This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 05/25/2020 at 06:01:30 (UTC).

George Hengle v. Sherry Treppa

Case Summary

On 03/26/2020 George Hengle filed an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit against Sherry Treppa. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1359

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

 

Party Details

Defendants

SCOTT ASNER

JOSHUA LANDY

Defendant / Appellants

SHERRY TREPPA, Chairperson of the Habematolel Pomo of Upper Lake Executive Counsil; in her official capacity

AIMEE JACKSON-PENN, Member-At-Large of the Habematolel Pomo of Upper Lake Executive Council; in her official capacity

KATHLEEN TREPPA, Treasurer of the Habematolel Pomo of Upper Lake Executive Council; in her official capacity

IRIS PICTON, Secretary of the Habematolel Pomo of Upper Lake Executive Council; in her official capacity

TRACEY TREPPA, Vice-Chairperson of the Habematolel Pomo of Upper Lake Executive Council; in her official capacity

AMBER JACKSON, Member-At-Large of the Habematolel Pomo of Upper Lake Executive Council; in her official capacity

SAM ICAY, Member-At-Large of the Habematolel Pomo of Upper Lake Executive Council; in her official capacity

SHERRY TREPPA, Chairperson of the Habematolel Pomo of Upper Lake Executive Council; in her official capacity

Plaintiff / Appellees

SUE COLLINS

LAWRENCE MWETHUKU, on behalf of themselves and all individuals similarly situated

TIFFANI MYERS

GEORGE HENGLE

WILLIE ROSE

ELWOOD BUMBRAY

SHERRY BLACKBURN

STEVEN PIKE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Kosta S. Stojilkovic

Attorney at WILKINSON WALSH, LLP

2001 M Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20036

Beth Ann Wilkinson

Attorney at WILKINSON WALSH, LLP

2001 M Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20036

Rakesh Nageswar Kilaru

Attorney at WILKINSON WALSH, LLP

2001 M Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20036

Matthew R. Skanchy

Attorney at WILKINSON WALSH, LLP

2001 M Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20036

James Miller Rosenthal

Attorney at WILKINSON WALSH, LLP

2001 M Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20036

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Casey Shannon Nash

Attorney at KELLY GUZZO PLC

3925 Chain Bridge Road

Fairfax, VA 22030

James Wilson Speer

Attorney at VIRGINIA POVERTY LAW CENTER

919 East Main Street

Richmond, VA 23219

Andrew Joseph Guzzo

Attorney at KELLY GUZZO PLC

3925 Chain Bridge Road

Fairfax, VA 22030

Leonard Anthony Bennett

Attorney at CONSUMER LITIGATION ASSOCIATES, P.C.

763 J. Clyde Morris Boulevard

Newport News, VA 23601

Craig Carley Marchiando

Attorney at CONSUMER LITIGATION ASSOCIATES, P.C.

763 J. Clyde Morris Boulevard

Newport News, VA 23601

Kristi Cahoon Kelly

Attorney at KELLY GUZZO PLC

3925 Chain Bridge Road

Fairfax, VA 22030

Elizabeth W. Hanes

Attorney at CONSUMER LITIGATION ASSOCIATES, P.C.

763 J. Clyde Morris Boulevard

Newport News, VA 23601

 

Court Documents

#5

#1

#2

#3

#4

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

#12

#7

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Amended BRIEFING ORDER filed. FILING OF PAPER COPIES OF BRIEFS/APPENDICES IS SUSPENDED PENDING FURTHER NOTICE FROM THE COURT. Opening Brief and Appendix due 06/02/2020. Opening/Response Brief Due: 06/23/2020. Response/Reply Brief Due 07/14/2020. [20-1062, 20-1063, 20-1358, 20-1359] JSN [Entered: 05/11/2020 04:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) COURT ORDER filed granting Motion to amend briefing schedule [ # 10 ]; granting Motion to extend filing time [ # 10 ]; granting Motion to exceed length limitations [ # 10 ]. Copies to all parties. [1000737003] [20-1062, 20-1063, 20-1358, 20-1359] JSN [Entered: 05/11/2020 03:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Joint MOTION by Sherry Blackburn, Elwood Bumbray, Sue Collins, George Hengle, Lawrence Mwethuku, Tiffani Myers, Steven Pike, Willie Rose and Sam Icay, Amber Jackson, Aimee Jackson-Penn, Iris Picton, Kathleen Treppa, Sherry Treppa and Tracey Treppa in 20-1062, Scott Asner, Joshua Landy and Sherry Blackburn, Elwood Bumbray, Sue Collins, George Hengle, Lawrence Mwethuku, Tiffani Myers, Steven Pike and Willie Rose in 20-1063, 20-1358, 20-1359 to amend briefing procedure. , to extend filing time for opening brief and appendix until June 2, 2020. , to exceed length limitations for brief. Date and method of service: 04/29/2020 ecf. [1000730276] [20-1062, 20-1063, 20-1358, 20-1359] Rakesh Kilaru [Entered: 04/29/2020 12:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) BRIEFING ORDER filed.. FILING OF PAPER COPIES OF BRIEFS/APPENDICES IS SUSPENDED PENDING FURTHER NOTICE FROM THE COURT. Opening Brief and Appendix due 05/12/2020. Response Brief due 06/11/2020. [20-1062, 20-1063, 20-1358, 20-1359] JSN [Entered: 04/02/2020 03:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER filed directing briefing on questions identified by district court. Copies to all parties. [1000714275] [20-1062, 20-1063, 20-1358, 20-1359] JSN [Entered: 04/02/2020 03:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) DOCKETING STATEMENT by Sam Icay, Amber Jackson, Aimee Jackson-Penn, Iris Picton, Kathleen Treppa, Sherry Treppa and Tracey Treppa. [20-1359] Rakesh Kilaru [Entered: 04/01/2020 03:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) COURT ORDER filed denying Motion to file separate brief [ # 1000677507-3 ] in 20-1062, 20-1063. Copies to all parties. [1000713531] [20-1062, 20-1063, 20-1358, 20-1359] JSN [Entered: 04/01/2020 03:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER filed consolidating case 20-1358, 20-1359 with 20-1062. Copies to all parties. [1000709884] [20-1062, 20-1063, 20-1358, 20-1359] JSN [Entered: 03/26/2020 11:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case. Originating case number: 3:19-cv-00250-DJN. [20-1359] JSN [Entered: 03/26/2020 11:45 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) FEE NOTICE issued to Rakesh Nageswar Kilaru, James Miller Rosenthal, Matthew R. Skanchy, Kosta S. Stojilkovic, Beth Ann Wilkinson - after grant of permission to appeal. Originating case number: 3:19-cv-00250-DJN. [20-1359] JSN [Entered: 03/26/2020 11:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Case transferred from miscellaneous docket 20-164. Record complete? Yes. [20-1359] JSN [Entered: 03/26/2020 11:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 3:19-cv-00250-DJN. Case manager: JeffNeal. [20-1359] JSN [Entered: 03/26/2020 11:39 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LAWRENCE MWETHUKU, on behalf of themselves and all individuals similarly situated is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Elizabeth W. Hanes

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Craig Carley Marchiando