This case was last updated from PACER on 07/13/2020 at 08:07:17 (UTC).

Goff v. Commissioner, SSA

Case Summary

On 05/14/2020 Goff filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Commissioner, SSA. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-5050

  • Filing Date:

    05/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellant

COMMISSIONER, SSA

Plaintiff / Appellee

LINCOLN GOFF

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Jennifer Ann Randall

Attorney at Social Security Administration, Region VIII

1961 Stout Street, Suite 4169

Denver, CO 80294-4003

Kirsten A. Westerland

Attorney at Social Security Administration, Region VIII

1961 Stout Street, Suite 4169

Denver, CO 80294-4003

Jeffrey Andrew Gallant

Attorney at Office of the United States Attorney

110 West 7Th Street, Suite 300

Tulsa, OK 74119

Melissa Schuenemann

Attorney at Social Security Administration, Region VIII

1961 Stout Street, Suite 4169

Denver, CO 80294-4003

Daniel J. Aguilar

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

950 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

Amanda Mundell

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

950 Pennsylvania Avenue, Suite 7236

Washington, DC 20530

Mark B. Stern

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

950 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

Joshua Marc Salzman

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

950 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorney

Paul F. McTighe Jr.

Attorney at Paul F. McTighe, Jr. Law Office

6506 South Lewis Avenue, Suite 105

Tulsa, OK 74136-1020

 

Court Documents

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Document

[10750844] Order filed by Clerk of the Court granting appellant's motion to abate case pending the issuance of the mandates in 19-5079 and 19-5085. The deadline for filing the opening brief and appendix is vacated. Status report due 08/10/2020 by Commissioner, SSA as set forth in the attached order. Served on 06/29/2020. [20-5050] [Entered: 06/29/2020 02:53 PM]

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document #3

General Docket Letter - Counsel - Civil

Open Restricted Document #2

Transmittal letter

Open Restricted Document #1

Preliminary Record

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10754094] Status report filed by Commissioner, SSA in 20-5039. Served on 07/10/2020. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [20-5039, 20-5043, 20-5045, 20-5050] AM [Entered: 07/10/2020 02:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10750844] Order filed by Clerk of the Court granting appellant's motion to abate case pending the issuance of the mandates in 19-5079 and 19-5085. The deadline for filing the opening brief and appendix is vacated. Status report due 08/10/2020 by Commissioner, SSA as set forth in the attached order. Served on 06/29/2020. [20-5050] [Entered: 06/29/2020 02:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10750685] Motion filed by Appellant Commissioner, SSA to abate case. Served on: 06/29/2020. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [20-5050] AM [Entered: 06/29/2020 10:37 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • Docket[10743804] Minute order filed - Appellant's brief and appendix due on 07/08/2020 for Commissioner, SSA. (Text Only - No Attachment) [20-5050] [Entered: 05/29/2020 03:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10743789] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 05/29/2020. [20-5050] [Entered: 05/29/2020 03:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10743565] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Paul F. McTighe, Jr., for Lincoln Goff. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 05/28/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-5050] [Entered: 05/28/2020 04:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • Docket[10743548] Entry of appearance submitted by Paul F. McTighe, Jr. for Appellee Lincoln GoffNone for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 05/28/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-5050]--[Edited 05/28/2020 by KLP to delete the attachment; entry filed.] PFM [Entered: 05/28/2020 03:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • Docket[10743517] Minute order filed - Notice due that record is complete by 06/04/2020 for Mark C. McCartt, Clerk of Court. (Text Only - No Attachment) [20-5050] [Entered: 05/28/2020 03:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10743512] Notice received from Commissioner, SSA that a transcript is not necessary for this appeal. Served on: 05/28/2020. Manner of Service: email [20-5050] AM [Entered: 05/28/2020 02:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10743508] Docketing statement filed by Commissioner, SSA. Served on 05/28/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-5050] AM [Entered: 05/28/2020 02:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10743504] Entry of appearance filed by Mark B. Stern, Joshua Marc Salzman, Daniel J. Aguilar and Amanda Mundell for Commissioner, SSA. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 05/28/2020. Manner of Service: email [20-5050] [Entered: 05/28/2020 02:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • Docket[10743478] Entry of appearance submitted by Amanda Lee Mundell, Daniel J. Aguilar, Joshua Marc Salzman, Mark B. Stern for Appellant Commissioner, SSA for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 05/28/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-5050]--[Edited 05/28/2020 by DJD. Removed PDF as pleading filed 5/28/20] AM [Entered: 05/28/2020 01:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10742861] Entry of appearance filed by Ms. Kirsten A. Westerland for Commissioner, SSA. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 05/26/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-5050] [Entered: 05/27/2020 08:19 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • Docket[10742761] Entry of appearance submitted by Kirsten A. Westerland for Appellant Commissioner, SSA for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 05/26/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-5050]--[Edited 05/27/2020 by JM PDF removed filed by the court on 5/27/20.] KAW [Entered: 05/26/2020 03:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10740267] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 05/14/2020 Docketing statement, transcript order form and notice of appearance due 05/28/2020 for Commissioner, SSA. Notice of appearance also due on 05/28/2020 for Lincoln Goff [20-5050] [Entered: 05/14/2020 09:47 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Paul F McTighe, Jr