This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 03/08/2022 at 06:02:42 (UTC).

Gini Grace v. State of Kentucky, et al

Case Summary

On 01/07/2022 Gini Grace filed an Other lawsuit against State of Kentucky. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Sixth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-5019

  • Filing Date:

    01/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

GINI G. GRACE

Symsonia, KY 42082

Defendant / Appellees

KY ATTY GENERAL

U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY

FEDERAL EMERGENCY MANAGEMENT AGENCY

TENNESSEE VALLEY AUTHORITY

UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

STATE OF KENTUCKY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Gini G. Grace

2365 Said Road

Symsonia, KY 42082

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Heather Lynn Becker

700 Capitol Avenue, Suite 118

Frankfort, KY 40601

Timothy D. Thompson

Attorney at Office of the U.S. Attorney

717 W. Broadway

Louisville, KY 40202

James S. Chase

Attorney at Office of the General Counsel

400 W. Summit Hill Drive, Wt 6A-K

Knoxville, TN 37902

Courtney E. Albini

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

1024 Capital Center Drive, Suite 200

Frankfort, KY 40601

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Ms. Gini G. Grace. Transcript needed: n. (MMP) [Entered: 01/07/2022 11:39 AM]

3 #1

Briefing Letter

3 #2

briefing letter sent

#4

(#4) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee TVA by James S. Chase. Certificate of Service: 01/10/2022. [22-5019] (JSC) [Entered: 01/10/2022 10:49 AM]

#5

(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. James S. Chase for Appellee TVA Certificate of Service: 01/10/2022. [22-5019] (JSC) [Entered: 01/10/2022 10:52 AM]

#6

(#6) APPEARANCE filed for Appellees DHS, Federal Emergency Management Agency, USA and USACE by Timothy D. Thompson. Certificate of Service: 01/18/2022. [22-5019] (TDT) [Entered: 01/18/2022 01:00 PM]

#7

(#7) LETTER SENT to Ms. Gini G. Grace and Ms. Heather Lynn Becker for KY, Mr. James S. Chase for TVA and Mr. Timothy D. Thompson for USA, USACE and Federal Emergency Management Agency, regarding the Amended Official Court of Appeals Caption for 22-5019. (MMP) [Entered: 01/19/2022 01:10 PM]

#8

RESTRICTED

#9

(#9) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee KY by Courtney E. Albini. Certificate of Service: 01/21/2022. [22-5019] (CEA) [Entered: 01/21/2022 06:59 PM]

#10

(#10) APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Ms. Gini G. Grace Certificate of Service:02/22/2022. Argument Request: requested. (MMP) [Entered: 02/23/2022 05:09 PM]

#11

(#11) Appellant MOTION filed by Ms. Gini G. Grace to extend time to file brief. Certificate of service: 02/25/2022. (MMP) [Entered: 03/02/2022 02:05 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Appellant MOTION filed by Ms. Gini G. Grace to extend time to file brief. Certificate of service: 02/25/2022. (MMP) [Entered: 03/02/2022 02:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Ms. Gini G. Grace Certificate of Service:02/22/2022. Argument Request: requested. (MMP) [Entered: 02/23/2022 05:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee KY by Courtney E. Albini. Certificate of Service: 01/21/2022. [22-5019] (CEA) [Entered: 01/21/2022 06:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ***LOCKED - COUNSEL IS ADVISED TO REFILE AS A NON-MODIFIABLE PDF*** APPEARANCE filed for Appellee KY by Courtney E. Albini. Certificate of Service: 01/19/2022. [22-5019]--[Edited 01/20/2022 by MMP] (CEA) [Entered: 01/19/2022 08:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) LETTER SENT to Ms. Gini G. Grace and Ms. Heather Lynn Becker for KY, Mr. James S. Chase for TVA and Mr. Timothy D. Thompson for USA, USACE and Federal Emergency Management Agency, regarding the Amended Official Court of Appeals Caption for 22-5019. (MMP) [Entered: 01/19/2022 01:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) APPEARANCE filed for Appellees DHS, Federal Emergency Management Agency, USA and USACE by Timothy D. Thompson. Certificate of Service: 01/18/2022. [22-5019] (TDT) [Entered: 01/18/2022 01:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. James S. Chase for Appellee TVA Certificate of Service: 01/10/2022. [22-5019] (JSC) [Entered: 01/10/2022 10:52 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee TVA by James S. Chase. Certificate of Service: 01/10/2022. [22-5019] (JSC) [Entered: 01/10/2022 10:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting pro se briefing schedule: appellant brief due 02/22/2022; appellee brief due 03/24/2022. (MMP) [Entered: 01/07/2022 12:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • Docket(#2) The case manager for this case is: Monica Page (MMP) [Entered: 01/07/2022 11:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Ms. Gini G. Grace. Transcript needed: n. (MMP) [Entered: 01/07/2022 11:39 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Tennessee Valley Authority is a litigant

Latest cases where Federal Emergency Management Agency is a litigant

Latest cases where US Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant