Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 07/25/2020 at 09:52:49 (UTC).

Glenn Burton, Jr. v. Atlantic Richfield Company

Case Summary

On 05/26/2020 Glenn Burton, Jr filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Atlantic Richfield Company. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1869

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellee

GLENN BURTON, JR.

Defendant / Appellant

ATLANTIC RICHFIELD COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorney

Fidelma L. Fitzpatrick

Attorney at MOTLEY & RICE LLC

55 Cedar Street

Providence, RI 02903

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Daniel T. Flaherty

Attorney at GODFREY & KAHN S.C.

100 W. Lawrence Street

Appleton, WI 54911-5754

Bruce R. Kelly

Attorney at ARNOLD & PORTER KAYE SCHOLER LLP

250 W. 55Th Street

New York, NY 10019-9710

Sean Morris

Attorney at ARNOLD & PORTER KAYE SCHOLER LLP

777 S. Figueroa Street

Los Angeles, CA 90017-2513

 

Court Documents

Open Document #1

Certified copy sent

4 #2

Ex. A

4 #1

Docketing/Jurisdictional Statement

6 #2

Mandate

6 #1

Final Order with Mandate

#5

(#6) Motion filed by Appellant Atlantic Richfield Company in 20-1869, 20-1871, 20-1870 to dismiss case. [6] [7085781] [20-1869, 20-1871, 20-1870] (Morris, Sean) [Entered: 06/08/2020 04:33 PM]

#3

(#3) ORDER: Appellant Atlantic Richfield Company shall file, on or before June 9, 2020, a brief memorandum stating why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Briefing is SUSPENDED pending further court order. (See order for further details) [7083373] DW [3] [7083373] [20-1869, 20-1870, 20-1871] (CG) [Entered: 05/27/2020 11:13 AM]

#14

(#7) THIS ENTRY HAS BEEN REMOVE AS ENTERED IN ERROR. [20-1869, 20-1780, 20-1781] (AD) [Entered: 06/09/2020 10:43 AM]

#12

(#5) ORDER re: Unopposed motion for a 30 day extension of time to file opening briefs, filed on May 29, 2020. The motion is GRANTED. [ # 7084148-2 ] Appellant's brief due on or before 07/17/2020 for E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company, Inc., Armstrong Containers Inc. and Sherwin Williams Company. Appellee's brief due on or before 08/17/2020 for Glenn Burton Jr., Ravon Owens and Cesar Sifuentes. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 09/08/2020 for Appellants E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company, Inc., Armstrong Containers Inc. and Sherwin Williams Company. CMD [5] [7084282] [20-1774, 20-1776, 20-1777, 20-1780, 20-1781, 20-1782, 20-1783, 20-1784, 20-1785, 20-1869, 20-1870, 20-1871] (FP) [Entered: 06/01/2020 11:18 AM]

#2

Exhibit A

2 #1

Amended Jurisdictional Statement (Per Order)

1 #3

Notice to District Court

1 #2

Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFOR COURT USE ONLY: Certified copy of 06/09/2020 Final Order with Mandate sent to the District Court Clerk. [7085920-2] [7085920] [20-1869] (AD) [Entered: 06/09/2020 11:28 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER: These causes are DISMISSED pursuant to F.R.A.P. 42(b). Mandate issued, no record to be returned. [ # 6 ] [8] [7085912] [20-1869, 20-1870, 20-1871] (AD) [Entered: 06/09/2020 11:18 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) THIS ENTRY HAS BEEN REMOVE AS ENTERED IN ERROR. [20-1869, 20-1780, 20-1781] (AD) [Entered: 06/09/2020 10:43 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Motion filed by Appellant Atlantic Richfield Company in 20-1869, 20-1871, 20-1870 to dismiss case. [6] [7085781] [20-1869, 20-1871, 20-1870] (Morris, Sean) [Entered: 06/08/2020 04:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER re: Unopposed motion for a 30 day extension of time to file opening briefs, filed on May 29, 2020. The motion is GRANTED. [ # 7084148-2 ] Appellant's brief due on or before 07/17/2020 for E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company, Inc., Armstrong Containers Inc. and Sherwin Williams Company. Appellee's brief due on or before 08/17/2020 for Glenn Burton Jr., Ravon Owens and Cesar Sifuentes. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 09/08/2020 for Appellants E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company, Inc., Armstrong Containers Inc. and Sherwin Williams Company. CMD [5] [7084282] [20-1774, 20-1776, 20-1777, 20-1780, 20-1781, 20-1782, 20-1783, 20-1784, 20-1785, 20-1869, 20-1870, 20-1871] (FP) [Entered: 06/01/2020 11:18 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Atlantic Richfield Company. Prior or Related proceedings: Yes. 20-1870, 20-1871 [4] [7084090] [20-1869] (Morris, Sean) [Entered: 05/29/2020 01:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER: Appellant Atlantic Richfield Company shall file, on or before June 9, 2020, a brief memorandum stating why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Briefing is SUSPENDED pending further court order. (See order for further details) [7083373] DW [3] [7083373] [20-1869, 20-1870, 20-1871] (CG) [Entered: 05/27/2020 11:13 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Amended Jurisdictional Statement filed by Appellant E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company, Inc. in 20-1774, 20-1776, 20-1777. [2] [7083221] [20-1774, 20-1776, 20-1777, 20-1780, 20-1781, 20-1782, 20-1783, 20-1784, 20-1785, 20-1869, 20-1870] (Fleming, Eric) [Entered: 05/26/2020 04:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Transcript information sheet due by 06/09/2020. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Atlantic Richfield Company by 05/15/2020. Appellant's brief due on or before 07/06/2020 for Atlantic Richfield Company [1] [7083176] [20-1869] (FP) [Entered: 05/26/2020 03:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ATLANTIC RICHFIELD COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bruce R. Kelly

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daniel T Flaherty

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sean Morris