Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 07/11/2020 at 06:29:11 (UTC).

Gordon Miles v. Emily Piper-Johnson, et al

Case Summary

On 05/12/2020 Gordon Miles filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Emily Piper-Johnson. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1965

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

Kent Johansen

Emily Johnson Piper

Katy Porter

Ruby Brewer

Sarah Herrick

Brian Ninneman

Paul Mayfield

Debbie Becker-Sailor

Heidi Menard

Leann Bergman

Meg McCauley

Katherine Lockie

Staci Bovin

Joseph Marczak

Jensina Rosen

Adam Young

Nancy Johnston

Peter Puffer

Tony Lourey

Susan Johnson

16 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Brandon L. Boese

Attorney at ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE

Suite 1400, 445 Minnesota Street

Saint Paul, MN 55101-2127

Other Attorneys

Gordon Miles

Attorney at MINNESOTA SEX OFFENDER PROGRAM

1111 Highway 73

Moose Lake, MN 55767-9449

 

Court Documents

Open Document #2

ProSe NDA

Open Document #1

Appellant's Brief

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Brandon Boese for Appellees Debbie Becker-Sailor, Leann Bergman, Staci Bovin, Ruby Brewer, Skye Brister, Jenny Collelo, Ms. Skye Renee Davis, Donald Geil, Sarah Herrick, Kent Johansen, Jennifer Johnson, Susan Johnson, Ms. Nancy Johnston, Brittany Jorgenson, Katherine Lockie, Tony Lourey, Mr. Nathan John Madsen, Mr. Joseph Marczak, Paul Mayfield, Meg McCauley, Katherine McDowell, Ms. Heidi Menard, Courtney Jo Menten, Mr. Kevin Moser, Joseph Mullen, Brian Ninneman, Elizabeth Peterson, Ms. Emily Johnson Piper, Katy Porter, Mr. Peter Puffer, Ms. Jensina Rosen, Beth Soderman and Adam Young w/service 05/28/2020 [4917905] [20-1965] (BLB) [Entered: 05/28/2020 03:08 PM]

Open Document

CLERK LETTER sent regarding request for local rules and FRAP. [4917122] [20-1965] (MMH) [Entered: 05/27/2020 12:04 PM]

Open Document #2

ProSe NDA

Open Document #1

Letter requesting rules

Open Document

BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: If the original file of the U.S. District Court is available for review in electronic format, the court will rely on the electronic version of the record in its review. The appendices required by 8th Circuit Rule 30A shall not be required. In accordance with 8th Circuit Local Rule 30A (a)(2), the clerk of the United States District Court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format or filed under seal, exhibits, administrative records and state court files. BRIEF OF APPELLANT Gordon Miles due 06/22/2020. Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [4912611] [20-1965] (MMH) [Entered: 05/12/2020 03:37 PM]

Open Document

Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, Report and Recommendation 1/23/20, Order adopting R&R 3/23/20, and Judgment 3/23/20 [4912604] [20-1965] (MMH) [Entered: 05/12/2020 03:33 PM]

Open Document #2

ProSe NDA

Open Document #1

ProSe Docketing Letter

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEF FILED - PRO SE APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Gordon Miles, w/service by USCA8 06/12/2020. Length: 3,818 words; Copies: 5. Brief of Debbie Becker-Sailor, Leann Bergman, Staci Bovin, Ruby Brewer, Skye Brister, Matthew Brown, Jenny Collelo, Skye Renee Davis, Donald Geil, Sarah Herrick, Kent Johansen, John and Jane Doe, Jennifer Johnson, Susan Johnson, Nancy Johnston, Brittany Jorgenson, Katherine Lockie, Tony Lourey, Nathan John Madsen, Joseph Marczak, Paul Mayfield, Meg McCauley, Katherine McDowell, Heidi Menard, Courtney Jo Menten, Kevin Moser, Joseph Mullen, Brian Ninneman, Elizabeth Peterson, Emily Johnson Piper, Katy Porter, Peter Puffer, Jensina Rosen, Beth Soderman and Adam Young due on 07/13/2020 [4923245] [20-1965] (HAG) [Entered: 06/12/2020 12:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Brandon Boese for Appellees Debbie Becker-Sailor, Leann Bergman, Staci Bovin, Ruby Brewer, Skye Brister, Jenny Collelo, Ms. Skye Renee Davis, Donald Geil, Sarah Herrick, Kent Johansen, Jennifer Johnson, Susan Johnson, Ms. Nancy Johnston, Brittany Jorgenson, Katherine Lockie, Tony Lourey, Mr. Nathan John Madsen, Mr. Joseph Marczak, Paul Mayfield, Meg McCauley, Katherine McDowell, Ms. Heidi Menard, Courtney Jo Menten, Mr. Kevin Moser, Joseph Mullen, Brian Ninneman, Elizabeth Peterson, Ms. Emily Johnson Piper, Katy Porter, Mr. Peter Puffer, Ms. Jensina Rosen, Beth Soderman and Adam Young w/service 05/28/2020 [4917905] [20-1965] (BLB) [Entered: 05/28/2020 03:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK LETTER sent regarding request for local rules and FRAP. [4917122] [20-1965] (MMH) [Entered: 05/27/2020 12:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • Docket**DOCUMENT LOCKED / CORRECTED LETTER SENT** CLERK LETTER sent regarding request for rules/FRAP. [4917108] [20-1965] (MMH) [Entered: 05/27/2020 11:55 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER requesting local rules and FRAP. [4916774] [20-1965] (MMH) [Entered: 05/26/2020 04:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: If the original file of the U.S. District Court is available for review in electronic format, the court will rely on the electronic version of the record in its review. The appendices required by 8th Circuit Rule 30A shall not be required. In accordance with 8th Circuit Local Rule 30A (a)(2), the clerk of the United States District Court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format or filed under seal, exhibits, administrative records and state court files. BRIEF OF APPELLANT Gordon Miles due 06/22/2020. Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [4912611] [20-1965] (MMH) [Entered: 05/12/2020 03:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, Report and Recommendation 1/23/20, Order adopting R&R 3/23/20, and Judgment 3/23/20 [4912604] [20-1965] (MMH) [Entered: 05/12/2020 03:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case docketed. [4912551] [20-1965] (MMH) [Entered: 05/12/2020 02:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less