This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 12/20/2020 at 06:08:32 (UTC).

Golf Village North, LLC, et al v. City of Powell, OH, et al

Case Summary

On 10/21/2020 Golf Village North, LLC filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against City of Powell, OH. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Sixth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-4117

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants

GOLF VILLAGE NORTH, LLC

TRIANGLE PROPERTIES, INC.

GOLF VILLAGE PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC.

Defendant / Appellees

CITY OF POWELL, OH

DAVID BETZ, in his official capacity as Powell, Ohio's Director of Development

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Joseph R. Miller

Attorney at Vorys, Sater, Seymour & Pease

52 E. Gay Street

Columbus, OH 43215

Daniel E. Shuey

Attorney at Vorys, Sater, Seymour & Pease

52 E. Gay Street

Columbus, OH 43215

Christopher L. Ingram

Attorney at Vorys, Sater, Seymour & Pease

52 E. Gay Street

Columbus, OH 43215

Elizabeth S. Alexander

Attorney at Vorys, Sater, Seymour & Pease

52 E. Gay Street

Columbus, OH 43215

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Frank J. Reed Jr.

Attorney at Benesch, Friedlander, Coplan & Aronoff

41 S. High Street, Suite 2600

Columbus, OH 43215

Jeremy Michael Grayem

Attorney at Frost Brown Todd

10 W. Broad Street, Suite 2300

Columbus, OH 43215

Yazan Samir Ashrawi

Attorney at Frost Brown Todd

10 W. Broad Street, Suite 2300

Columbus, OH 43215

 

Court Documents

#22

#21

#20

RESTRICTED

#18

16 #2

corporate disclosure

16 #1

corporate disclosure

#15

#14

RESTRICTED

#13

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

#5

#4

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) CORRECTED APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Mr. Joseph R. Miller for Golf Village North, LLC, Golf Village Property Owners Association, Inc. and Triangle Properties, Inc... Certificate of Service: 12/17/2020. Argument Request: requested. [20-4117] (JRM) [Entered: 12/17/2020 04:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) BRIEFING LETTER SENT requesting brief corrections from Mr. Joseph R. Miller for Golf Village North, LLC, Triangle Properties, Inc. and Golf Village Property Owners Association, Inc. because the brief must have: the complete, official case caption on cover; compliant record citations in the brief. Corrected brief due: 12/23/2020. (JAC) [Entered: 12/16/2020 11:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) *** DOCUMENT LOCKED - SEE BRIEFING CORRECTION LETTER SENT 12/16/2020 *** APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Mr. Joseph R. Miller for Golf Village North, LLC, Golf Village Property Owners Association, Inc. and Triangle Properties, Inc.. Certificate of Service: 12/15/2020. Argument Request: requested. [20-4117]--[Edited 12/16/2020 by JAC] (JRM) [Entered: 12/15/2020 05:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • Docket(#19) The case manager for this case is now: Julie A. Connor (AEG) [Entered: 11/20/2020 10:10 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) APPEARANCE filed for Appellees David Betz and City of Powell, OH by Jeremy M. Grayem. Certificate of Service: 11/07/2020. [20-4117] (JMG) [Entered: 11/07/2020 07:48 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTIFICATION of PACER docket error for appearance form , [ # 14 ], filed by Mr. Jeremy Michael Grayem for City of Powell, OH and David Betz. Attorneys must use their personal PACER account to file any document and are not permitted to use their account to file on behalf of another attorney. Please refile using your own account within 24 hours. (KSF) [Entered: 11/06/2020 04:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Yazan Samir Ashrawi for Appellees David Betz and City of Powell, OH Certificate of Service: 11/06/2020. [20-4117] (YSA) [Entered: 11/06/2020 03:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 12/15/2020; appellee brief due 01/14/2021. (KSF) [Entered: 11/05/2020 08:19 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ***ENTRY LOCKED - COUNSEL INSTRUCTED TO REFILE APPEARANCE FORM USING OWN PACER ACCOUNT.*** APPEARANCE filed for Appellees David Betz and City of Powell, OH by Jeremy M. Grayem. Certificate of Service: 11/04/2020. [20-4117]--[Edited 11/06/2020 by KSF] (YSA) [Entered: 11/04/2020 07:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) APPEARANCE filed for Appellees David Betz and City of Powell, OH by Yazan S. Ashrawi. Certificate of Service: 11/04/2020. [20-4117] (YSA) [Entered: 11/04/2020 07:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Joseph R. Miller for Appellant Triangle Properties, Inc. Certificate of Service: 11/04/2020. [20-4117]--[Edited 11/05/2020 by KSF] (JRM) [Entered: 11/04/2020 06:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Joseph R. Miller for Appellant Golf Village North, LLC. Certificate of Service: 11/04/2020. [20-4117]--[Edited 11/05/2020 by KSF] (JRM) [Entered: 11/04/2020 06:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Joseph R. Miller for Appellants Golf Village North, LLC, Golf Village Property Owners Association, Inc. and Triangle Properties, Inc... Certificate of Service: 11/04/2020. [20-4117] (JRM) [Entered: 11/04/2020 04:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ***ENTRY LOCKED - THE FORM IS NOT FILLED OUT. COUNSEL INSTRUCTED TO FILL OUT THE FORM AND REFILE.*** CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Joseph R. Miller for Appellants Golf Village North, LLC, Golf Village Property Owners Association, Inc. and Triangle Properties, Inc... Certificate of Service: 11/04/2020. [20-4117]--[Edited 11/04/2020 by KSF] (JRM) [Entered: 11/04/2020 04:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) APPEARANCE filed for Appellants Golf Village North, LLC, Golf Village Property Owners Association, Inc. and Triangle Properties, Inc. by Daniel E. Shuey. Certificate of Service: 11/04/2020. [20-4117] (DES) [Entered: 11/04/2020 03:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) APPEARANCE filed for Appellants Golf Village North, LLC, Golf Village Property Owners Association, Inc. and Triangle Properties, Inc. by Joseph R. Miller. Certificate of Service: 11/04/2020. [20-4117] (JRM) [Entered: 11/04/2020 02:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) APPEARANCE filed for Appellants Golf Village North, LLC, Golf Village Property Owners Association, Inc. and Triangle Properties, Inc. by Elizabeth S. Alexander. Certificate of Service: 11/04/2020. [20-4117] (ESA) [Entered: 11/04/2020 02:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) APPEARANCE filed for Appellants Golf Village North, LLC, Triangle Properties, Inc. and Golf Village Property Owners Association, Inc. by Christopher L. Ingram. Certificate of Service: 11/04/2020. [20-4117] (CLI) [Entered: 11/04/2020 02:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • Docket(#2) The case manager for this case is: Karen Fultz. (KSF) [Entered: 10/21/2020 04:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellants Golf Village North, LLC, Golf Village Property Owners Association, Inc. and Triangle Properties, Inc.. Transcript needed: y. (KSF) [Entered: 10/21/2020 04:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Yazan S Ashrawi

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Frank J Reed, Jr.