This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2019 at 06:04:20 (UTC).

Glen Ward v. Bonneville County, et al

Case Summary

On 07/16/2019 Glen Ward filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Bonneville County. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-35588

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

KELLER, Dr.

BADGER MEDICAL, Contractor

TRINITY, Contractor

CAMPBELL, Jail Staff

COUNTY JAIL, Sheriff

MECHAM, Jail Staff

A. CAMPBELL, #436

BONNEVILLE COUNTY

KNUTZEN, Jail Staff

TELMATE, Contractor

Plaintiff / Appellant

GLEN JONES WARD

Boise, ID 83707

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Glen Jones Ward

Attorney at ISCI - IDAHO STATE CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION (BOISE)

P.O. Box 14

Boise, ID 83707

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter

6 #2

Prisoner Fee Authorization

#2

(#2) Filed referral notice (Deputy Clerk:CKP): Referring to the district court for determination whether in forma pauperis status should continue for this appeal. [11366254] (CKP) [Entered: 07/17/2019 10:52 AM]

#5

(#5) Received PLRA authorization response from appellant. Dated 08/28/2019. [11419799] (NAC) [Entered: 09/04/2019 07:30 AM]

6 #1

Main Document

#3

(#3) Filed Appellant Glen Jones Ward motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis. Deficiencies: None. [11371721] (NAC) [Entered: 07/22/2019 01:47 PM]

1 #2

Case Opening Packet

#4

(#4) CLERK ORDER FILED (Deputy Clerk CKP) Prisoner fee authorization form sent to prisoner. [11404995] (CKP) [Entered: 08/21/2019 10:32 AM]

#8

(#8) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: LKK): Appellants motion (Docket Entry No. [ # 7 ]) for an extension of time to file the opening brief is granted. The opening brief is due October 15, 2019. Because there is no appearance by appellees, briefing will be complete upon the filing of the opening brief. [11430612] (HC) [Entered: 09/13/2019 09:45 AM]

#7

(#7) Filed Appellant Glen Jones Ward motion to extend time to file appellant opening brief. Deficiencies: None. [11425223] (NAC) [Entered: 09/09/2019 01:30 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: LKK): Appellants motion (Docket Entry No. [ # 7 ]) for an extension of time to file the opening brief is granted. The opening brief is due October 15, 2019. Because there is no appearance by appellees, briefing will be complete upon the filing of the opening brief. [11430612] (HC) [Entered: 09/13/2019 09:45 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Filed Appellant Glen Jones Ward motion to extend time to file appellant opening brief. Deficiencies: None. [11425223] (NAC) [Entered: 09/09/2019 01:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CLERK ORDER FILED (Deputy Clerk CKP) Prisoner completed authorization fee order. [11420253] (CKP) [Entered: 09/04/2019 10:41 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Received PLRA authorization response from appellant. Dated 08/28/2019. [11419799] (NAC) [Entered: 09/04/2019 07:30 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CLERK ORDER FILED (Deputy Clerk CKP) Prisoner fee authorization form sent to prisoner. [11404995] (CKP) [Entered: 08/21/2019 10:32 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Filed Appellant Glen Jones Ward motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis. Deficiencies: None. [11371721] (NAC) [Entered: 07/22/2019 01:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Filed referral notice (Deputy Clerk:CKP): Referring to the district court for determination whether in forma pauperis status should continue for this appeal. [11366254] (CKP) [Entered: 07/17/2019 10:52 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCE OF PRO SE APPELLANT AND NO APPEARANCE FOR APPELLEES. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Glen Jones Ward opening brief due 09/09/2019. [11364611] (JMR) [Entered: 07/16/2019 10:03 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.