This case was last updated from PACER on 06/14/2019 at 06:07:52 (UTC).

Girvin Jackson, III v. Joe Chapman, et al

Case Summary

On 04/15/2019 Girvin Jackson, III filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Joe Chapman. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-11438

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

JOSEPH CHESSER

PHILLIP NOWLIN

GODFREY

JOE CHAPMAN, Sheriff of Walton County

Plaintiff / Appellant

GIRVIN JACKSON, III

Alamo, GA 30411

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Thomas E. Lavender III

Attorney at FisherBroyles, LLP

1200 Abernathy Rd Bldg 600 Ste 1700

Atlanta, GA 30328

Stacy Marie Scott

Attorney at CorrectHealth Companies

3384 Peachtree Rd Ne Ste 700

Atlanta, GA 30326

Amy Michelle Hoffman

Attorney at FisherBroyles, LLP

1200 Abernathy Rd Bldg 600 Ste 1700

Atlanta, GA 30328

Jason C. Waymire

Attorney at Williams Morris & Waymire, LLC

4330 S Lee St Ne Bldg 400 Ste A

Buford, GA 30518

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Wheeler CF Warden

Attorney at Wheeler CF - Inmate Trust Fund

1100 N Broad St

Alamo, GA 30411-0466

Girvin Jackson III

Attorney at Wheeler CF - Inmate Legal Mail

Po Box 466

Alamo, GA 30411

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Returned Mail was received for Attorney Amy Michelle Hoffman for Appellee Doctor Phillip Nowlin. Return to sender, not deliverable as addressed, unable to forward. IN RE: Ext-1 letter. [Entered: 06/07/2019 04:35 PM]

Open Document

Appellant's AMENDED Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Girvin Jackson, III. [Entered: 06/04/2019 02:16 PM]

Open Document

Notice of filing: Certificate of Service as to Appellant Girvin Jackson, III. [Entered: 06/04/2019 02:11 PM]

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Jason C. Waymire for Appellee Joe Chapman. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11438] (ECF: Jason Waymire) [Entered: 05/17/2019 04:26 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Jason C. Waymire for Joe Chapman. [19-11438] (ECF: Jason Waymire) [Entered: 05/17/2019 04:25 PM]

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Thomas E. Lavender, III for Appellee Doctor Phillip Nowlin. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11438] (ECF: Thomas Lavender) [Entered: 05/15/2019 11:45 AM]

Open Document #2

EXT-1 Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document #1

Court Order Filed

Open Document

Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Girvin Jackson, III. [Entered: 05/09/2019 09:23 AM]

Open Document #2

MOT-9 Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document #1

Motion for extension

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Thomas E. Lavender, III for Doctor Phillip Nowlin. [19-11438] (ECF: Thomas Lavender) [Entered: 04/17/2019 02:49 PM]

Open Document #3

USDC Judgment- Doc #44

Open Document #2

PLRA Prisoner Case Docketed - Notice of Appeal

Open Document #1

DKT-2 Notice to Counsel/Parties

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Returned Mail was received for Attorney Amy Michelle Hoffman for Appellee Doctor Phillip Nowlin. Return to sender, not deliverable as addressed, unable to forward. IN RE: Ext-1 letter. [Entered: 06/07/2019 04:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Appellant's AMENDED Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Girvin Jackson, III. [Entered: 06/04/2019 02:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of filing: Certificate of Service as to Appellant Girvin Jackson, III. [Entered: 06/04/2019 02:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Jason C. Waymire for Appellee Joe Chapman. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11438] (ECF: Jason Waymire) [Entered: 05/17/2019 04:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Jason C. Waymire for Joe Chapman. [19-11438] (ECF: Jason Waymire) [Entered: 05/17/2019 04:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Thomas E. Lavender, III for Appellee Doctor Phillip Nowlin. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11438] (ECF: Thomas Lavender) [Entered: 05/15/2019 11:45 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Thomas E. Lavender, III for Doctor Phillip Nowlin and Jason C. Waymire for Joe Chapman. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Web-Based Stock Ticker Symbol CIP via the court's public web-page and have not filed the CIP via the electronic filing system (CM/ECF). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 05/14/2019 11:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER: Motion for extension of time to file motion for leave to proceed filed by Appellant Girvin Jackson, III is GRANTED. [ # 8764038-2 ] ELB [Entered: 05/09/2019 03:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Girvin Jackson, III. [Entered: 05/09/2019 09:23 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION for extension of time to file a motion for relief from the obligation to pay the docketing and filng fees and file a certifictae of interested persons filed by Appellant Girvin Jackson, III. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [8764038-1] [Entered: 05/03/2019 03:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Girvin Jackson, III. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 05/01/2019 04:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Thomas E. Lavender, III for Doctor Phillip Nowlin. [19-11438] (ECF: Thomas Lavender) [Entered: 04/17/2019 02:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PRISONER (PLRA) APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Girvin Jackson, III on 04/15/2019. Fee Status: Fee Not Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. [Entered: 04/17/2019 01:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.