This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 05/31/2021 at 06:13:21 (UTC).

Gonzalez Berrios v. Triple S Propiedad, Inc.

Case Summary

On 04/01/2021 Gonzalez Berrios filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Triple S Propiedad, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-1242

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees and Defendants

MENNONITE GENERAL HOSPITAL, INC.

EMERGENCY SERVICES GROUP, INC.

HANNEY CORDERO-GONZALEZ, his Spouse and the conjugal legal partnership Cordero-Gonzalez

MEDICAL PROTECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY, INC

VICTOR HERNANDEZ-FLORES, his spouse and the conjugal legal partnership Hernandez-Flores

RENAISSANCE RE SYNDICATE (LLOYD'S)

ALEJANDRO MARMOLEJO-MORALES, Spouse Marmolejo-Morales

JOSE PEREZ-MATAMOROS, his spouse and the conjugal legal partnership Perez-Matamoros

ALEJANDRO MARMOLEJO-MORALES

MEDICAL PROTECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY, INC.

JOSE RIVERA RIVERA

VICTOR HERNANDEZ-FLORES

JOSE RIVERA RIVERA, his Spouse and the conjugal legal partnership Rivera-Rivera

MEDICAL DEFENSE INSURANCE CO.

A,B,C,D,E,F,G, AND H INSURANCE COMPANIES

CORPORATIONS Z AND X

3Rd Party Defendants

TRIPLE-S PROPIEDAD, INC.

RENAISSANCE RE SYNDICATE (LLOYD'S)

Interested Parties

WANDA I. GONZALEZ-BERRIOS

NOREEN WISCOVITCH RENTAS

Plaintiff / Appellant and 3Rd Party Plaintiff

ANGELICA M. GONZALEZ BERRIOS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee and Defendant Attorneys

Vicente A. Sequeda-Torres

Attorney at Sanchez-Betances Sifre & Munoz-Noya PSC

Po Box 364428

San Juan, PR 00936-4428

Nuyen L. Marrero-Bonilla

Attorney at Sanchez-Betances Sifre & Munoz-Noya PSC

Po Box 364428

San Juan, PR 00936-4428

Christian Oscar Cintron-Perez

Attorney at Sifre & Munoz Noya CSP

33 Bolivia St, Ste 500, Po Box 364428

San Juan, PR 09036-4428

Luis Sanchez-Betances

Attorney at Sanchez-Betances Sifre & Munoz-Noya PSC

Po Box 364428

San Juan, PR 00936-4428

Roberto E. Ruiz-Comas

Attorney at RC Law & Litigation Services PSC

33 Resolution St., Doral Bank Plaza Ste 801

San Juan, PR 00920-5604

Benito I. Rodriguez-Masso

Attorney at Law Office of Benito I. Rodriguez

407 Calle Bonafoux, Urb. El Vedado

San Juan, PR 00918-3023

Ramonita Dieppa-Gonzalez

478 Jose Canals St, Urb Roosevelt

San Juan, PR 00918-2723

Benjamin Morales-del Valle

Attorney at Morales Morales Law Offices

Urb Town Park, A1 Calle Marginal 181

San Juan, PR 00924-5006

Alejandro Hernandez-Rios

Attorney at Gonzalez & Villamil

1181 Jesus T. Pinero Ave.

San Juan, PR 00920-5604

3Rd Party Defendant Attorney

Miguel G. Laffitte

Attorney at Delgado & Fernandez LLP

Po Box 11750, Fernandez Juncos Station

San Juan, PR 00910-1750

Interested Party Attorneys

Nashely Pagan-Isona

Attorney at Collazo Concepcion & Collazo

9 Claudia St, Amelia Industrial Park, Ste 301

Guaynabo, PR 00968

Javier Franciso Vilarino Santiago

Attorney at Vilarino & Assoc LLC

Po Box 9022515

San Juan, PR 00902-2515

Plaintiff / Appellant and 3Rd Party Plaintiff Attorneys

Carlos Concepcion-Castro

Attorney at Concepcion Law Offices

B-5 Tabonuco St., Suite 216, Pmb 223

Guaynabo, PR 00968-3003

Glenda Labadie Jackson

105 Ave Arterial Hostos

San Juan, PR 00918

Paul Rodriguez-Velez

Attorney at PRV Law Office

221 Ponce De Leon Ave

San Juan, PR 00919

 

Court Documents

Open Document #1

Abbreviated Record

Open Document #2

Case Opening Notice

Open Document #3

Notice Regarding Native PDF

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document #1

Appellant's Briefing Notice

Open Document #2

Notice Regarding Native PDF

Open Document

Open Document

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE issued. The following attorneys have failed to register for an appellate ECF account and will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case: Glenda Labadie Jackson for Angelica M. Gonzalez Berrios and Alejandro Hernandez-Rios for Jose Perez-Matamoros. [21-1242] (ALW) [Entered: 05/27/2021 01:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION to dismiss case filed by Appellant Angelica M. Gonzalez Berrios. Certificate of service dated 05/21/2021. [21-1242] (PR) [Entered: 05/21/2021 12:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEFING schedule set. Brief and Appendix due 06/28/2021 for appellant Angelica M. Gonzalez Berrios. Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 31(a), appellee's brief will be due 30 days following service of appellant's brief and appellant's reply brief will be due 21 days following service of appellee's brief. Please see the court's general order issued April 20, 2020, requiring the electronic filing of appendices. [21-1242] (ALW) [Entered: 05/19/2021 04:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE issued. After 05/24/2021, the following attorneys will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless they register for an appellate ECF account: Glenda Labadie Jackson for Angelica M. Gonzalez Berrios and Alejandro Hernandez-Rios for Jose Perez-Matamoros. [21-1242] (ALW) [Entered: 05/10/2021 02:12 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellant Angelica M. Gonzalez Berrios indicating all necessary transcripts have already been filed in district court. Certificate of service dated 04/22/2021. [21-1242] (PR) [Entered: 04/22/2021 04:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Angelica M. Gonzalez Berrios filed by Attorney Paul A. Rodriguez. Certificate of service dated 04/22/2021. [21-1242] (PR) [Entered: 04/22/2021 04:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOCKETING statement filed by Appellant Angelica M. Gonzalez Berrios. Certificate of service dated 04/22/2021. [21-1242] (PR) [Entered: 04/22/2021 04:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Not Party Triple-S Propiedad, Inc. filed by Attorney MIGUEL G. LAFFITTE. Certificate of service dated 04/22/2021. [21-1242] (MGL) [Entered: 04/22/2021 02:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #244 ) filed by Appellant Angelica M. Gonzalez Berrios. Docketing Statement, Transcript Report/Order form, and Appearance form due 04/22/2021. [21-1242] (ALW) [Entered: 04/08/2021 01:31 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MENNONITE GENERAL HOSPITAL, INC., d/b/a Hospital Menontia CIMA, d/b/a Sistema de Salud Menonita, d/b/a Hospital Menonita Aibonito is a litigant

Latest cases where Triple S Propiedad Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Emergency Services of Texas, P.A. is a litigant

Latest cases where MEDICAL PROTECTIVE COMPANY OF FORT WAYNE, INDIANA is a litigant