This case was last updated from PACER on 01/11/2020 at 06:06:41 (UTC).

Grant Anderson v. USA

Case Summary

On 11/12/2019 Grant Anderson filed an Other lawsuit against USA. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, D.C. Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-5309

  • Filing Date:

    11/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, D.C. Circuit

 

Party Details

Respondent / Appellee

United States of America

Petitioner / Appellant

Grant Anderson, Jr.

Washington, DC 20032

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent / Appellee Attorney

R. Craig Lawrence

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office

555 4Th Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

Petitioner / Appellant Attorney

Grant Anderson

725 Atlantic Street, Se

Washington, DC 20032

 

Court Documents

Open Document

APPENDIX [1821917] filed by Grant Anderson. [Volumes: 1] [Service Date: 12/30/2019 ] [19-5309] [Entered: 12/30/2019 11:30 AM]

Open Document

APPELLANT BRIEF [1821915] filed by Grant Anderson [Service Date: 12/30/2019 ] Length of Brief: 9 pages. [19-5309] [Entered: 12/30/2019 11:29 AM]

Open Document

CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT [1817890] received from Grant Anderson [signed for on 11/22/2019] for order [1815290-2] sent to Appellant Grant Anderson [19-5309] [Entered: 11/27/2019 11:21 AM]

Open Document

CLERK'S ORDER [1815279] filed setting briefing schedule: APPELLANT Brief due 01/02/2020. APPENDIX due 01/02/2020. Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution. The Clerk is directed to mail this order to appellant by certified mail, return receipt requested and by 1st class mail. [19-5309] [Entered: 11/12/2019 02:04 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE OF APPEAL [1815276] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:19-cv-02502-UNA filed by Grant Anderson. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 19-5309. [19-5309] [Entered: 11/12/2019 02:00 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPENDIX [1821917] filed by Grant Anderson. [Volumes: 1] [Service Date: 12/30/2019 ] [19-5309] [Entered: 12/30/2019 11:30 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPELLANT BRIEF [1821915] filed by Grant Anderson [Service Date: 12/30/2019 ] Length of Brief: 9 pages. [19-5309] [Entered: 12/30/2019 11:29 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT [1817890] received from Grant Anderson [signed for on 11/22/2019] for order [1815290-2] sent to Appellant Grant Anderson [19-5309] [Entered: 11/27/2019 11:21 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • CERTIFIED AND FIRST CLASS MAIL SENT [1815290] with return receipt requested [Receipt No.7019 0700 0000 5269 2109] of order [ # 1815279-5 ]. Certified Mail Receipt due 12/12/2019 from Grant Anderson. [19-5309] [Entered: 11/12/2019 02:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S ORDER [1815279] filed setting briefing schedule: APPELLANT Brief due 01/02/2020. APPENDIX due 01/02/2020. Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution. The Clerk is directed to mail this order to appellant by certified mail, return receipt requested and by 1st class mail. [19-5309] [Entered: 11/12/2019 02:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF APPEAL [1815276] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:19-cv-02502-UNA filed by Grant Anderson. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 19-5309. [19-5309] [Entered: 11/12/2019 02:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • US CIVIL CASE docketed. [19-5309] [Entered: 11/12/2019 01:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less