This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 11/09/2021 at 06:01:22 (UTC).

Glen R. Edwards, Inc., et al v. Travelers Casualty Insurance, et al

Case Summary

On 09/10/2021 Glen R Edwards, Inc filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Travelers Casualty Insurance. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-3035

  • Filing Date:

    09/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants

Glen R. Edwards, Inc.

Daniel A. Narup DMD, LLC

Defendant / Appellees

Travelers Casualty Insurance

The Phoenix Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Anthony S. Bruning

Attorney at BRUNING LAW FIRM, LLC

Suite 600, 555 Washington Avenue

Saint Louis, MO 63101

Anthony S. Bruning Jr.

Attorney at BRUNING LAW FIRM, LLC

Suite 600, 555 Washington Avenue

Saint Louis, MO 63101

Ryan L. Bruning

Attorney at BRUNING LAW FIRM, LLC

Suite 600, 555 Washington Avenue

Saint Louis, MO 63101

Richard Steven Cornfeld

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF RICHARD S. CORNFELD, LLC

Suite 1645, 1010 Market Street

Saint Louis, MO 63101

Mark C. Goldenberg

Attorney at GOLDENBERG & HELLER

2227 S. State Route 157

Edwardsville, IL 62025-0000

Kevin Paul Green

Attorney at GOLDENBERG & HELLER

2227 S. State Route 157

Edwardsville, IL 62025-0000

Daniel S. Levy

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF RICHARD S. CORNFELD, LLC

Suite 1645, 1010 Market Street

Saint Louis, MO 63101

Thomas Paul Rosenfeld

Attorney at GOLDENBERG & HELLER

2227 S. State Route 157

Edwardsville, IL 62025-0000

Alfredo Torrijos

Attorney at ARIAS & OZZELLO

Suite 1400, 6701 Center Drive, W.

Los Angeles, CA 90045

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Wystan M. Ackerman

Attorney at ROBINSON & COLE

280 Trumbull Street

Hartford, CT 06103-0000

Nicholas Anthony Cammarata

Attorney at ARMSTRONG & TEASDALE

Suite 1800, 7700 Forsyth Boulevard

Saint Louis, MO 63105

Stephen Edward Goldman

Attorney at ROBINSON & COLE

280 Trumbull Street

Hartford, CT 06103-0000

Patrick J. Kenny

Attorney at ARMSTRONG & TEASDALE

Suite 1800, 7700 Forsyth Boulevard

Saint Louis, MO 63105

Denis O'Malley

Attorney at ROBINSON & COLE

280 Trumbull Street

Hartford, CT 06103-0000

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Richard S. Cornfeld for Appellants Daniel A. Narup DMD, LLC and Glen R. Edwards, Inc. w/service 09/24/2021 [5080648] [21-3035] (RSC) [Entered: 09/24/2021 04:58 PM]

Open Document

Certificate of transcript filed by Appellants Daniel A. Narup DMD, LLC and Glen R. Edwards, Inc.. No Transcript[5080650] [21-3035] (RSC) [Entered: 09/24/2021 05:00 PM]

Open Document

CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellants Daniel A. Narup DMD, LLC and Glen R. Edwards, Inc.. - FOR CAL [5080651] [21-3035] (RSC) [Entered: 09/24/2021 05:01 PM]

Open Document

METHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellants Daniel A. Narup DMD, LLC and Glen R. Edwards, Inc. - Joint Appendix - w/service 09/24/2021 [5080652] [21-3035] (RSC) [Entered: 09/24/2021 05:03 PM]

Open Document

STATEMENT of issues filed by Appellants Daniel A. Narup DMD, LLC and Glen R. Edwards, Inc. - w/service 09/24/2021. [5080654] [21-3035] (RSC) [Entered: 09/24/2021 05:04 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Daniel S. Levy for Appellants Daniel A. Narup DMD, LLC and Glen R. Edwards, Inc. w/service 09/24/2021 [5080656] [21-3035] (DSL) [Entered: 09/24/2021 05:06 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Alfredo Torrijos for Appellants Daniel A. Narup DMD, LLC and Glen R. Edwards, Inc. w/service 10/11/2021 [5085693] [21-3035] (AT) [Entered: 10/11/2021 03:26 PM]

Open Document

MOTION for extension of time to file brief until 11/19/2021, filed by Attorney Mr. Alfredo Torrijos for Appellants Daniel A. Narup DMD, LLC and Glen R. Edwards, Inc. w/service 10/11/2021. [5085694] [21-3035] (AT) [Entered: 10/11/2021 03:47 PM]

Open Document

CLERK ORDER:Granting [ # 5085694-2 ] motion for extension of time to file brief filed by Mr. Alfredo Torrijos. Brief of Daniel A. Narup DMD, LLC and Glen R. Edwards, Inc. due 11/19/2021. Appendix due on 11/19/2021. [5085799] [21-3035] (MVP) [Entered: 10/12/2021 09:51 AM]

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK ORDER:Granting [ # 5085694-2 ] motion for extension of time to file brief filed by Mr. Alfredo Torrijos. Brief of Daniel A. Narup DMD, LLC and Glen R. Edwards, Inc. due 11/19/2021. Appendix due on 11/19/2021. [5085799] [21-3035] (MVP) [Entered: 10/12/2021 09:51 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION for extension of time to file brief until 11/19/2021, filed by Attorney Mr. Alfredo Torrijos for Appellants Daniel A. Narup DMD, LLC and Glen R. Edwards, Inc. w/service 10/11/2021. [5085694] [21-3035] (AT) [Entered: 10/11/2021 03:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Alfredo Torrijos for Appellants Daniel A. Narup DMD, LLC and Glen R. Edwards, Inc. w/service 10/11/2021 [5085693] [21-3035] (AT) [Entered: 10/11/2021 03:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Daniel S. Levy for Appellants Daniel A. Narup DMD, LLC and Glen R. Edwards, Inc. w/service 09/24/2021 [5080656] [21-3035] (DSL) [Entered: 09/24/2021 05:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT of issues filed by Appellants Daniel A. Narup DMD, LLC and Glen R. Edwards, Inc. - w/service 09/24/2021. [5080654] [21-3035] (RSC) [Entered: 09/24/2021 05:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMETHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellants Daniel A. Narup DMD, LLC and Glen R. Edwards, Inc. - Joint Appendix - w/service 09/24/2021 [5080652] [21-3035] (RSC) [Entered: 09/24/2021 05:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellants Daniel A. Narup DMD, LLC and Glen R. Edwards, Inc.. - FOR CAL [5080651] [21-3035] (RSC) [Entered: 09/24/2021 05:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of transcript filed by Appellants Daniel A. Narup DMD, LLC and Glen R. Edwards, Inc.. No Transcript[5080650] [21-3035] (RSC) [Entered: 09/24/2021 05:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Richard S. Cornfeld for Appellants Daniel A. Narup DMD, LLC and Glen R. Edwards, Inc. w/service 09/24/2021 [5080648] [21-3035] (RSC) [Entered: 09/24/2021 04:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Stephen E. Goldman for Appellees The Phoenix Insurance Company and Travelers Casualty Insurance w/service 09/13/2021 [5075419] [21-3035] (SEG) [Entered: 09/13/2021 09:03 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellees The Phoenix Insurance Company and Travelers Casualty Insurance. - FOR CAL [5075364] [21-3035] (WMA) [Entered: 09/13/2021 07:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Wystan M. Ackerman for Appellees The Phoenix Insurance Company and Travelers Casualty Insurance w/service 09/13/2021 [5075363] [21-3035] (WMA) [Entered: 09/13/2021 07:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Wystan M. Ackerman for Appellee Travelers Casualty Insurance w/service 09/10/2021 [5075246] [21-3035]--[DOCUMENT LOCKED and re-filed by counsel. See history number 5075363. Edited 09/15/2021 by MVP] (WMA) [Entered: 09/10/2021 03:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Stephen E. Goldman for Appellee Travelers Casualty Insurance w/service 09/10/2021 [5075232] [21-3035]--[DOCUMENT LOCKED and re-filed by counsel. See history number 5075419. Edited 09/15/2021 by MVP] (SEG) [Entered: 09/10/2021 03:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Appendix due on 10/20/2021. BRIEF OF APPELLANT Daniel A. Narup DMD, LLC and Glen R. Edwards, Inc. due 10/20/2021. Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [5075061] [21-3035] (CAH) [Entered: 09/10/2021 12:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, memorandum & order 8/11/21, dismissal order 8/11/21. [5075059] [21-3035] (CAH) [Entered: 09/10/2021 12:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case docketed. [5075052] [21-3035] (CAH) [Entered: 09/10/2021 12:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE PHOENIX INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nicholas Anthony Cammarata

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Patrick J. Kenny