This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 11/07/2021 at 06:12:50 (UTC).

Granite State Ins Co v. Star Mine Services, Inc.

Case Summary

On 09/08/2021 Granite State Ins Co filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Star Mine Services, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Sixth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-5852

  • Filing Date:

    09/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellee

GRANITE STATE INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant / Appellant

STAR MINE SERVICES, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Michael Charles Merrick

Attorney at Kaplan, Johnson, Abate & Bird

710 W. Main Streetsuite 400

Louisville, KY 40202

Tyler R. Yeager

Attorney at Kaplan, Johnson, Abate & Bird

710 W. Main Streetsuite 400

Louisville, KY 40202

Defendant / Appellant Attorney

Thomas E. Springer III

Attorney at Law Office

18 Court Street

Madisonville, KY 42431

 

Court Documents

#1

#3

#5

#6

(#6) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Star Mine Services, Inc. by Thomas E. Springer III. Certificate of Service: 09/16/2021. [21-5852] (TES) [Entered: 09/16/2021 12:04 PM]

#7

(#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Thomas E. Springer, III for Appellant Star Mine Services, Inc. Certificate of Service: 09/16/2021. [21-5852] (TES) [Entered: 09/16/2021 12:05 PM]

#8

(#8) CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Thomas E. Springer, III for Appellant Star Mine Services, Inc... Certificate of Service: 09/16/2021. [21-5852] (TES) [Entered: 09/16/2021 12:06 PM]

#9

(#9) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Granite State Insurance Company by Michael C. Merrick. Certificate of Service: 09/23/2021. [21-5852] (MCM) [Entered: 09/23/2021 04:35 PM]

#10

(#10) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Michael Charles Merrick for Appellee Granite State Insurance Company Certificate of Service: 09/23/2021. [21-5852] (MCM) [Entered: 09/23/2021 04:36 PM]

#11

(#11) BRIEFING LETTER SENT by Mediation Office, resetting briefing schedule: appellant brief now due 11/17/2021. appellee brief now due 12/17/2021. (MLB) [Entered: 10/01/2021 12:44 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2021
  • Docket(#12) Mediation Office is no longer involved in this appeal. (MLB) [Entered: 10/01/2021 12:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) BRIEFING LETTER SENT by Mediation Office, resetting briefing schedule: appellant brief now due 11/17/2021. appellee brief now due 12/17/2021. (MLB) [Entered: 10/01/2021 12:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Michael Charles Merrick for Appellee Granite State Insurance Company Certificate of Service: 09/23/2021. [21-5852] (MCM) [Entered: 09/23/2021 04:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Granite State Insurance Company by Michael C. Merrick. Certificate of Service: 09/23/2021. [21-5852] (MCM) [Entered: 09/23/2021 04:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Thomas E. Springer, III for Appellant Star Mine Services, Inc... Certificate of Service: 09/16/2021. [21-5852] (TES) [Entered: 09/16/2021 12:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Thomas E. Springer, III for Appellant Star Mine Services, Inc. Certificate of Service: 09/16/2021. [21-5852] (TES) [Entered: 09/16/2021 12:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Star Mine Services, Inc. by Thomas E. Springer III. Certificate of Service: 09/16/2021. [21-5852] (TES) [Entered: 09/16/2021 12:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MEDIATOR-INITIATED CALL: A Mediation conference has been scheduled for 10/01/2021 at 9:30 am EASTERN TIME with Kathryn Wollenburg. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (CAW) [Entered: 09/09/2021 02:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • Docket(#4) Mediation Office is involved in this appeal. (CAW) [Entered: 09/09/2021 01:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) BRIEFING LETTER SENT: appellant brief due 10/18/2021; appellee brief due 11/17/2021 (PJE) [Entered: 09/08/2021 04:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • Docket(#2) The case manager for this case is: Patricia Elder (PJE) [Entered: 09/08/2021 03:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Star Mine Services, Inc.. Transcript needed: n. (PJE) [Entered: 09/08/2021 03:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GRANITE STATE INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Thomas E. Springer, III