This case was last updated from PACER on 07/07/2019 at 06:05:17 (UTC).

Government of Guam v. USA

Case Summary

On 05/08/2019 Government of Guam filed an Other - Environment lawsuit against USA. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, D.C. Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-5131

  • Filing Date:

    05/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Environment

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, D.C. Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellant

United States of America

Plaintiff / Appellee

Government of Guam

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Eric Allen Grant

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

950 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20530-0001

Michael Augustini

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

Po Box 7611, Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044-7611

Rachel Heron

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

Po Box 7415, Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044-7415

Evelyn S. Ying

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

Po Box 7415, Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044-7415

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Bezalel Adin Stern Esquire

Attorney at Kelley Drye & Warren LLP

3050 K Street, Nw, Suite 400

Washington, DC 20007

Mark Vincent Donatiello

Attorney at Kelley Drye & Warren, LLP

515 Post Oak Boulevard, Suite 900

Houston, TX 77027

William James Jackson

Attorney at Kelley Drye & Warren, LLP

515 Post Oak Boulevard, Suite 900

Houston, TX 77027

John Dalston Smith Gilmour

Attorney at Kelley Drye & Warren, LLP

515 Post Oak Boulevard, Suite 900

Houston, TX 77027

 

Court Documents

Open Document

JOINT APPENDIX [1794487] filed by USA. [Volumes: 1] [Service Date: 06/25/2019 ] [19-5131] (Heron, Rachel) [Entered: 06/25/2019 04:37 PM]

Open Document

APPELLANT BRIEF [1794484] filed by USA [Service Date: 06/25/2019 ] Length of Brief: 10,703 words. [19-5131] (Heron, Rachel) [Entered: 06/25/2019 04:34 PM]

Open Document

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1793534] filed by John D.S. Gilmour and co-counsel William J. Jackson, Mark Donatiello on behalf of Appellee Government of Guam. [19-5131] (Stern, Bezalel) [Entered: 06/19/2019 01:49 PM]

Open Document #2

form(s) sent

Open Document #1

Order Sent

Open Document

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1787195] filed by Rachel Heron on behalf of Appellant USA. [19-5131] (Heron, Rachel) [Entered: 05/09/2019 03:50 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE OF APPEAL [1786855] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:17-cv-02487-KBJ filed by USA. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 19-5131. [19-5131] [Entered: 05/08/2019 01:28 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • JOINT APPENDIX [1794487] filed by USA. [Volumes: 1] [Service Date: 06/25/2019 ] [19-5131] (Heron, Rachel) [Entered: 06/25/2019 04:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPELLANT BRIEF [1794484] filed by USA [Service Date: 06/25/2019 ] Length of Brief: 10,703 words. [19-5131] (Heron, Rachel) [Entered: 06/25/2019 04:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1793534] filed by John D.S. Gilmour and co-counsel William J. Jackson, Mark Donatiello on behalf of Appellee Government of Guam. [19-5131] (Stern, Bezalel) [Entered: 06/19/2019 01:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S ORDER [1788192] filed setting briefing schedule: APPELLANT Brief due 06/25/2019. APPENDIX due 06/25/2019. APPELLEE Brief due on 07/25/2019. APPELLANT Reply Brief due 08/15/2019 [19-5131] [Entered: 05/16/2019 05:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1787195] filed by Rachel Heron on behalf of Appellant USA. [19-5131] (Heron, Rachel) [Entered: 05/09/2019 03:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF APPEAL [1786855] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:17-cv-02487-KBJ filed by USA. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 19-5131. [19-5131] [Entered: 05/08/2019 01:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • US CIVIL CASE docketed. [19-5131] [Entered: 05/08/2019 01:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.