This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 08/06/2019 at 06:03:49 (UTC).

Graham v. Waters, et al

Case Summary

On 06/07/2019 Graham filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Waters,. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1205

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

JIMMIE GRAHAM

Sterling, CO 80751

Defendant / Appellees

TOM WATERS, Parole Board Member

ALEXANDRA WALKER, Parole Board Member

DENISE BALAZIC, Parole Board Member

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Jimmie Graham

Attorney at SCF - Sterling Correctional Facility

P.O. Box 6000

Sterling, CO 80751

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Document

Open Document

Open Restricted Document #2

Vol. II - Sealed Pleadings

Open Restricted Document #1

Vol. I - Pleadings

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document #2

Envelope

Open Document #1

Main Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document #2

New General Dkt Letter - Pro Se

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10663374] Order filed by Clerk of the Court assessing costs and fees in the amount of $505.00. Served on 07/16/2019. [19-1205] [Entered: 07/16/2019 10:59 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10663368] Appellant's motion filed by Jimmie Graham for leave to proceed without prepayment of costs and fees. Served on 05/31/2019. Manner of Service: US mail. [19-1205] [Entered: 07/16/2019 10:47 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10663365] Order filed by Clerk of the Court granting Appellant's motion for court to accept previously tendered motion. Appellant's brief remains due 8/14/19. Served on 07/16/2019. [19-1205] [Entered: 07/16/2019 10:44 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10663346] Appellant's motion filed by Jimmie Graham for court to accept previously tendered motion. Served on 07/09/2019. Manner of Service: US mail. [19-1205] [Entered: 07/16/2019 10:09 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10660994] Record on appeal filed. No. of Volumes: 2. Comments: Vol. I - Pleadings; Vol. II - Sealed Pleadings. [19-1205] [Entered: 07/08/2019 08:43 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10660741] Jurisdictional review complete. Fee or 1915 forms and appellant's brief due 08/14/2019 for Jimmie Graham. Record on appeal 10th circuit due 07/26/2019. [19-1205] [Entered: 07/05/2019 08:55 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10660734] Order filed by Clerk of the Court referring Appellant's memo brief [ # 10659154-2 ] and the court's 6/11/2019 order [ # 10657816-2 ] to the panel of judges that will later be assigned to consider this case on the merits (no ruling will issue at this time). Served on 07/05/2019. [19-1205] [Entered: 07/05/2019 08:50 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10659154] Appellant memorandum brief in response to the court's June 11, 2019 show cause order filed by Jimmie Graham. Served on 06/25/2019. Manner of Service: US mail. [19-1205] [Entered: 06/28/2019 01:46 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10657816] Order filed by Clerk of the Court denying Appellant's motion borrow record on appeal filed by Appellant Jimmie Graham. The show cause response remains due 7/2/2019. See order for additional information. Served on 06/24/2019. [19-1205] [Entered: 06/24/2019 02:15 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10657750] Appellant's motion filed by Jimmie Graham to borrow record. Served on 06/20/2019. Manner of Service: US mail. [19-1205] [Entered: 06/24/2019 12:19 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10656258] Entry of appearance filed by Jimmie Graham. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 06/13/2019. Manner of Service: US mail. [19-1205] [Entered: 06/17/2019 12:40 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10654929] Jurisdiction challenged. Briefing on the merits is suspended pending further order of this court. Appellant's memorandum brief due 07/02/2019 for Jimmie Graham. See order for details. [19-1205] [Entered: 06/11/2019 10:52 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10654742] District court minute order denying 1915(b) motion as moot. [19-1205] [Entered: 06/10/2019 04:25 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10654231] Prisoner case docketed. DATE RECEIVED: 06/07/2019. Fee is due by 07/08/2019 for Jimmie Graham. Notice of appearance due on 06/21/2019 for Jimmie Graham. [19-1205] [Entered: 06/07/2019 10:08 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less