This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 03/15/2021 at 06:12:11 (UTC).

George Hawthorn v. Georgia Pacific Brewton, LLC, et al

Case Summary

On 01/14/2021 George Hawthorn filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Georgia Pacific Brewton, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-10142

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

GEORGIA PACIFIC, LLC

GEORGIA PACIFIC BREWTON, LLC

GEORGIA PACIFIC, LLC SEVERANCE PLAN FOR SALARIED EMPLOYEES

Plaintiff / Appellant

GEORGE HAWTHORN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Noelle A. Abastillas

Attorney at Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton, LLP

1100 Peachtree St Ste 2800

Atlanta, GA 30309

Randall D. Avram

Attorney at Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton, LLP

4208 Six Forks Rd Ste 1400

Raleigh, NC 27609

Yendelela N. Holston

Attorney at Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton, LLP

1100 Peachtree St Ste 2800

Atlanta, GA 30309

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Celia J. Collins

Attorney at Johnstone Adams, LLC

Po Box 1988, 1 St Louis St Ste 4000

Mobile, AL 36608

Abby M. Richardson

Attorney at Richardson Law Firm, LLC

118 N Royal St Ste 100

Mobile, AL 36602

Abby Morrow Richardson

Attorney at Richardson Law Firm, LLC

118 N Royal St Ste 100

Mobile, AL 36602

 

Court Documents

Open Document #1

DKT-2 Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document #2

Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

Open Document #3

DE #77 Judgment

Open Document #4

DE 76 Memorandum & Opinion

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Counsel of Record. Counsel of Record must be logged in to CM/ECF and Pacer to access this document. This is the only notice you will receive regarding this matter. Please print a copy for your file. [Entered: 02/10/2021 08:47 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Civil Appeal Statement form filed by Attorney Noelle A. Abastillas for Appellees Georgia Pacific Brewton, LLC, Georgia Pacific, LLC and Georgia Pacific, LLC Severance Plan for Salaried Employees. [21-10142] (ECF: Noelle Abastillas) [Entered: 02/08/2021 06:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Noelle A. Abastillas for Appellees Georgia Pacific Brewton, LLC, Georgia Pacific, LLC and Georgia Pacific, LLC Severance Plan for Salaried Employees. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-10142] (ECF: Noelle Abastillas) [Entered: 02/08/2021 06:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Noelle A. Abastillas for Georgia Pacific Brewton, LLC, Georgia Pacific, LLC and Georgia Pacific, LLC Severance Plan for Salaried Employees. [21-10142]--[Edited 02/09/2021 by BWH] (ECF: Noelle Abastillas) [Entered: 02/08/2021 06:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Yendelela Neely Holston - Appellees [21-10142] (ECF: Yendelela Holston) [Entered: 02/08/2021 06:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketOver the phone 14 day extension granted by clerk as to Attorney Abby Morrow Richardson for Appellant George Hawthorn. Appellants brief due on 03/09/2021 as to Appellant George Hawthorn, with the appendix due seven days from the filing of the brief. [Entered: 02/01/2021 11:30 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Celia J. Collins for Appellant George Hawthorn. [21-10142] (ECF: Celia Collins) [Entered: 01/29/2021 06:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBriefing Notice issued to Appellant George Hawthorn. The appellant's brief is due on or before 02/23/2021. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. [Entered: 01/29/2021 12:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-10142] (ECF: Celia Collins) [Entered: 01/28/2021 05:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Celia J. Collins for George Hawthorn. [21-10142] (ECF: Celia Collins) [Entered: 01/28/2021 03:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT INFORMATION form filed by Attorney Celia J. Collins for Appellant George Hawthorn. No hearings. [Entered: 01/27/2021 05:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Abby Morrow Richardson for Appellant George Hawthorn. No hearings. [21-10142] (ECF: Abby Richardson) [Entered: 01/27/2021 03:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Abby Morrow Richardson for George Hawthorn. [21-10142] (ECF: Abby Richardson) [Entered: 01/26/2021 02:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant George Hawthorn on 01/14/2021. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 01/28/2021 as to Appellant George Hawthorn. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 02/11/2021 as to Appellee Georgia Pacific Brewton, LLC [Entered: 01/15/2021 02:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GEORGIA PACIFIC LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Abby M. Richardson