This case was last updated from PACER on 09/13/2019 at 06:04:16 (UTC).

Gibson v. City Commissioner

Case Summary

On 07/15/2019 Gibson filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against City Commissioner. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-2150

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

New York City Police Department, City Commissioner

Police Officer Thomas Rice, #2326 and others unknown at present

Judge Goldstein, NYS Supreme Court, Queens County

Queens District Attorney's Office, Prosecutors

Queens Auto Crime Division, Administrative Directors, Policy Writers and Investigative Officers

Judge O'Dwyer, NYS Supreme Court Queens County

Deputy Commissioner

Plaintiff / Appellant

Bennie Gibson

Bronx, NY 10451

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Bennie Gibson

3339 Park Avenue

Bronx, NY 10451

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

John M. Castellano

Attorney at Queens County District Attorney's Office

125-01 Queens Boulevard

Kew Gardens, NY 11415

 

Court Documents

#22

(#22) MOTION, to proceed in forma pauperis, on behalf of Appellant Bennie Gibson, FILED. Service date 08/13/2019 by hand delivery.[2632261] [19-2150] [Entered: 08/14/2019 02:46 PM]

#1

Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax

#12

(#12) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Form D-P, [10], on behalf of Appellant Bennie Gibson, copy to pro se, FILED.[2620005] [19-2150] [Entered: 07/30/2019 11:21 AM]

#21

(#21) FORM D-P, on behalf of Appellant Bennie Gibson, FILED. Service date 08/13/2019 by hand delivery.[2632253] [19-2150] [Entered: 08/14/2019 02:44 PM]

#11

(#11) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, [9], on behalf of Appellant Bennie Gibson, copy to pro se, FILED.[2619992] [19-2150] [Entered: 07/30/2019 11:11 AM]

#16

(#16) NOTICE, to Appellee Goldstein, O'Dwyer Queens, District Attorney's Office and Queens Auto Crime Division , for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[2625989] [19-2150]--[Edited 08/07/2019 by JM] [Entered: 08/07/2019 08:59 AM]

#2

(#2) DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, dated 03/04/2019, RECEIVED.[2610464] [19-2150] [Entered: 07/17/2019 09:57 AM]

#20

(#20) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FORM, on behalf of Party Bennie Gibson, FILED. Service date 08/13/2019 by hand delivery.[2632250] [19-2150] [Entered: 08/14/2019 02:44 PM]

1 #2

Case FILED

#6

(#6) LETTER, dated 07/18/2019, on behalf of Appellant Bennie Gibson, The New York City Law Department respectfully requests that it no longer be identified or listed as counsel for defendants appellees, RECEIVED. Service date 07/18/2019 by US mail.[2611776] [19-2150] [Entered: 07/18/2019 01:13 PM]

#17

(#17) LETTER, dated 08/09/2019, on behalf of Appellee District Attorney's Office, Goldstein, O'Dwyer and Queens Auto Crime Division, The Queens County District Attorneys Office respectfully requests that it not be listed as counsel on this matter, RECEIVED. Service date 08/09/2019 by US mail.[2629412] [19-2150] [Entered: 08/12/2019 10:14 AM]

#15

(#15) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, motion for addressing issues for appeal, to proceed in forma pauperis, [14],[14], on behalf of Appellant Bennie Gibson, copy to pro se, FILED.[2624929] [19-2150] [Entered: 08/06/2019 10:24 AM]

#31

(#31) NEW CASE MANAGER, Ronald Willoughby, ASSIGNED.[2653710] [19-2150] [Entered: 09/12/2019 11:18 AM]

#13

No Description Available

#4

(#4) INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[2610474] [19-2150] [Entered: 07/17/2019 10:03 AM]

3 #1

Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) NEW CASE MANAGER, Ronald Willoughby, ASSIGNED.[2653710] [19-2150] [Entered: 09/12/2019 11:18 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) CURED DEFECTIVE Form D-P, acknowledgment and notice of appearance, motion to proceed in forma pauperis [ # 20 ], [ # 21 ], [ # 22 ], on behalf of Appellant Bennie Gibson, FILED.[2632270] [19-2150] [Entered: 08/14/2019 02:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) MOTION, to proceed in forma pauperis, on behalf of Appellant Bennie Gibson, FILED. Service date 08/13/2019 by hand delivery.[2632261] [19-2150] [Entered: 08/14/2019 02:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) FORM D-P, on behalf of Appellant Bennie Gibson, FILED. Service date 08/13/2019 by hand delivery.[2632253] [19-2150] [Entered: 08/14/2019 02:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FORM, on behalf of Party Bennie Gibson, FILED. Service date 08/13/2019 by hand delivery.[2632250] [19-2150] [Entered: 08/14/2019 02:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • (#18) ATTORNEY, John M. Castellano, for District Attorney's Office, Goldstein, O'Dwyer and Queens Auto Crime Division, TERMINATED.[2629416] [19-2150] [Entered: 08/12/2019 10:16 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) LETTER, dated 08/09/2019, on behalf of Appellee District Attorney's Office, Goldstein, O'Dwyer and Queens Auto Crime Division, The Queens County District Attorneys Office respectfully requests that it not be listed as counsel on this matter, RECEIVED. Service date 08/09/2019 by US mail.[2629412] [19-2150] [Entered: 08/12/2019 10:14 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) NOTICE, to Appellee Goldstein, O'Dwyer Queens, District Attorney's Office and Queens Auto Crime Division , for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[2625989] [19-2150]--[Edited 08/07/2019 by JM] [Entered: 08/07/2019 08:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, motion for addressing issues for appeal, to proceed in forma pauperis, [14],[14], on behalf of Appellant Bennie Gibson, copy to pro se, FILED.[2624929] [19-2150] [Entered: 08/06/2019 10:24 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • (#14) MOTION, for addressing issues for appeal, to proceed in forma pauperis, on behalf of Appellant Bennie Gibson, FILED. Incomplete Service.[2624923] [19-2150] [Entered: 08/06/2019 10:23 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Form D-P, [10], on behalf of Appellant Bennie Gibson, copy to pro se, FILED.[2620005] [19-2150] [Entered: 07/30/2019 11:21 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, [9], on behalf of Appellant Bennie Gibson, copy to pro se, FILED.[2619992] [19-2150] [Entered: 07/30/2019 11:11 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • (#10) FORM D-P, on behalf of Appellant Bennie Gibson, FILED. Incomplete Service.[2619990] [19-2150] [Entered: 07/30/2019 11:10 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • (#9) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FORM, on behalf of Party Bennie Gibson, FILED. Incomplete Service.[2619977] [19-2150] [Entered: 07/30/2019 11:02 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • (#7) ATTORNEY, Zachary W. Carter, for New York City Police Department, Deputy Commissioner, Police Officer Thomas Rice, TERMINATED.[2611780] [19-2150] [Entered: 07/18/2019 01:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) LETTER, dated 07/18/2019, on behalf of Appellant Bennie Gibson, The New York City Law Department respectfully requests that it no longer be identified or listed as counsel for defendants appellees, RECEIVED. Service date 07/18/2019 by US mail.[2611776] [19-2150] [Entered: 07/18/2019 01:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[2610474] [19-2150] [Entered: 07/17/2019 10:03 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2610472] [19-2150] [Entered: 07/17/2019 10:02 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, dated 03/04/2019, RECEIVED.[2610464] [19-2150] [Entered: 07/17/2019 09:57 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Bennie Gibson, FILED. [2610444] [19-2150] [Entered: 07/17/2019 09:45 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less