This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 05/16/2022 at 06:05:06 (UTC).

Gray v. Fidelity Investment

Case Summary

On 03/17/2022 Gray filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against Fidelity Investment. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-565

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

Michele Gray

Rensselaer, NY 12144

Defendant / Appellees

Fidelity Investments

Fidelity Brokerage Services LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Michele Gray

279 Troy Road

Rensselaer, NY 12144

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Nikolas S. Komyati Esq.

Attorney at Bressler, Amery & Ross, LLC

325 Columbia Turnpike

Florham Park, NJ 07932

 

Court Documents

33 #4

Supporting Document

33 #3

Supporting Document

33 #2

Supporting Document

33 #1

Opposition FILED

#32

(#32) CAPTION, pursuant to order at entry 30, AMENDED.[3308241] [22-565] [Entered: 05/03/2022 01:36 PM]

#30

(#30) MOTION ORDER, granting Appellee Fidelity Investments motion to amend caption [ # 25 ], copy to pro se appellant, FILED. [3308235][30] [22-565] [Entered: 05/03/2022 01:32 PM]

#28

(#28) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Motion, to stay, [27], on behalf of Appellant Michele Gray, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[3308109] [22-565] [Entered: 05/03/2022 12:04 PM]

25 #5

Supporting Document

25 #4

Supporting Document

25 #3

Supporting Document

25 #2

Supporting Document

25 #1

Motion FILED

18 #4

Supporting Document

18 #3

Supporting Document

18 #2

Supporting Document

18 #1

Opposition FILED

#13

(#13) MOTION, for award owed, to proceed in forma pauperis, on behalf of Appellant Michele Gray, FILED. Service date 04/01/2022 by US mail.[3290081] [22-565] [Entered: 04/04/2022 10:54 AM]

#12

(#12) FORM D-P, on behalf of Appellant Michele Gray, FILED. Service date 04/01/2022 by US mail.[3290077] [22-565] [Entered: 04/04/2022 10:52 AM]

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) OPPOSITION TO , to stay [27], on behalf of Appellee Fidelity Brokerage Services LLC, FILED. Service date 05/12/2022 by email, US mail. [3314346] [22-565] [Entered: 05/12/2022 05:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) CAPTION, pursuant to order at entry 30, AMENDED.[3308241] [22-565] [Entered: 05/03/2022 01:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • Docket(#31) FIDELITY INVESTMENTS, replaced by Fidelity Brokerage Services LLC, pursuant to order at entry 30, SUBSTITUTED.[3308237] [22-565] [Entered: 05/03/2022 01:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) MOTION ORDER, granting Appellee Fidelity Investments motion to amend caption [ # 25 ], copy to pro se appellant, FILED. [3308235][30] [22-565] [Entered: 05/03/2022 01:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Motion, to stay, [27], on behalf of Appellant Michele Gray, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[3308109] [22-565] [Entered: 05/03/2022 12:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • Docket(#27) MOTION, to stay, on behalf of Appellant Michele Gray, FILED. Service date 05/03/2022 by US mail.[3308103] [22-565] [Entered: 05/03/2022 12:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) MOTION, to amend caption, on behalf of Appellee Fidelity Investments, FILED. Service date 04/21/2022 by email, US mail. [3301362] [22-565] [Entered: 04/21/2022 02:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) OPPOSITION TO MOTION, for award owed [ # 13 ], to proceed in forma pauperis [ # 13 ], on behalf of Appellee Fidelity Investments, FILED. Service date 04/11/2022 by email, US mail. [3294910] [22-565]--[Edited 04/12/2022 by PRM] [Entered: 04/11/2022 05:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION, for award owed, to proceed in forma pauperis, on behalf of Appellant Michele Gray, FILED. Service date 04/01/2022 by US mail.[3290081] [22-565] [Entered: 04/04/2022 10:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) FORM D-P, on behalf of Appellant Michele Gray, FILED. Service date 04/01/2022 by US mail.[3290077] [22-565] [Entered: 04/04/2022 10:52 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FORM, on behalf of Appellant Michele Gray, FILED. Service date 04/01/2022 by US mail.[3290074] [22-565] [Entered: 04/04/2022 10:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CURED DEFECTIVE ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE [ # 8 ], [ # 9 ], on behalf of Appellee Fidelity Investments, FILED.[3288530] [22-565] [Entered: 03/31/2022 09:21 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Fidelity Investments, FILED. Service date 03/30/2022 by email, US mail.[3288293] [22-565] [Entered: 03/30/2022 03:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, [7], on behalf of Appellee Fidelity Investments, FILED.[3287315] [22-565] [Entered: 03/29/2022 03:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • Docket(#7) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Fidelity Investments, FILED. Service date 03/28/2022 by CM/ECF, email.[3286522] [22-565] [Entered: 03/28/2022 05:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[3281030] [22-565] [Entered: 03/21/2022 09:11 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3281027] [22-565] [Entered: 03/21/2022 09:10 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DISTRICT COURT ORDER, entered in the district court as docket entry dated 02/28/2022, RECEIVED.[3281023] [22-565] [Entered: 03/21/2022 09:08 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Michele Gray, FILED. [3281015] [22-565] [Entered: 03/21/2022 09:04 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FIDELITY BROKERAGE SERVICES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where FIDELITY INVESTMENTS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nikolas S Komyati