Sayles on behalf of Appellee(s) KML Law Group, P.C.. [19-1437] (ACS) [Entered: 04/04/2019 03:12 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: Response filed by Appellee Green Tree Servicing LLC to clerk order. Certificate of Service dated 03/26/2019. [19-1437] (HFR) [Entered: 03/26/2019 12:00 PM]

Open Document

FOLLOW UP LETTER to Gina Calabria, Esq. for Safeguard Properties Management LLC, Safeguard Real Estate Properties LLC, Safeguard Realty Management of New York Co and New York Field Servicing, Anne M. Dalena, Esq. for Safeguard Properties Management LLC, Safeguard Real Estate Properties LLC, Safeguard Realty Management of New York Co and New York Field Servicing, Andrew C. Sayles, Esq. for KML Law Group PC and Janeen M. Thomas, Esq. for Safeguard Properties Management LLC, Safeguard Real Estate Properties LLC, Safeguard Realty Management of New York Co and New York Field Servicing requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 04/04/2019. Disclosure Statement on or before 04/04/2019. (SLC) [Entered: 03/21/2019 09:28 AM]

Open Document

FOLLOW UP LETTER to Joshua W. Denbeaux, Esq. for David L. Cargille and Julie L. Cargille requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 04/04/2019. Information Statement on or before 04/04/2019. Concise Summary on or before 04/04/2019. Transcript Purchase Order on or before 04/04/2019. (SLC) [Entered: 03/21/2019 09:24 AM]

Open Document

ORDER (Clerk) Directing responses to be filed. The Court has received a Suggestion of Bankruptcy from Green Tree Servicing LLC n/k/a Ditech Financial LLC. It is noted that Ditech Financial LLC was the plaintiff in the court below at its inception. As such, the parties are hereby ORDERED to file written statements addressing the applicability of the automatic stay to this case. See Maritime Electric Co. v. United Jersey Bank, 959 F.2d 1194, 1204-05 (3d Cir. 1991); Assoc. of St. Croix Condominium Owners v. St. Croix Hotel Corp., 682 F.2d 446-48 (3d Cir. 1982). The parties must file their written statements within 14 days of the date of this order, filed. (SLC) [Entered: 03/15/2019 11:53 AM]

Open Document #2

Corporate Disclosure Statement and Statement of Financial Interest

Open Document #1

Appearance Form

Open Document

ECF FILER: SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY received from Appellee Green Tree Servicing LLC. Certificate of Service dated 03/08/2019. Service made by ECF. [19-1437] (HFR) [Entered: 03/08/2019 03:57 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Henry F. Reichner on behalf of Respondent(s) Green Tree Servicing LLC nka Ditech Financial, LLC. [19-1437] (HFR) [Entered: 03/08/2019 03:46 PM]

Open Document

CLERK ORDER advising that the case has been listed for possible dismissal due to jurisdictional defect. The notice of appeal indicates that Appellants are seeking review of a District Court judgment entered February 24, 2018. No such order appears on the District Court docket. In addition, it appears that there are claims still pending in the District Court. Further, none of the orders dismissing Appellants' counterclaims and/or third party claims have been certified under Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(b). All parties must file written responses addressing these issues, with a certificate of service attached, within fourteen (14) days from the date of this order, filed. (SLC) [Entered: 03/01/2019 07:37 AM]

Open Document #5

Case Opening Letter

Open Document #4

Standing Order

Open Document #3

Caption

Open Document #2

Memorandum

Open Document #1

Notice of Appeal

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK ORDER dismissing case, pursuant to F.R.A.P. 10(b) and 3rd Cir. LAR 11.1 and LAR Misc. 107.1(b), for failure to order a transcript of the lower court proceedings or to notify the Court that a transcript was not necessary for the prosecution of this appeal and for failure to file an entry of apperance, civil case information statement and concise summary of case. Case Terminated on 04/18/2019. (SLC) [Entered: 04/18/2019 02:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Andrew Christopher Sayles on behalf of Appellee(s) KML Law Group, P.C.. [19-1437] (ACS) [Entered: 04/04/2019 03:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: Response filed by Appellee Green Tree Servicing LLC to clerk order. Certificate of Service dated 03/26/2019. [19-1437] (HFR) [Entered: 03/26/2019 12:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • FOLLOW UP LETTER to Gina Calabria, Esq. for Safeguard Properties Management LLC, Safeguard Real Estate Properties LLC, Safeguard Realty Management of New York Co and New York Field Servicing, Anne M. Dalena, Esq. for Safeguard Properties Management LLC, Safeguard Real Estate Properties LLC, Safeguard Realty Management of New York Co and New York Field Servicing, Andrew C. Sayles, Esq. for KML Law Group PC and Janeen M. Thomas, Esq. for Safeguard Properties Management LLC, Safeguard Real Estate Properties LLC, Safeguard Realty Management of New York Co and New York Field Servicing requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 04/04/2019. Disclosure Statement on or before 04/04/2019. (SLC) [Entered: 03/21/2019 09:28 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • FOLLOW UP LETTER to Joshua W. Denbeaux, Esq. for David L. Cargille and Julie L. Cargille requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 04/04/2019. Information Statement on or before 04/04/2019. Concise Summary on or before 04/04/2019. Transcript Purchase Order on or before 04/04/2019. (SLC) [Entered: 03/21/2019 09:24 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER (Clerk) Directing responses to be filed. The Court has received a Suggestion of Bankruptcy from Green Tree Servicing LLC n/k/a Ditech Financial LLC. It is noted that Ditech Financial LLC was the plaintiff in the court below at its inception. As such, the parties are hereby ORDERED to file written statements addressing the applicability of the automatic stay to this case. See Maritime Electric Co. v. United Jersey Bank, 959 F.2d 1194, 1204-05 (3d Cir. 1991); Assoc. of St. Croix Condominium Owners v. St. Croix Hotel Corp., 682 F.2d 446-48 (3d Cir. 1982). The parties must file their written statements within 14 days of the date of this order, filed. (SLC) [Entered: 03/15/2019 11:53 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Betsy Ann Rosenbloom, Esq. on behalf of Appellee(s) Third Party Defendants Nationwide Title Clearing d/b/a NTC and Erika Lance. [19-1437] (BR) [Entered: 03/11/2019 03:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY received from Appellee Green Tree Servicing LLC. Certificate of Service dated 03/08/2019. Service made by ECF. [19-1437] (HFR) [Entered: 03/08/2019 03:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Henry F. Reichner on behalf of Respondent(s) Green Tree Servicing LLC nka Ditech Financial, LLC. [19-1437] (HFR) [Entered: 03/08/2019 03:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK ORDER advising that the case has been listed for possible dismissal due to jurisdictional defect. The notice of appeal indicates that Appellants are seeking review of a District Court judgment entered February 24, 2018. No such order appears on the District Court docket. In addition, it appears that there are claims still pending in the District Court. Further, none of the orders dismissing Appellants' counterclaims and/or third party claims have been certified under Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(b). All parties must file written responses addressing these issues, with a certificate of service attached, within fourteen (14) days from the date of this order, filed. (SLC) [Entered: 03/01/2019 07:37 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (SLC) [Entered: 03/01/2019 07:34 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellants David L. Cargille and Julie L. Cargille in District Court No. 3-15-cv-00938. (SLC) [Entered: 03/01/2019 07:31 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less