This case was last updated from PACER on 01/03/2020 at 06:06:48 (UTC).

Gray v. Ade, et al

Case Summary

On 11/04/2019 Gray filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Ade. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-7059

  • Filing Date:

    11/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

SERGEANT WRIGHT, Security Sergeant

CAPTAIN HATCHMAN, Security Captain, AKA Captain Hatton

OFFICER GARRISON, DOC Internal Affairs Officer

MAJOR DORMAN, Administrative Chief

MAJOR BROWN, Chief of Security

JAMES YATES, Warden

TIFFANY ADE, Echo Unit Manager

TERRY UNDERWOOD, Warden's assistant

A. W. GENTRY, Assistant Warden of Security

A. W. PEREZ, Assistant Warden

Plaintiff / Appellant

FREDERICK RIDEOUT GRAY, JR.

Lexington, OK 73051-0548

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Darrell L. Moore

Attorney at J. Ralph Moore PC

P.O. Box 368

Pryor, OK 74362-0000

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Frederick Rideout Gray Jr.

Attorney at Joseph Harp Correctional Center

P.O. Box 548

Lexington, OK 73051-0548

 

Court Documents

Open Document #4

Volume IV - Pleadings

Open Document #3

Volume III - Pleadings

Open Document #2

Volume II - Pleadings

Open Document #1

Volume I - Pleadings

Open Document

[10702194] Jurisdictional review complete. Appellant's brief due on 01/21/2020 for Frederick Rideout Gray Jr. Record on appeal 10th circuit due 01/02/2020. [19-7059] [Entered: 12/12/2019 04:05 PM]

Open Document

[10702192] District court order granting 1915(b) motion. [19-7059] [Entered: 12/12/2019 04:04 PM]

Open Document

[10697823] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Frederick Rideout Gray, Jr. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n (parties named are parties). Served on 11/15/2019. Manner of Service: US mail. [19-7059] [Entered: 11/25/2019 01:24 PM]

Open Document

[10696790] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Darrell L. Moore for Mr. James Yates, Doctor Terry Underwood, Tiffany Ade, Captain Hatchman, Sergeant Wright, A. W. Perez, Major Brown, Major Dorman, A. W. Gentry and Officer Garrison. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 11/20/2019. Manner of Service: mailed. [19-7059] [Entered: 11/20/2019 04:06 PM]

Open Document

[10696383] Deficiency notice issued. Type of deficiency: No entry of appearance filed on behalf of appellees. Notice of appearance due on 11/29/2019 for Tiffany Ade, Major Brown, Major Dorman, Officer Garrison, A. W. Gentry, Frederick Rideout Gray Jr., Captain Hatchman, A. W. Perez, Terry Underwood, Sergeant Wright and James Yates. [19-7059] [Entered: 11/19/2019 03:02 PM]

Open Document #3

New General Dkt Letter - Pro Se

Open Document #2

Transmittal letter

Open Document #1

Preliminary Record

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10705239] Record on appeal filed. No. of Volumes: 4, Comments: Volumes I - IV - Pleadings. [19-7059] [Entered: 12/26/2019 10:29 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10702194] Jurisdictional review complete. Appellant's brief due on 01/21/2020 for Frederick Rideout Gray Jr. Record on appeal 10th circuit due 01/02/2020. [19-7059] [Entered: 12/12/2019 04:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10702192] District court order granting 1915(b) motion. [19-7059] [Entered: 12/12/2019 04:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10697823] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Frederick Rideout Gray, Jr. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n (parties named are parties). Served on 11/15/2019. Manner of Service: US mail. [19-7059] [Entered: 11/25/2019 01:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10696790] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Darrell L. Moore for Mr. James Yates, Doctor Terry Underwood, Tiffany Ade, Captain Hatchman, Sergeant Wright, A. W. Perez, Major Brown, Major Dorman, A. W. Gentry and Officer Garrison. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 11/20/2019. Manner of Service: mailed. [19-7059] [Entered: 11/20/2019 04:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • [10696776] Entry of appearance submitted by Darrell L. Moore for Appellees Tiffany Ade, Major Brown, Major Dorman, Officer Garrison, A. W. Gentry, Captain Hatchman, A. W. Perez, Doctor Terry Underwood, Sergeant Wright and Mr. James Yates for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 11/20/2019. Manner of Service: US mail. [19-7059]--[Edited 11/20/2019 by KLP to delete the attachment; entry filed.] DLM [Entered: 11/20/2019 03:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10696383] Deficiency notice issued. Type of deficiency: No entry of appearance filed on behalf of appellees. Notice of appearance due on 11/29/2019 for Tiffany Ade, Major Brown, Major Dorman, Officer Garrison, A. W. Gentry, Frederick Rideout Gray Jr., Captain Hatchman, A. W. Perez, Terry Underwood, Sergeant Wright and James Yates. [19-7059] [Entered: 11/19/2019 03:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10691931] Prisoner case docketed. DATE RECEIVED: 11/04/2019. Notice of Appearance and fee or 1915 forms due 12/04/2019 for Frederick Rideout Gray Jr. Notice of appearance due on 11/18/2019 for Tiffany Ade, Major Brown, Major Dorman, Officer Garrison, A. W. Gentry, Captain Hatchman, A. W. Perez, Terry Underwood, Sergeant Wright and James Yates. [19-7059] [Entered: 11/04/2019 09:10 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.