This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2019 at 06:05:58 (UTC).

Gold Coast Property Management v. Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, et al

Case Summary

On 07/16/2019 Gold Coast Property Management filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Certain Underwriters at Lloyds. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-12720

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

UNITED SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

GENERAL SECURITY INDEMNITY COMPANY OF ARIZONA

CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS, LONDON

INDIAN HARBOR INSURANCE COMPANY

LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY

Plaintiff / Appellant

GOLD COAST PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee and Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

William D. Wilson

Attorney at Mound Cotton Wollan & Greengrass, LLP

30A Vreeland Rd Ste 210

Florham Park, NJ 07932

Brian Marcus McKell

Attorney at Mound Cotton Wollan & Greengrass

101 Ne 3Rd Ave Ste 1500

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

Brooke Danielle Oransky

Attorney at Mound Cotton Wollan & Greengrass

101 Ne 3Rd Ave Ste 1500

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

Craig R. Rygiel

Attorney at Mound Cotton Wollan & Greengrass, LLP

30A Vreeland Rd Ste 210

Florham Park, NJ 07932

Craig M. Greene

Attorney at Kramer Green Zuckerman Greene & Buchsbaum, PA

4000 Hollywood Blvd Ste 485-S

Hollywood, FL 33021

Marshal Evan Mintz

Attorney at Mintz Truppman, PA

1700 Sans Souci Blvd

North Miami, FL 33181

Shawn Robert Horwick

Attorney at Kramer Green Zuckerman Greene & Buchsbaum, PA

4000 Hollywood Blvd Ste 485-S

Hollywood, FL 33021

Mark J. Mintz

Attorney at Mark J. Mintz, Esq.

1700 Sans Souci Blvd

North Miami, FL 33181-3206

 

Court Documents

Open Document #2

Court Order Filed

Open Document #1

DIS-4 Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney William D. Wilson for Appellees Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London, General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, United Specialty Insurance Company and Appellant Gold Coast Property Management, Inc.. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-12720] (ECF: William Wilson) [Entered: 08/12/2019 05:40 PM]

Open Document

Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Shawn Robert Horwick for Appellant Gold Coast Property Management, Inc.. [19-12720] (ECF: Shawn Horwick) [Entered: 08/02/2019 05:25 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Craig R. Rygiel, Appellees [19-12720] (ECF: Craig Rygiel) [Entered: 07/30/2019 04:39 PM]

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-12720] (ECF: Shawn Horwick) [Entered: 07/30/2019 02:07 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by William D. Wilson for Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London, General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company and United Specialty Insurance Company. [19-12720] (ECF: William Wilson) [Entered: 07/25/2019 02:10 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Craig M. Greene for Gold Coast Property Management, Inc.. [19-12720] (ECF: Shawn Horwick) [Entered: 07/25/2019 01:54 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Shawn R. Horwick for Gold Coast Property Management [19-12720] (ECF: Shawn Horwick) [Entered: 07/25/2019 01:53 PM]

Open Document #2

Appearance of Counsel Form

Open Document #1

Appearance of Counsel Form Filed

Open Document #3

DKT-7CIV Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document #2

DE #55 Order

Open Document #1

Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER: On its own motion, the court DISMISSES the appeal for lack of jurisdiction. SM, BBM and BCG [Entered: 09/06/2019 05:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney William D. Wilson for Appellees Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London, General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, United Specialty Insurance Company and Appellant Gold Coast Property Management, Inc.. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-12720] (ECF: William Wilson) [Entered: 08/12/2019 05:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Shawn Robert Horwick for Appellant Gold Coast Property Management, Inc.. [19-12720] (ECF: Shawn Horwick) [Entered: 08/02/2019 05:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Craig R. Rygiel, Appellees [19-12720] (ECF: Craig Rygiel) [Entered: 07/30/2019 04:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-12720] (ECF: Shawn Horwick) [Entered: 07/30/2019 02:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by William D. Wilson for Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London, General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company and United Specialty Insurance Company. [19-12720] (ECF: William Wilson) [Entered: 07/25/2019 02:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Craig M. Greene for Gold Coast Property Management, Inc.. [19-12720] (ECF: Shawn Horwick) [Entered: 07/25/2019 01:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Shawn R. Horwick for Gold Coast Property Management [19-12720] (ECF: Shawn Horwick) [Entered: 07/25/2019 01:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Brian Marcus McKell for Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London, General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company and United Specialty Insurance Company. [19-12720] (ECF: Brian McKell) [Entered: 07/23/2019 11:15 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Gold Coast Property Management, Inc. on 07/15/2019. Fee Status: Fee Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. The appellant's brief is due on or before 08/26/2019. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 07/30/2019 as to Appellant Gold Coast Property Management, Inc.. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 08/13/2019 as to Appellee Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London [Entered: 07/19/2019 03:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less