This case was last updated from PACER on 04/13/2020 at 06:06:50 (UTC).

Gigi Fairchild-Littlefield v. Kyle Cox Shaffer, et al

Case Summary

On 02/13/2020 Gigi Fairchild-Littlefield filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Kyle Cox Shaffer. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-15232

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

KEVIN RICHARD VIENNA

JANELLE ESPINOZA

KYLE NIKI COX SHAFFER

Plaintiff / Appellant

GIGI ARIEL FAIRCHILD-LITTLEFIELD

Chowchilla, CA 93610-1508

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Gigi Ariel Fairchild-Littlefield

Attorney at CCWF - CENTRAL CALIFORNIA WOMEN'S FACILITY (CHOWCHILLA)

P.O. Box 1508

Chowchilla, CA 93610-1508

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) Filed order (Deputy Clerk: MF): Appellants letter to the court received on February 24, 2020 is construed as a motion for voluntary dismissal of this appeal. So construed, the motion is granted (Docket Entry No. [ # 2 ]). This appeal is dismissed. See Fed. R. App. P. 42(b). This order served on the district court shall act as and for the mandate of this court. [11619897] (AF) [Entered: 03/05/2020 03:55 PM]

#2

(#2) Filed Appellant Gigi Ariel Fairchild-Littlefield letter dated 02/19/2020 re: miscommunication. Paper filing deficiency: None. [11608615] (RR) [Entered: 02/25/2020 02:53 PM]

1 #3

Case Opening Packet

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Filed order (Deputy Clerk: MF): Appellants letter to the court received on February 24, 2020 is construed as a motion for voluntary dismissal of this appeal. So construed, the motion is granted (Docket Entry No. [ # 2 ]). This appeal is dismissed. See Fed. R. App. P. 42(b). This order served on the district court shall act as and for the mandate of this court. [11619897] (AF) [Entered: 03/05/2020 03:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed Appellant Gigi Ariel Fairchild-Littlefield letter dated 02/19/2020 re: miscommunication. Paper filing deficiency: None. [11608615] (RR) [Entered: 02/25/2020 02:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCE OF PRO SE APPELLANT AND NO APPEARANCE FOR APPELLEES. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Gigi Ariel Fairchild-Littlefield opening brief due 04/15/2020. [11596797] (RT) [Entered: 02/13/2020 02:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less