This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 09/26/2021 at 06:09:21 (UTC).

Green Enterprises, LLC, et al v. Oriental Bank

Case Summary

On 07/28/2021 Green Enterprises, LLC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Oriental Bank. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-1553

  • Filing Date:

    07/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

 

Party Details

Defendants

DUAL CORPORATE RISKS LIMITED

CORRIE BAUCKHAM BATTS LIMITED

LIMEBRIDGE, LLC

WILFREDO FIGUEROA NAZARIO

Plaintiff / Appellee

GREEN ENTERPRISES, LLC

Defendant / Appellees

HISCOX SYNDICATES LIMITED, at Lloyd's of London

XL CATLIN (SYNDICATE 2003) AT LLOYDS

MS AMLIN UNDERWRITING LIMITED, Lloyd's Syndicate 2001

CANOPIUS, Lloyd's Syndicate 4444

NOA, Lloyd's Syndicate 3902

BLENHEIM, Lloyd's Syndicate 5886

BRIT, Lloyd's Syndicate 2987/2988

Interested Parties

ORIENTAL BANK

UNIVERSAL FINANCE INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Jose Antonio Andreu-Collazo

Attorney at Andreu & Sagardia

261 Domenech Ave

San Juan, PR 00918-0000

Jose A. Andreu-Fuentes

Attorney at Andreu & Sagardia

261 Domenech Ave

San Juan, PR 00918-0000

Jose J. Lamas-Rivera

Attorney at Andreu & Sagardia

261 Domenech Ave

San Juan, PR 00918-0000

Jose A. Andreu Fuentes

261 Domenech Ave

San Juan, PR 00918-0000

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Luis J. Clas-Wiscovitch

Attorney at Saldana Carvajal & Velez-Rive PSC

166 Ave De La Constitucion

San Juan, PR 00901

Paul Lindsey Fields Jr.

Attorney at Fields Howell LLP

1180 W Peachtree St, Ste 1600

Atlanta, GA 30309

Taryn M. Kadar

Attorney at Fields Howell LLP

1180 W Peachtree St, Ste 1600

Atlanta, GA 30309

Gregory Lee Mast

Attorney at Fields Howell LLP

1180 W Peachtree St, Ste 1600

Atlanta, GA 30309

Fernando Sabater-Clavell

Attorney at Saldana Carvajal & Velez-Rive PSC

166 Ave De La Constitucion

San Juan, PR 00901

Interested Party Attorneys

Carlos R. Baralt-Suarez

Attorney at Delgado & Fernandez LLP

Po Box 11750, Fernandez Juncos Station

San Juan, PR 00910-1750

Paula De Felice-Alejandro

Attorney at Delgado & Fernandez LLP

Po Box 11750, Fernandez Juncos Station

San Juan, PR 00910-1750

Alfredo Fernandez-Martinez

Attorney at Delgado & Fernandez LLP

Po Box 11750, Fernandez Juncos Station

San Juan, PR 00910-1750

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document #3

Notice Regarding Native PDF

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY filed by Appellees Hiscox Syndicates Limited, Catlin (Syndicate 2003) at Lloyds, MS Amlin Underwriting Limited, Canopius, NOA, Blenheim and Brit to response [ # 6445953-2 ]. Certificate of service dated 09/20/2021. [21-1553] (GLM) [Entered: 09/20/2021 09:47 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Oriental Bank filed by Attorney Paula T. De Felice-Alejandro. Certificate of service dated 09/14/2021. [21-1553] (PD) [Entered: 09/14/2021 12:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE filed by Appellant Oriental Bank to motion to dismiss case [ # 6439169-2 ]. Certificate of service dated 09/13/2021. [21-1553] (CRB) [Entered: 09/13/2021 09:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER entered. On August 23, 2021, Interested Party-Appellant, Oriental Bank has filed a late motion for an extension of time to respond to Appellees' motion to dismiss. The response deadline was Thursday, August 19. See Fed. R. App. P. 27(a)(3)(A). Despite this deficiency, the motion is allowed. Any opposition to the motion to dismiss must be filed on or by September 13, 2021. Appellant is reminded to be attentive and compliant with all future deadlines. [21-1553] (GAK) [Entered: 09/08/2021 12:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION to extend time to file a response filed by Appellant Oriental Bank. Certificate of service dated 08/23/2021. [21-1553] (AF) [Entered: 08/23/2021 09:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE issued. After 09/03/2021, the following attorney will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless they register for an appellate ECF account: Jose A. Andreu Fuentes for Green Enterprises, LLC. [21-1553] (GAK) [Entered: 08/20/2021 11:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Green Enterprises, LLC filed by Attorney Jose A. Andreu-Collazo. Certificate of service dated 08/17/2021. [21-1553] (JAA) [Entered: 08/17/2021 05:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance filed by Attorney Fernando Sabater-Clavell for Appellees Catlin (Syndicate 2003) at Lloyds, MS Amlin Underwriting Limited, Hiscox Syndicates Limited, Canopius, NOA, Blenheim and Brit. Certificate of service was not included. [21-1553] (GAK) [Entered: 08/13/2021 04:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOCKETING statement filed by Appellant Oriental Bank. Certificate of service dated 08/11/2021. [21-1553] (CRB) [Entered: 08/11/2021 09:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION to dismiss case filed by Appellees Hiscox Syndicates Limited, Catlin (Syndicate 2003) at Lloyds, MS Amlin Underwriting Limited, Canopius, NOA, Blenheim and Brit. Certificate of service dated 08/09/2021. [21-1553] (GLM) [Entered: 08/09/2021 03:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISCLOSURE statement filed by Appellees Hiscox Syndicates Limited, Catlin (Syndicate 2003) at Lloyds, MS Amlin Underwriting Limited, Canopius, NOA, Blenheim and Brit. Certificate of service dated 08/09/2021. [21-1553] (GLM) [Entered: 08/09/2021 02:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Blenheim, Brit, Canopius, Catlin (Syndicate 2003) at Lloyds, Hiscox Syndicates Limited, MS Amlin Underwriting Limited and NOA filed by Attorney Luis J. Clas-Wiscovitch. Certificate of service dated 08/05/2021. [21-1553] (LJC) [Entered: 08/05/2021 12:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Blenheim, Brit, Canopius, Catlin (Syndicate 2003) at Lloyds, Hiscox Syndicates Limited, MS Amlin Underwriting Limited and NOA filed by Attorney Paul L. Fields, Jr.. Certificate of service dated 08/05/2021. [21-1553] (PLF) [Entered: 08/05/2021 11:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Blenheim, Brit, Canopius, Catlin (Syndicate 2003) at Lloyds, Hiscox Syndicates Limited, MS Amlin Underwriting Limited and NOA filed by Attorney Gregory L. Mast. Certificate of service dated 08/05/2021. [21-1553] (GLM) [Entered: 08/05/2021 11:52 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Hiscox Syndicates Limited, Catlin (Syndicate 2003) at Lloyds, MS Amlin Underwriting Limited, Canopius, NOA, Blenheim and Brit filed by Attorney Taryn M. Kadar. Certificate of service dated 08/05/2021. [21-1553] (TMK) [Entered: 08/05/2021 11:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Oriental Bank filed by Attorney Alfredo Fernandez-Martinez. Certificate of service dated 07/30/2021. [21-1553] (AF) [Entered: 07/30/2021 09:07 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Oriental Bank filed by Attorney Carlos R. Baralt Suarez. Certificate of service dated 07/29/2021. [21-1553] (CRB) [Entered: 07/29/2021 04:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #18) filed by Appellant Oriental Bank. Docketing Statement and Appearance form due 08/11/2021. [21-1553] (DO) [Entered: 07/28/2021 10:40 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Oriental Bank is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Carlos R. Baralt-Suarez

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alfredo Fernandez-Martinez