This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 02/03/2022 at 05:18:57 (UTC).

Godo Kaisha IP Bridge 1 v. Micron Technology Inc.

Case Summary

On 02/01/2022 Godo Kaisha IP Bridge 1 filed an Other lawsuit against Micron Technology Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-1422

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Appellant

GODO KAISHA IP BRIDGE 1

Appellee

MICRON TECHNOLOGY INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

Gerald B. Hrycyszyn Esq.

Attorney at Wolf, Greenfield & Sacks, PC

Federal Reserve Plaza, 600 Atlantic Avenue

Boston, MA 02210

Appellee Attorney

Jeremy Jason Lang

Attorney at Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

1000 Marsh Road

Menlo Park, CA 94025

 

Court Documents

#1

Notice of Docketing

1 #2

Agency Case Docketed

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/02/2022
  • Docket(#2) Note to File: The following cases shall be considered companion cases and assigned to the same merits panel: 22-1422, 22-1423, 22-1424. [828689] [22-1422, 22-1423, 22-1424] [JCW] [Entered: 02/02/2022 03:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 01/31/2022. [828332] Entry of Appearance is due on 02/15/2022. Certificate of Interest is due on 02/15/2022. Docketing Statement is due on 02/15/2022. Certified List is due on 03/14/2022. [JCW] [Entered: 02/01/2022 12:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MICRON TECHNOLOGY, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jeremy Jason Lang