This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2019 at 06:04:16 (UTC).

Glen Ward v. IDOC, et al

Case Summary

On 07/16/2019 Glen Ward filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against IDOC. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-35587

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

IDOC

DYLAN ARTEAGA

J. KELLER, #9348

SARAH LYONS

KEITH YORDY, Warden

J. LINDER, #7605

ALBERTO RAMIREZ

R. VALLEY, #4409

TANNER CHAPMAN

K. HINKLE, #C465

L. WATSON, #0367

B. RAYBURN, #B401

MDTT

W. WILSON, #9908

JACOB MENDENHALL

M. CLEMENS

CAMERON SALISBURY

SEAN REDFORD

K. BROWN, #0207

Plaintiff / Appellant

GLEN JONES WARD

Boise, ID 83707

14 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Glen Jones Ward

Attorney at ISCI - IDAHO STATE CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION (BOISE)

P.O. Box 14

Boise, ID 83707

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter

#2

(#2) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: JW): The district courts judgment was entered on the docket on May 21, 2019. Appellants notice of appeal was delivered to prison officials on July 11, 2019, and received by the district court on July 11, 2019. Accordingly, the record suggests that this court may lack jurisdiction over this appeal because the notice of appeal was not filed or delivered to prison officials within 30 days after entry of the district courts judgment. See 28 U.S.C. 2107(a); Fed. R. App. P. 4(a)(1)(A), 4(c); United States v. Sadler, 480 F.3d 932, 937 (9th Cir. 2007) (requirement of timely notice of appeal is jurisdictional); Houston v. Lack, 487 U.S. 266, 270 (1988) (notice of appeal deemed filed when it was delivered to prison authorities for forwarding to the court). Within 21 days after the date of this order, appellant shall move for voluntary dismissal of the appeal, or show cause why it should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. If appellant does not comply with this order, the Clerk shall dismiss this appeal pursuant to Ninth Circuit Rule 42-1. Briefing is suspended pending further order of the court. [11366224] (CKP) [Entered: 07/17/2019 10:46 AM]

1 #2

Case Opening Packet

#3

(#3) Filed Appellant Glen Jones Ward motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis. Deficiencies: None. [11371726] (NAC) [Entered: 07/22/2019 01:49 PM]

#4

(#4) Filed order (Deputy Clerk: CKP) Motion to dismiss case for failure to prosecute (Cir. Rule 42-1). Pursuant to Ninth Circuit Rule 42-1, this appeal is dismissed for failure to respond to order. (Order dated 07/17/2019). This order served on the district court shall, 21 days after the date of the order, act as the mandate of this court. [11416380] (CKP) [Entered: 08/30/2019 09:59 AM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Filed order (Deputy Clerk: CKP) Motion to dismiss case for failure to prosecute (Cir. Rule 42-1). Pursuant to Ninth Circuit Rule 42-1, this appeal is dismissed for failure to respond to order. (Order dated 07/17/2019). This order served on the district court shall, 21 days after the date of the order, act as the mandate of this court. [11416380] (CKP) [Entered: 08/30/2019 09:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Filed Appellant Glen Jones Ward motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis. Deficiencies: None. [11371726] (NAC) [Entered: 07/22/2019 01:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: JW): The district courts judgment was entered on the docket on May 21, 2019. Appellants notice of appeal was delivered to prison officials on July 11, 2019, and received by the district court on July 11, 2019. Accordingly, the record suggests that this court may lack jurisdiction over this appeal because the notice of appeal was not filed or delivered to prison officials within 30 days after entry of the district courts judgment. See 28 U.S.C. 2107(a); Fed. R. App. P. 4(a)(1)(A), 4(c); United States v. Sadler, 480 F.3d 932, 937 (9th Cir. 2007) (requirement of timely notice of appeal is jurisdictional); Houston v. Lack, 487 U.S. 266, 270 (1988) (notice of appeal deemed filed when it was delivered to prison authorities for forwarding to the court). Within 21 days after the date of this order, appellant shall move for voluntary dismissal of the appeal, or show cause why it should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. If appellant does not comply with this order, the Clerk shall dismiss this appeal pursuant to Ninth Circuit Rule 42-1. Briefing is suspended pending further order of the court. [11366224] (CKP) [Entered: 07/17/2019 10:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCE OF PRO SE APPELLANT AND NO APPEARANCE FOR APPELLEES. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Glen Jones Ward opening brief due 09/09/2019. [11364551] (JMR) [Entered: 07/16/2019 09:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.